Hodson v. Fisher et al
Plaintiff: Travis Hodson
Defendant: Birgit Fisher, Thomas Quammen, Steve Reams, Janice Ort and Steve Doolittle
Case Number: 1:2016cv00446
Filed: February 22, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Pueblo
Presiding Judge: Gordon P. Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER denying 66 Motion for Order, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 9/21/2017. (tsher, )
July 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER DISMISSING CASE by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 07/21/2017. Court DISMISSES this case WITHOUT PREJUDICE for Plaintiffs failure to prosecute this action. The Clerk of the Court is directed to close this case. (mdave, )
March 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 47 MINUTE ORDER denying 45 Motion for More Definite Statement Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(e) by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 3/20/2017. (slibi, )
March 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT. ORDERED that within thirty days from the date of this Order, Plaintiff shall file an Amended Complaint that complies with this Order, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 3/27/2016. (agarc, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hodson v. Fisher et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travis Hodson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Birgit Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Quammen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Reams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janice Ort
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Doolittle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?