Katasi, Inc. v. ODBEDGE, LLC
Plaintiff: Katasi, Inc. and Katasi, LLC
Defendant: ODBEDGE, LLC and ODBEDGE, LLC a Louisiana limited liability company doing business as Cellcontrol
Case Number: 1:2016cv00439
Filed: February 23, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Boulder
Presiding Judge: Raymond P Moore
Referring Judge: Kathleen M Tafoya
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 7, 2016. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 7, 2016 Filing 16 Civil Case Terminated pursuant to #15 the notice of dismissal or stipulation to dismiss filed in this case Text Only Entry (cthom, )
March 7, 2016 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice by Plaintiff Katasi, Inc.. (Massey, Jeffrey)
February 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER. The Court ORDERS that on or before March 7, 2016, Plaintiff shall show cause why this case should not be dismissed due to this Court's lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 02/26/16. (jhawk, )
February 24, 2016 Filing 13 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of Counsel by Jeffrey A. Massey on behalf of Katasi, Inc.Attorney Jeffrey A. Massey added to party Katasi, Inc.(pty:pla) (Massey, Jeffrey)
February 24, 2016 Filing 12 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of Yiu F. Au by Yiu Fai Au on behalf of Katasi, Inc. (Au, Yiu)
February 24, 2016 Filing 11 NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES: re: #8 Notice of Entry of Appearance :Yiu Au has failed to comply with D.C.COLO.LCivR5.1(a) and 4.3(d) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil Cases), which mandate the correct form for an attorneys signature block. Failure in the future to follow these procedures may lead to mandatory CM/ECF training, or action by the court. (Text Only Entry) (cthom, )
February 24, 2016 Filing 10 NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES: re: #6 Notice of Entry of Appearance :Jeff Massey has failed to comply with D.C.COLO.LCivR5.1(a) and 4.3(d) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil Cases), which mandate the correct form for an attorneys signature block. Failure in the future to follow these procedures may lead to mandatory CM/ECF training, or action by the court. (Text Only Entry) (cthom, )
February 24, 2016 Filing 9 NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES: re: #6 Notice of Entry of Appearance :Jeff Massey has failed to comply with D.C.COLO.LCivR5.1(a) and 4.3(c) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil Cases) which mandate that the s/ signature must match the filers name on the account for which the login and password are registered. Counsel must re-file the above referenced document. (Text Only Entry) (cthom, )
February 24, 2016 Filing 8 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of Yiu F. Au by Yiu Fai Au on behalf of Katasi, Inc.Attorney Yiu Fai Au added to party Katasi, Inc.(pty:pla) (Au, Yiu)
February 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct a pretrial conference and enter a pretrial order, and (5) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions. Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. Entered by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 2/24/2016. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec )
February 24, 2016 Filing 6 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of Jeff Massey by Scott Joseph Hawranek on behalf of Katasi, Inc. (Hawranek, Scott)
February 24, 2016 Filing 5 NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES: re: #2 Complaint, :Yiu Fai Au has failed to comply with D.C.COLO.LCivR5.1(a) and 4.3(c) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil Cases) which mandate that the s/ signature must match the filers name on the account for which the login and password are registered. Counsel must re-file the above referenced document. (Text Only Entry) (dbera, )
February 24, 2016 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (dbera, )
February 24, 2016 Filing 3 Case assigned to Judge Raymond P. Moore and drawn to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Text Only Entry (dbera, )
February 24, 2016 Filing 2 COMPLAINT Katasi, Inc. against ODBEDGE, LLC (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-4844759)Attorney Scott Joseph Hawranek added to party Katasi, Inc.(pty:pla), filed by Katasi, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons)(Hawranek, Scott)
February 23, 2016 Filing 1 Administrative Notice: No initiating document. Attorney contacted with instructions to file the initiating document within 24 hours. (Text Only Entry) (dbera, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Katasi, Inc. v. ODBEDGE, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katasi, Inc.
Represented By: Yiu Fai Au
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Massey
Represented By: Scott J. Hawranek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katasi, LLC
Represented By: Yiu Fai Au
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Massey
Represented By: Scott J. Hawranek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ODBEDGE, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ODBEDGE, LLC a Louisiana limited liability company doing business as Cellcontrol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?