Intelligent Office System, LLC, The v. Virtualink Canada, Ltd. et al
Plaintiff: Intelligent Office System, LLC, The
Defendant: Virtualink Canada, Ltd. and Brian Monteith
Case Number: 1:2015cv02724
Filed: December 16, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Boulder
Presiding Judge: Christine M. Arguello
Nature of Suit: Franchise
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER granting 62 Motion to Supplement, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 1/26/2017. The Clerk of the Court is directed to file the Supplemental Complaint found at ECF No. 62-1. (slibi, )
February 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER denying 9 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. By Judge Christine M. Arguello on 02/18/2016. (athom, )
February 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER denying 25 Motion for Leave to Allow Telephonic Testimony of Michael Jones, by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 2/9/2016.(vbarn)
February 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 30 MINUTE ORDER granting 26 Motion to Withdraw or Dismiss as Moot Defendants' Motion for Protective Order, and withdrawing 23 Motion for Protective Order by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 02/05/2016.(mdave, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Intelligent Office System, LLC, The v. Virtualink Canada, Ltd. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Intelligent Office System, LLC, The
Represented By: Harold R. Bruno, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Virtualink Canada, Ltd.
Represented By: James D. Kilroy
Represented By: Neal J.G. McConomy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Monteith
Represented By: James D. Kilroy
Represented By: Neal J.G. McConomy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?