Tso v. Murray

Plaintiff: Gilbert T. Tso
Defendant: Rebecca Murray, Tanya Akins, Tanya (I) Akins, Sherr Puttmann Akins Lamb PC, Jeannie Ridings, Jeannie (I) Ridings, Kililis Ridings & Vanau PC, Russell (I) M. Murray, Dena (I) Murray, Joanne (I) Jensen, David P. Brodsky, David (I) P. Brodsky, Elizabeth A. Starrs, Elizabeth (I) A. Starrs, Charles D. Johnson, Charles (I) D. Johnson, Ross B.H. Buchanan, Ross (I) B.H. Buchanan, David H. Goldberg, David (I) H. Goldberg, County of Lake, The, Illinois, State of Illinois, The, Mitch McKee, Monica Jackson, Monica (I) Jackson, Lara Delka, Lara (I) Delka, City & County of Denver, Colorado, and State of Colorado, The
Case Number: 1:2016cv02480
Filed: October 3, 2016
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: William J. Martinez
Referring Judge: Craig B. Shaffer
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 28, 2018 282 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Adopting 237 Recommendations of Magistrate Judge Granting Defendants' Motions to Dismiss and Dismissing Plaintiff's Claims. Plaintiff's Amended Written Objection to the Magistrate Judge's Proposed Findings and Recommendati ons (ECF No. 259 ) is OVERRULED; The Murray Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. 135 ) is GRANTED; The Denver Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. 137 ) is GRANTED; The Colorado Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. 139 ) i s GRANTED; The SPAL Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. 141 ) is GRANTED; The Illinois Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. 142 ) is GRANTED; Dr. Spiegle's Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. 186 ) is GRANTED; Plaintiff's Object ion and Motion for Court Review of Magistrate Judge's Order to Supplement (ECF NO. 170 ), reviewed as an Objection under Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(b) to Judge Shaffer's Order (ECF No. 169 ) denying Plaintiff's Verified Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Complaint (ECF No. 163 ), is OVERRULED as futile. ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 2/28/2018. (angar, )
February 1, 2018 272 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 268 Plaintiffs Complaint re: ECF #135 Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 11(b)(3) and 11(b)(4) and Motion for Sanctions and DENIES WITHOUT PREJUDICE Defendants request for their reasonable expenses, including attorneys fees and costs, incurred in responding to the Motion, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 2/1/2018. (jgonz, )
August 9, 2017 207 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Overruling Objections Pursuant to Fed. R. CIV. P. 72(a). Judge Shaffer's Order (ECF No. 168 ) is AFFIRMED and Plaintiffs Motion (ECF No. 190 ) is OVERRULED. ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 08/09/2017. (angar, )
July 21, 2017 182 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying Preliminary Injunction and Temporary Restraining Order. "Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause Why a Preliminary Injunction Should Not Issue" (ECF No. 131 ) is DENIED; "Emergency Motion for Court Review of ECF # 131 and # 132 and to GRANT TRO Instanter" (ECF No. 181 ) is GRANTED to the extent the Court has now provided the review requested, but is in all other respects DENIED; "Colorado Defendants' and Denver Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Verified Complaint for Emergency Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction (ECF No. 164 ) is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART, as set forth above; The Motion by Defendants Rebecca Murray, et al. for Joinder in ECF No. 164 (ECF No. 173 ) is GRANTED by Judge William J. Martinez on 07/21/2017. (angar, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tso v. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gilbert T. Tso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rebecca Murray
Represented By: Richard Maxton Murray
Represented By: Ryan Earl Warren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tanya Akins
Represented By: Kelly L. Kafer
Represented By: Tory Drew Riter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tanya (I) Akins
Represented By: Kelly L. Kafer
Represented By: Tory Drew Riter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sherr Puttmann Akins Lamb PC
Represented By: Kelly L. Kafer
Represented By: Tory Drew Riter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeannie Ridings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeannie (I) Ridings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kililis Ridings & Vanau PC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Russell (I) M. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dena (I) Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joanne (I) Jensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David P. Brodsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David (I) P. Brodsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth A. Starrs
Represented By: Allison R. Ailer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth (I) A. Starrs
Represented By: Allison R. Ailer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles D. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles (I) D. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ross B.H. Buchanan
Represented By: Allison R. Ailer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ross (I) B.H. Buchanan
Represented By: Allison R. Ailer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David H. Goldberg
Represented By: Allison R. Ailer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David (I) H. Goldberg
Represented By: Allison R. Ailer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Lake, The, Illinois
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Illinois, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mitch McKee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monica Jackson
Represented By: Robert Alan Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monica (I) Jackson
Represented By: Robert Alan Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lara Delka
Represented By: Robert Alan Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lara (I) Delka
Represented By: Robert Alan Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City & County of Denver, Colorado,
Represented By: Robert Alan Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Colorado, The
Represented By: Allison R. Ailer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?