Newell v. DXP Enterprises, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Dale Ann Newell
Defendant: DXP Enterprises, Inc. and Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2015cv02612
Filed: November 30, 2015
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Watanabe
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 19, 2016 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 25 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff's Third and Fourth Claims for Relief are dismissed, with prejudice, each party to bear its own costs and fees associated therewith. By Judge Christine M. Arguello on 02/19/2016. (athom, )
January 26, 2016 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - Notice of Disclosure, by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 1/26/2016. (vbarn)
December 3, 2015 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE AND SETTING DEADLINE FOR FILING OF CONSENT/NON-CONSENT FORM. On or before 1/25/2016 parties shall complete and file the Consent / Non-Consent Form 6 . Consent Form due by 1/25/2016. Scheduling Conference set for 2/8/2016 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 12/3/2015. (emill)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Newell v. DXP Enterprises, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dale Ann Newell
Represented By: David Anthony Simmental
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DXP Enterprises, Inc.
Represented By: Mark C. Overturf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Jack M. Englert, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?