Gahan v. Sanofi S.A. et al
Plaintiff: Kelly Gahan
Defendant: Sanofi S.A., Aventis Pharma S.A., Sanofi-Aventis U.S., Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, Sanofi US Services Inc. and Winthrop U.S.
Case Number: 1:2015cv02777
Filed: December 21, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: Raymond P. Moore
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Watanabe
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 42 MINUTE ORDER : Granting 40 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Reset Defendants' Deadline to Respond to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint and Jury Demand and to Withdraw Defendants' Motion to Dismiss; Withdrawing 38 Sanofi-Av entis U.S. LLC and Sanofi US Services Inc.'s Motion and Memorandum in Support to Dismiss Plaintiff's Claims. Deadline for Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC and Sanofi US Services Inc. to file an answer or otherwise respond to the First Amended C omplaint and Jury Demand 25 is 7/5/2016. Scheduling Conference 4/6/2016 09:00 AM is CONVERTED to a Status Conference. Deadline to file proposed scheduling order is vacated. Status Conference set for 4/6/2016 09:00 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 3/7/2016.(emill)
January 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER Discharging 8 Order to Show Cause, by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 01/07/2016. (cthom, )
December 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Setting Scheduling/Planning Conference for 2/22/2016 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 12/23/2015. (slibi, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gahan v. Sanofi S.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelly Gahan
Represented By: Steven Paul Johnston
Represented By: Darin Lee Schanker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi S.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aventis Pharma S.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi-Aventis U.S., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi US Services Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Winthrop U.S.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?