Rankin et al v. USAA Casualty Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Rankin, Celia Rankin and Todd Rankin
Defendant: USAA Casualty Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2016cv00373
Filed: February 16, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Boulder
Presiding Judge: William J Martinez
Referring Judge: Scott T Varholak
2 Judge: Nina Y Wang
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 98 Civil Case Terminated pursuant to #97 STIPULATION for Dismissal with Prejudice filed in this case on 11/13/2017. Text Only Entry (angar, )
November 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 97 STIPULATION for Dismissal with Prejudice by Defendant USAA Casualty Insurance Company. (Moseley, Jeremy)
October 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER: This matter is before the Court on the Parties' Joint Notice of Settlement of all Claims and Motion to Vacate Trial 357 . In reliance upon counsel's representations to the Court contained in their Notice of Settlement, and consistent with WJM Revised Practice Standards IV.C.2., the Final Trial Preparation Conference set for November 9, 2017 and the 10-day Jury trial set to commence on November 27, 2017 are hereby VACATED. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to TERMINATE all pending Motions, without prejudice to renewal in the event that the parties' settlement is not finalized. It is FURTHER ORDERED that final dismissal papers shall be filed on or before November 17, 2017. SO ORDERED Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
October 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 95 NOTICE of Settlement Stipulated by Plaintiffs Celia Rankin, Todd Rankin (Henderson, Thomas)
October 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER: This matter is before the Court on the parties' Joint Status Report Regarding Mediation #91 . That document promised a further status report by October 23, 2017, but the parties filed nothing on that date and have filed nothing since. Accordingly, the parties are ORDERED to file a supplemental joint status report no later than 4:30 p.m. TODAY, describing the current status of their settlement negotiations. If the parties have reached a settlement, they may instead file a notice of settlement in compliance with WJM Revised Practice Standard IV.C. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 10/26/2017. Text Only Entry (wjmlc1)
October 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER granting the Parties' Joint Motion to Amend Pretrial Motion in Limine Deadline #92 . The Parties are granted leave, for good cause shown, to submit motions in limine on or before October 26, 2017. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 10/19/2017. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
October 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 92 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify Pretrial Motion in Limine Deadline by Plaintiffs Celia Rankin, Todd Rankin. (Boyle, Nelson)
October 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 91 STATUS REPORT re: Mediation by Plaintiffs Celia Rankin, Todd Rankin. (Henderson, Thomas)
October 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 90 REPLY to Response to #82 MOTION to Exclude Opinions of Plaintiffs' Insurance Expert that are Based on the Wrong Sections of the Policy filed by Defendant USAA Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit D)(Moseley, Jeremy)
September 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 89 REPLY to Response to #83 MOTION to Strike Testimony of Steven Plitt, Esq. filed by Plaintiffs Celia Rankin, Todd Rankin. (Boyle, Nelson)
September 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 88 RESPONSE to #82 MOTION to Exclude Opinions of Plaintiffs' Insurance Expert that are Based on the Wrong Sections of the Policy filed by Plaintiffs Celia Rankin, Todd Rankin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)(Boyle, Nelson)
September 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 87 RESPONSE to #83 MOTION to Strike Testimony of Steven Plitt, Esq. filed by Defendant USAA Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Moseley, Jeremy)
September 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER: Before the Court is the parties' Joint Response to Order to Show Cause #81 . In light of the parties' expressed willingness to attempt to resolve their remaining disputes through mediation, the parties are hereby ORDERED to attend a private mediation concluding no later than October 16, 2017. The parties shall file a joint status report regarding the outcome of that mediation no later than two business days after the conclusion of the mediation. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 09/12/2017. Text Only Entry (wjmlc1)
September 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER granting Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for One-Day Extension of Time to Submit F.R.E. 702 Motion (#083) #84 . Plaintiffs are granted leave, for good cause shown, to file said Motion on or before September 1, 2017. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the Plaintiffs' F.R.E. 702 Motion to Preclude Testimony from Steven Plitt #83 is ACCEPTED as filed. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 9/1/2017. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
September 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 84 First MOTION for Extension of Time to SUBMIT F.R.E. 702 MOTION (#083) by Plaintiffs Celia Rankin, Todd Rankin. (Boyle, Nelson)
August 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 83 MOTION to Strike Testimony of Steven Plitt, Esq. by Plaintiffs Celia Rankin, Todd Rankin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 249, #3 Exhibit 250)(Boyle, Nelson)
August 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 82 MOTION to Exclude Opinions of Plaintiffs' Insurance Expert that are Based on the Wrong Sections of the Policy by Defendant USAA Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Moseley, Jeremy)
August 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 81 RESPONSE to #79 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment,,,, and Joint Response to Order to Show Cause by Defendant USAA Casualty Insurance Company. (Moseley, Jeremy)
August 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 80 MINUTE ORDER. Per the agreement of the parties and in light of #79 Order on Pending Cross-Motions for Summary Judgment, the Discovery Hearing set for 8/30/2017 03:00 PM is VACATED, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 8/30/2017. Text Only Entry (stvlc1, )
August 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER on Pending Cross-Motions for Summary Judgment. USAA's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (ECF No. #54 ) is GRANTED. The Rankins' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (ECF No. #55 ) is DENIED. No later than this Thursday, August 31, 2017, the parties are ORDERED TO SEPARATELY SHOW CAUSE why they should not be ordered to private mediation on or before October 16, 2017 to attempt to resolve whatever disputes remain in this lawsuit, ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 08/29/2017. (angar, )
August 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 78 MINUTE ORDER Discovery Hearing set for 8/30/2017 03:00 PM in Courtroom C203 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. By Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 8/2/2017. Text Only Entry (stvlc2, )
June 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 77 NOTICE re #76 Order on Motion to Strike Plaintiffs' Notice of Compliance with Court's June 19, 2017 Order (Doc 76) by Plaintiffs Celia Rankin, Todd Rankin (Henderson, Thomas)
June 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #68 Motion to Strike Untimely Disclosed Trial Witnesses McLean, Tatlah, Wegen, and Michelson, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 6/19/2017. (jgonz, )
June 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 75 MINUTE ENTRY for Motion Hearing held before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak held on 6/8/2017. #68 Defendant USAA CICs Motion to Strike Untimely Disclosed Trial Witnesses McLean, Tatlah, Wegen, and Michelson is TAKEN UNDER ADVISEMENT. Hearing concluded. FTR: STV - C203. (morti, )
June 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 74 REPLY to Response to #68 MOTION to Strike Untimely Disclosed Trial Witnesses McLean, Tatlah, Wegen, and Michelson filed by Defendant USAA Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit C - Plitt, S. - condensed transcript 4-25-2017, #2 Exhibit D - Lewis, Liberty - condensed transcript 3-3-2017, #3 Exhibit E - Todd Rankin - condensed transcript 10-18-2016)(Mulvania, Michael)
May 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 73 MINUTE ORDER. Motion Hearing re: #68 Defendant's Motion to Strike Untimely Disclosed Trial Witnesses McLean, Tatlah, Wegen, and Michelson set for 6/8/2017 11:00 AM in Courtroom C205 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. SO ORDERED, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 5/22/2017. Text Only Entry (stvlc1, )
May 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES:re: #71 Response to Motion filed by attorney Thomas W. Henderson. The s/signature did not match the filers name on the account for which the login and password are registered. DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - future documents must be filed pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 4.3(c) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases).(Text Only Entry) (angar, )
May 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 71 RESPONSE to #68 MOTION to Strike Untimely Disclosed Trial Witnesses McLean, Tatlah, Wegen, and Michelson filed by Plaintiffs Celia Rankin, Todd Rankin. (Boyle, Nelson)
April 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 70 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge William J. Martinez: Status Conference held on 4/28/2017. ORDERED:A ten-day jury trial is set at 8:30 a.m., Monday, November 27, 2017, concluding on Friday, December 8, 2017.ORDERED:A Final Trial Preparation Conference is set Thursday, November 9, 2017 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom A801 before Judge William J. Martinez. Court Reporter: Darlene Martinez. (dhans, )
April 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 69 MEMORANDUM regarding #68 MOTION to Strike Untimely Disclosed Trial Witnesses McLean, Tatlah, Wegen, and Michelson filed by USAA Casualty Insurance Company. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak by Judge William J. Martinez on 4/28/2017. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
April 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 68 MOTION to Strike Untimely Disclosed Trial Witnesses McLean, Tatlah, Wegen, and Michelson by Defendant USAA Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Plaintiffs Fifteenth Supplemental Disclosures 3-16-17, #2 Exhibit B - Excerpts from Celia Rankin Deposition Transcript 08-09-16)(Mulvania, Michael)
April 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 67 Exhibits in Support of #59 Response to Motion,, Plaintiffs' Unopposed Submission of Corrected Exhibits to Their Response to Defendant USAA Casualty Insurance Company's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by Plaintiffs Celia Rankin, Todd Rankin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Corrected Exhibit 7, #2 Exhibit Corrected Exhibit 9, #3 Exhibit Corrected Exhibit 10, #4 Exhibit Corrected Exhibit 12, #5 Exhibit Corrected Exhibit 14, #6 Exhibit Corrected Exhibit 22)(Henderson, Thomas)
March 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER: This matter is before the Court sua sponte as a result of Counsel's' failure to comply with this Court's Revised Practice Standard V.D. In the #65 Final Pretrial Order entered on March 23, 2017, Counsel stipulated that trial would take an estimated 10 days. Pursuant to this Court's Revised Practice Standards, trials in excess of 5 days will not be set until a Status Conference is held to consider the necessity of a trial in excess of one week. The Court will therefore set a Status Conference without input from counsel for April 28, 2017 at 10:00 a.m in Courtroom A801, and WILL NOT reset the Status Conference absent substantial good cause. The Final Trial Preparation Conference and Trial will be scheduled at this time. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 3/29/2017. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
March 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 65 FINAL PRETRIAL ORDER by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 3/23/2017. (morti, )
March 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 64 MINUTE ENTRY for Final Pretrial Conference held before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 3/23/2017. It is ORDERED: The proposed Final Pretrial Order which was submitted to the court is approved with interlineations and made an order of court. Hearing concluded. FTR: STV - C205. (morti, )
March 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 63 Proposed Pretrial Order Joint with Attachments by Plaintiffs Celia Rankin, Todd Rankin. (Henderson, Thomas)
February 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 62 NOTICE re #60 Reply to Response to Motion, Resubmission of Exhibits Filed in Support of Reply, by Plaintiffs Celia Rankin, Todd Rankin (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 6, #2 Exhibit 7, #3 Exhibit 8, #4 Exhibit 9, #5 Exhibit 10, #6 Exhibit 11, #7 Exhibit 12, #8 Exhibit 13, #9 Exhibit 14)(Boyle, Nelson)
February 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 61 BRIEF in Support of #54 Partial MOTION for Summary Judgment (Reply Brief) filed by Defendant USAA Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit N - Lewis supp. report, #2 Exhibit O - Dave Stroman report 10-20-2016, #3 Exhibit P - Johnson transcript 10-11-2016, #4 Exhibit Q - Bridger e-mail 7-18-2014, #5 Exhibit R - Buettner transcript 10-13-2016, #6 Exhibit S - Claim Activity Log, #7 Exhibit T - Buettner letter 12-16-2014, USAACIC_001207, #8 Exhibit U - Perpar, John - condensed transcript 11-15-2016, #9 Exhibit V - Todd Rankin transcript 10-18-2016)(Moseley, Jeremy)
February 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 60 REPLY to Response to #55 Partial MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiffs Celia Rankin, Todd Rankin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 6, #2 Exhibit 7, #3 Exhibit 8, #4 Exhibit 9, #5 Exhibit 10, #6 Exhibit 11, #7 Exhibit 12, #8 Exhibit 13, #9 Exhibit 14)(Boyle, Nelson)
February 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 59 RESPONSE to #54 Partial MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiffs Celia Rankin, Todd Rankin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23)(Boyle, Nelson)
February 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 58 RESPONSE to #55 Partial MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Defendant USAA Casualty Insurance Company. (Moseley, Jeremy)
February 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER granting the Parties' Joint Motion for 3-Day Extension of Time to Submit Responses to Cross-Motions for Partial Summary Judgment (Doc. #54 & #55) #56 . The Parties are granted leave, for good cause shown, to file said Responses on or before February 13, 2017. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 2/13/2017. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
February 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 56 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Cross-Motions for Partial Summary Judgment (Docs 54 and 55) by Plaintiffs Celia Rankin, Todd Rankin. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Boyle, Nelson)
January 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 55 Partial MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by Plaintiffs Celia Rankin, Todd Rankin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit USAA HO-9R Policy, #2 Exhibit Johnson Dep. (excerpts), #3 Exhibit Xactimate Estimates, #4 Exhibit Pace Dep. (excerpts), #5 Exhibit Buettner Dep. (excerpts))(Boyle, Nelson)
January 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 54 Partial MOTION for Summary Judgment by Defendant USAA Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Policy Excerpts, #2 Exhibit B - C. Rankin Depo Excerpts, #3 Exhibit C - Excerpts from Lewis Report, #4 Exhibit D - 5-20-15 de Alva email, #5 Exhibit E - T. Rankin Depo Excerpts, #6 Exhibit F - de Alva Depo Excerpts, #7 Exhibit G - USAA estimate Dec 23 2014, #8 Exhibit H - Depo Excerpts of Buettner, #9 Exhibit I - Excerpts from Claim Log, #10 Exhibit J - March 2015 Covington letter, #11 Exhibit K - M. Adams Depo Excerpts, #12 Exhibit L - May 2014 PTC Report, #13 Exhibit M - Shure Report)(Mulvania, Michael)
January 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER granting #49 Motion for Extension of Expert Deposition Deadline and Final Pretrial Conference. The deadline for completion of expert depositions is extended until 2/28/2017. The Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/7/2017 10:30 AM is VACATED and RESET for 3/23/2017 10:00 AM in Courtroom C205 before Magistrate Judge Scott T Varholak. The parties shall submit their Proposed Pretrial Order on or before 3/16/2017, by Magistrate Judge Scott T Varholak on 1/09/2017. Text Only Entry (stvlc1, )
January 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 52 MEMORANDUM regarding #49 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to for Expert Deposition Deadline and Final Pretrial Conference filed by USAA Casualty Insurance Company. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Scott T Varholak, by Judge William J. Martinez on 1/09/2017. Text Only Entry (slibi, )
January 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 50 MEMORANDUM regarding #49 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to for Expert Deposition Deadline and Final Pretrial Conference filed by USAA Casualty Insurance Company. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang by Judge William J. Martinez on 1/9/2017. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
January 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 49 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to for Expert Deposition Deadline and Final Pretrial Conference by Defendant USAA Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Mulvania, Michael)
November 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES: re: #47 Notice (Other) filed by attorney Thomas Henderson. The document was scanned and not converted directly to portable document format (PDF). DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - future documents must be filed pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 1.3(f) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil Cases). (Text Only Entry) (cthom, )
November 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 47 NOTICE Amended Notice of Deposition for John Witkamp by Plaintiffs Celia Rankin, Todd Rankin (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Henderson, Thomas)
October 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 51 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #49 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to for Expert Deposition Deadline and Final Pretrial Conference. This case was drawn in error. It has been assigned to Magistrate Judge Scott T Varholak in the referral role. All future pleadings should be designated as 16-cv-00373-WJM-STV. (Text Only Entry) (slibi, )
October 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 46 CASE REASSIGNED. This action is reassigned to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak, upon his appointment. All future pleadings should reference Magistrate Judge Varholak at the beginning of the civil action number (such as 15-cv-00001-WJM-STV). Unless otherwise ordered, the dates and times for all previously scheduled matters will be maintained and will now be handled by Magistrate Judge Varholak in Courtroom C-205. His chambers are located in Room C-254 of the Byron G. Rogers Courthouse. His telephone number is 303-335-2365. (Text only entry) (tscha, )
September 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER granting #43 UNOPPOSED SECOND MOTION BY PLAINTIFFS FOR EXTENSION OF DEADLINE TO FILE A MOTION TO AMEND COMPLAINT TO ADD REQUEST FOR EXEMPLARY DAMAGES. Plaintiffs have up to and including October 20, 2016, to file their motion to amend their Complaint to include exemplary damages. Furthermore, Counsel is hereby notified that all future motions requesting an extension of time must comply with Judge Martinez's Practice Standards II.D.2, "Absent a true emergency, no motion for an extension of time to file a document or for continuance of a hearing shall be considered unless it is filed on or before the court business day preceding the original filing deadline or hearing date." Future noncompliance will result in the motion being stricken or denied without substantive consideration. By Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 9/16/2016. Text Only Entry(nywlc2, )
September 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 44 MEMORANDUM regarding #43 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Motion to Amend Complaint to Add Reqeust for Exemplary Damages filed by Celia Rankin, Todd Rankin. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang by Judge William J. Martinez on 09/15/2016. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
September 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 43 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Motion to Amend Complaint to Add Reqeust for Exemplary Damages by Plaintiffs Celia Rankin, Todd Rankin. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Henderson, Thomas)
September 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 42 MINUTE ORDER: In light of #41 Minute Order, the telephonic status conference set for September 19, 2016, at 9:30am is VACATED. By Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 9/15/2016. Text Only Entry (nywlc2, )
September 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 41 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 9/14/16 re: re: #38 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time. The deadline for initial expert disclosures is EXTENDED to 10/20/2016; The deadline for rebuttal expert disclosures is EXTENDED to 11/28/2016; The discovery cut-off for EXPERTS is EXTENDED to 12/27/2016; The discovery cut-off for ALL ISSUES OTHER THAN EXPERT DISCLOSURES AND DEPOSITIONS REMAINS SET for 11/15/2016; The deadline for filing dispositive motions is EXTENDED to 1/20/2017; The Final Pretrial Conference REMAINS SET for 2/7/2017 at 10:30 a.m. (bwilk, )
September 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 40 MINUTE ORDER re: #38 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to for Expert Disclosure and Related Deadlines filed by USAA Casualty Insurance Company. It is ordered that a telephonic status conference is set to discuss the Parties' #38 Joint Motion for Extension of Time for Expert Disclosure and Related Deadlines. Counsel shall coordinate a conference call prior to contacting Chambers on one telephone line at (303) 335-2600 on September 19, 2016, at 9:30am. By Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 9/8/2016. Text Only Entry (nywlc2, )
September 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 39 MEMORANDUM regarding #38 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to for Expert Disclosure and Related Deadlines filed by USAA Casualty Insurance Company. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang by Judge William J. Martinez on 09/07/2016. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
September 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 38 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to for Expert Disclosure and Related Deadlines by Defendant USAA Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Moseley, Jeremy) Modified on 9/30/2016 to terminate pursuant to #41 (slibi, ).
August 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting #35 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File a Motion to Amend Complaint to Add Request for Exemplary Damages. The deadline to file the motion is extended to 9/15/2016. By Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 08/02/2016. Text Only Entry (nywlc2)
August 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 36 MEMORANDUM regarding #35 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Motion to Amend Complaint to Add Reqeust for Exemplary Damages filed by Celia Rankin, Todd Rankin. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang by Judge William J. Martinez on 08/02/2016. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
August 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 35 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Motion to Amend Complaint to Add Reqeust for Exemplary Damages by Plaintiffs Celia Rankin, Todd Rankin. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Henderson, Thomas)
July 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 34 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 7/28/16. The Joint Motion for Extension of Expert Disclosure and Related Deadlines #32 is GRANTED. (bsimm, )
July 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MEMORANDUM regarding #32 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Extend Expert Disclosure and Related Deadlines filed by USAA Casualty Insurance Company. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang by Judge William J. Martinez on 07/27/2016. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
July 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 32 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Extend Expert Disclosure and Related Deadlines by Defendant USAA Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Moseley, Jeremy)
May 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 31 PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 05/18/16. (nmarb, )
May 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 30 MEMORANDUM regarding #29 Unopposed MOTION for Protective Order filed by USAA Casualty Insurance Company. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang by Judge William J. Martinez on 05/18/2016. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
May 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 29 Unopposed MOTION for Protective Order by Defendant USAA Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Proposed Protective Order)(Moseley, Jeremy)
April 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 28 SCHEDULING ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 4/5/16. (bsimm, )
April 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 27 COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for Scheduling Conference held on 4/5/2016 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Deadline for joinder of parties and amendment of pleadings: 5/20/2016. Deadline to amend to add a claim for exemplary damages: 8/1/2016. All parties shall designate principal experts on or before: 8/1/2016. All parties shall designate rebuttal experts on or before: 9/1/2016. Discovery due by 10/1/2016. Dispositive Motions due by 11/1/2016. Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/7/2017 10:30 AM in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. The parties shall submit their proposed pretrial order through PACER, and include a courtesy copy of the proposed order in a Word format sent by email to Wang_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov, seven days prior to the conference. FTR: Courtroom C-204. (bsimm, )
March 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Proposed Scheduling Order by Plaintiffs Celia Rankin, Todd Rankin. (Henderson, Thomas)
March 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Magistrate Judge Wang is designated to conduct NDISPO proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 72(a) and (b). Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the Magistrate Judge or on the request of the parties by motion, the court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 03/18/2016. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
March 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 24 NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES: re: #22 Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge :Thomas Henderson has failed to comply with D.C.COLO.LCivR5.1(a) and 1.3(f) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil Cases), which mandate, with exceptions inapplicable here, that all documents shall be converted directly to portable document format (PDF) from software applications in which they were created (i.e., no scanned documents). Failure in the future to follow these procedures may lead to mandatory CM/ECF training or action by the court. (Text Only Entry) (cmira, )
March 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 23 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #22 Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. All parties do not consent. This case is reassigned to Judge William J. Martinez. All future pleadings should be designated as 16-cv-00373-WJM. (Text Only Entry) (nmarb, )
March 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 22 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiffs Celia Rankin, Todd Rankin All parties do not consent.. (Henderson, Thomas)
March 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 21 USAA Casualty Insurance Company's ANSWER to #6 Complaint by USAA Casualty Insurance Company.(Mulvania, Michael)
March 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MINUTE ORDER. Due to a conflict on the court's calendar, the Scheduling Conference previously set for 4/5/2016 at 2:30 PM is VACATED and reset for 4/5/2016 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. The parties shall submit their proposed scheduling order, including a copy of the proposed scheduling order in a Word format sent via email to Wang_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov, on or before 3/29/2016. The parties shall complete and file the Consent/Nonconsent Form by 3/22/2016. By Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 03/04/2016. Text Only Entry (nywlc2)
February 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 19 NOTICE of State Court Docket by Defendant USAA Casualty Insurance Company (Vaught, John)
February 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE AND SETTING DEADLINE FOR FILING OF CONSENT/NONCONSENT FORM by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 2/22/16. A Scheduling Conference is set for 4/5/2016 02:30 PM in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. The parties shall submit their proposed scheduling order, including a copy of the proposed scheduling order in a Word format sent via email to Wang_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov, on or before 3/29/2016. The parties shall complete and file the Consent/Nonconsent Form by 3/22/2016. (bsimm, )
February 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond. USAA Casualty Insurance Company's answer is due 3/8/2016. By Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 02/22/2016. Text Only Entry (nywlc2)
February 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (rkeec)
February 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 15 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #14 Memorandum Returning Case. This case is reassigned to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. All future pleadings should be designated as 16-cv-00373-NYW. (Text Only Entry) (rkeec)
February 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel. (rkeec)
February 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #6 Complaint by Defendant USAA Casualty Insurance Company. (Mulvania, Michael)
February 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of Michael N. Mulvania by Michael Norris Mulvania on behalf of USAA Casualty Insurance CompanyAttorney Michael Norris Mulvania added to party USAA Casualty Insurance Company(pty:dft) (Mulvania, Michael)
February 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Nelson Patrick Boyle on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Nelson Patrick Boyle added to party Celia Rankin(pty:pla), Attorney Nelson Patrick Boyle added to party Todd Rankin(pty:pla) (Boyle, Nelson)
February 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Thomas Willard Henderson, IV on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Thomas Willard Henderson, IV added to party Celia Rankin(pty:pla), Attorney Thomas Willard Henderson, IV added to party Todd Rankin(pty:pla) (Henderson, Thomas)
February 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (jgonz, )
February 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Case assigned to Judge Wiley Y. Daniel and drawn to Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer. Text Only Entry. (jgonz, )
February 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons, Complaint and Jury Demand, and District Court Civil Cover Sheet upon USAA Causualty Insurance Company on 01/25/2016, filed by Plaintiffs Celia Rankin, Todd Rankin (jgonz, )
February 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 6 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Celia Rankin, Todd Rankin.(jgonz, )
February 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ATTORNEY(S) IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED OR OTHER CASES: Pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 11.1(a), an attorney must be a member of the U.S. District Court's bar to make an appearance and receive notice in any case before the court. The attorney records of the court reflect that the following counsel is a member of the U.S. District Courts Bar, but has not entered an appearance in this case: Thomas Henderson. In order to make an appearance in this case and receive any further notice regarding this case, counsel must file an entry of appearance in this case. Absent any Notice of Entry of Appearance filed, no further direct notices to counsel will be sent. Text only entry. (jgonz, )
February 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of John M. Vaught by John Mark Vaught on behalf of USAA Casualty Insurance CompanyAttorney John Mark Vaught added to party USAA Casualty Insurance Company(pty:dft) (Vaught, John)
February 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jeremy A. Moseley on behalf of USAA Casualty Insurance Company (Moseley, Jeremy)
February 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Moseley, Jeremy)
February 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by USAA Casualty Insurance Company from San Miguel County District Court, Case Number 2016cv030001. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-4831476), filed by USAA Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Certified Policy, #2 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Michael Broker, #3 Exhibit 3 - Corporate Information, #4 Exhibit 4 - Demand Letter Excerpt, #5 Exhibit 5 - Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal (State Court), #6 Exhibit 6 - State Court Complaint and Jury Demand, #7 Exhibit 7 - State Court Summons, #8 Exhibit 8 - State Court Affidavit of Service, #9 Exhibit 9 - State Court Civil Case Cover Sheet, #10 Civil Cover Sheet, #11 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet)(Moseley, Jeremy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rankin et al v. USAA Casualty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rankin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Celia Rankin
Represented By: Nelson Patrick Boyle
Represented By: Thomas Willard Henderson, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Todd Rankin
Represented By: Nelson Patrick Boyle
Represented By: Thomas Willard Henderson, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USAA Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: John Mark Vaught
Represented By: Michael Norris Mulvania
Represented By: Jeremy A. Moseley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?