Cypress Advisors, Inc. v. Davis
Plaintiff: Cypress Advisors, Inc.
Defendant: Kent McCarty Davis
Case Number: 1:2016cv01935
Filed: July 29, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Douglas
Presiding Judge: Michael E. Hegarty
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 311 ORDER ON DECLARATORY AND EQUITABLE CLAIMS by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 5/4/2021. ORDERED that the Court enters the following declaratory judgment: Dean Zuccarello and Kent Davis are free to contact and compete for clients previously se rviced by Kent Davis and Dean Zuccarello through the Cypress Group and Cypress Advisors. ORDERED that the other requests for declaratory judgment made by any party are DENIED. ORDERED that Mr. Davis's equitable claims are DISMISSED with prejudice. ORDERED that this case is closed. (sphil, )
February 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 282 MINUTE ORDER. The Court has prepared a proposed set of introductory jury instructions, which are attached to this Order, in the event that this case goes to trial on February 10, 2020. See United States v. Murillo, 19-cr-00480 (set February 10, 2020 for two days). These instructions will be read to the jury after jury selection, but before opening statements Any objections to or comments about the proposed introductory jury instructions shall be filed on or before Thursday, February 6, 2020, by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 2/4/2020. (angar, )
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 201 ORDER by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 9/3/2019, re: 175 Motion to Consolidate Related Cases for Trial is GRANTED. ORDERED that, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 42(a) and D.C.COLO.LCivR 42.1, Civil Action Nos. 16-cv-01935-PAB-MEH and 1 7-cv-01219-MSK-KLM shall be consolidated for trial. ORDERED that, pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 42.1, Civil Action No. 17-cv- 01219 shall be assigned to Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer. ORDERED that Civil Action 17-cv-01219 shall hereafter be referred to the magistrate judge assigned to the lowest numbered case, Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. ORDERED that, within three days of this order, the parties shall jointly contact Judge Hegarty's chambers to set a supplemental final pretrial conference..(sphil, )
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 164 OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 142 Motion for Summary Judgment, 143 Motion for Summary Judgment, and 144 Motion for Summary Judgment by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 3/18/19. The parties' Motions to Restrict Access ( 148 , 149 , 154 , 157 , 160 , and 161 ) are denied. (dkals, )
July 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 87 Recommendation Of United States Magistrate Judge by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 7/21/2017. 74 Counter Defendants' Partial Motion to Dismiss Amended Counterclaims Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) is granted in part and denied in part. (tsher, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cypress Advisors, Inc. v. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cypress Advisors, Inc.
Represented By: Bradford Evan Dempsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kent McCarty Davis
Represented By: K. C. Groves
Represented By: Mark E. Lacis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?