Debuhr et al v. Hern et al
Plaintiff: Jennifer Debuhr and Jason Debuhr
Defendant: Warren M. Hern and Boulder Abortion Clinic, P.C,
Case Number: 1:2015cv02613
Filed: November 30, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Michael E. Hegarty
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury- Medical Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 136 MINUTE ORDER re juror questionnaire. Any comments or objections to the questionnaire or to the questionnaire procedure explained in this order must be filed no later than Thursday, January 4, 2018. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 1/2/18. (pabsec)
December 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER. Defendants' Motion in Limine to Preclude New, Undisclosed, and Unsupported Theory on Informed Consent Raised During the Final Trial Preparation Conference [Docket No. 115 ] is granted. Plaintiffs are barred from arguing or admitting evidence at trial claiming that Dr. Hern should have informed Ms. DeBuhr of the possibility to go to Nebraska to have the abortion completed by Dr. Robertson. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 12/22/2017. (athom, )
November 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER. The Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge, Docket No. 72 at 5, is accepted. The deadline for designations of deposition testimony for plaintiffs' medical experts, Drs. Carlson, Torell, and Arias, is extended to November 29, 2017. Objections shall be filed on or before December 6, 2017. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 11/29/17. (pabsec)
September 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER denying 43 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 09/27/2017. (sphil, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Debuhr et al v. Hern et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Debuhr
Represented By: Terry C. Dougherty
Represented By: Kory Douglas George
Represented By: Laura Jilayne Sova
Represented By: Audrey R. Svane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Debuhr
Represented By: Terry C. Dougherty
Represented By: Kory Douglas George
Represented By: Laura Jilayne Sova
Represented By: Audrey R. Svane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warren M. Hern
Represented By: Amy E. Cook-Olson
Represented By: Kay J. Rice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boulder Abortion Clinic, P.C,
Represented By: Amy E. Cook-Olson
Represented By: Kay J. Rice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?