Church Mutual Insurance Company v. Coutu et al
Plaintiff: Church Mutual Insurance Company
Defendant: Phillip Marshall Coutu, Power Adjusters, Inc., Judah Leon Bensusan and Atlantis Claims Services, LLC
Case Number: 1:2017cv00209
Filed: January 23, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Nina Y. Wang
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 207 AMENDED ORDER ON MOTION TO COMPEL by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 5/25/2018. Defendants' Motion to Compel 189 is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. This Order amends and supersedes 201 Order on Motion to Compel. (nywlc2, )
March 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 183 OPINION AND ORDER ADOPTS IN PART the 166 Report and Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge; GRANTS the 128 Motion to Amend; REJECTS defendants' 170 Objections to the Report and Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge; RE JECTS AS MOOT the September 13, 2017 120 Report and Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge; DENIES AS MOOT Defendants' 65 Motion to Dismiss; DENIES AS MOOT Defendants' 179 Motion to Dismiss; and, DENIES AS MOOT Plaintiff's 182 Motion for an Extension of time to Respond. Plaintiff is ORDERED to file a clean copy of its Second Amended Complaint (ECF No. 128-1) as a separate docket entry. ORDERED by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 3/28/2018. (cthom, )
February 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 166 RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 2/12/2018. This court respectfully RECOMMENDS that 128 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint filed by Church Mutual Insurance Company be GRANTED. (nywlc2, )
September 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 9/25/2017. IT IS ORDERED that: Interested Party Keith Frankl's Motion to Quash Subpoena to Non-Party Keith Frankl and/or the Frankl Law Firm, P.C. 91 is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART; and Defendants' Motion to Quash Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 45(d)(3)(B) of Subpoena Duces Tecum to the Frankl Law Firm and For Protective Order 92 is GRANTED. (nywlc2, )
September 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 120 RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 9/13/2017. This court respectfully RECOMMENDS that Defendants' Joint MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim 65 be GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART; that Claims I and II REMAIN and Claims III-V be DISMISSED; and that any leave to amend be DENIED without prejudice. (nywlc2, )
August 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 103 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 8/2/2017. Defendants' Forthwith Joint Motion To Stay Disclosures And Discovery Until The Court Rules On Defendants' Joint Motion To Dismiss 64 is DENIED. (nywlc2, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Church Mutual Insurance Company v. Coutu et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Church Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Anthony Carl Barbe
Represented By: Jeremy A. Moseley
Represented By: Terence M. Ridley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phillip Marshall Coutu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Power Adjusters, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judah Leon Bensusan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atlantis Claims Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?