USA v. Jacobson et al

Plaintiff: USA
Defendant: Jerry L. Jacobson, Tami P. Jacobson, Green Tree Lending, Harvard Mortgage Group, Inc., Steven Jacobson, Air Academy Federal Credit Union, Budget Control Services, Inc., Douglas County Treasurer and Colorado State Dept. of Revenue
Case Number: 1:2015cv02574
Filed: November 24, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Douglas
Presiding Judge: Kathleen M. Tafoya
Nature of Suit: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
Cause of Action: 26:7403
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER granting 50 Motion to Set Aside. 44 Clerk's Entry of Default as to Green Tree Lending is hereby VACATED and Ditech Financial LLC is hereby substituted for Green Tree Lending in the caption going forward. Each party shall bear its own costs, attorneys' fees, and expenses. By Judge Christine M. Arguello on 03/08/2016. (athom, )
February 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER granting 45 Motion to Dismiss Party. Defendant Budget Control Services, Inc. is hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Each party shall bear their own costs, attorneys' fees, and expenses. By Judge Christine M. Arguello on 02/25/2016. (athom, )
January 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting 15 Motion to Dismiss Party. The caption in the above matter shall be corrected to delete "Harvard Mortgage Group,Inc., d/b/a CitiMortgage, Inc." and replace it with "CitiMortgage, Inc.". CitiMortgage, Inc. is dismissed, with prejudice, as a party-defendant. The parties shall each bear their own costs and attorneys' fees associated with this issue. By Judge Christine M. Arguello on 01/29/2016. (athom, )
December 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference set for 2/3/2016 10:00 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Consent Form due by 1/27/2016, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 12/2/15. (sgrim)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. Jacobson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA
Represented By: Jennifer Yu Golden(Designation Federal Agency Attorney)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerry L. Jacobson
Represented By: David A. Sprecace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tami P. Jacobson
Represented By: David A. Sprecace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Green Tree Lending
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harvard Mortgage Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Jacobson
Represented By: David A. Sprecace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Air Academy Federal Credit Union
Represented By: Neal Keith Dunning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Budget Control Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas County Treasurer
Represented By: Christopher Kirk Pratt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colorado State Dept. of Revenue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?