Noflin v. Board of County Commissioners of the County of Garfield, The
Plaintiff: Noflin and Wade Noflin
Defendant: Garfield County (Colorado) Government and Board of County Commissioners of the County of Garfield, The
Case Number: 1:2017cv00337
Filed: February 6, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Pueblo
Presiding Judge: Kathleen M Tafoya
Referring Judge: Michael J Watanabe
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000 e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 Civil Case Terminated pursuant to 33 ORDER granting #32 Stipulated Motion to Dismiss on 9/13/2017. Text Only Entry (jgonz, )
September 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting #32 Stipulated Motion to Dismiss. This action is dismissed with prejudice, each party to pay his or its own attorney's fees and costs. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 9/13/17. Text Only Entry (kmtlc1 )
September 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 Joint MOTION to Dismiss (Stipulated) by Defendant Board of County Commissioners of the County of Garfield, The. (Greer, Cathy)
August 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 COURTROOM MINUTES ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe: Show Cause Hearing and Settlement Conference held on 8/29/2017. It is ORDERED: Ms. Greers oral motion to withdraw the Motion for Attorney Fees is GRANTED. Motion for Attorney Fees Docket No. #29 is WITHDRAWN. Dismissal Papers due on or before 9/15/2017. It is ORDERED: The ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Docket No. #27 is VACATED for reasons as set forth on the record. FTR: Courtroom A-502. (slibi, )
August 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 MEMORANDUM regarding #29 MOTION for Attorney Fees & Costs. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 8/25/17. Text Only Entry (kmtlc2 )
August 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 WITHDRAWN MOTION for Attorney Fees by Defendant Board of County Commissioners of the County of Garfield, The. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit 1 to Exhibit C)(Greer, Cathy) Modified on 8/29/2017 to withdraw pursuant to #31 (slibi, ).
August 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MINUTE ENTRY for Settlement Conference held before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 8/15/2017. A Show Cause Hearing and Settlement Conference set for 8/29/2017 1:30 PM in Courtroom A502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. FTR: MJW Courtroom A502. (lgale, )
August 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 VACATED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 8/15/2017 returnable by Wade Noflin as to why Plaintiff did not participate in the settlement conference. It is further ORDERED that Plaintiff shall either (1) file a Notice of Settlement on or before 8/29/2017, or (2) be prepared to proceed to a settlement conference immediately following the Show Cause Hearing. Show Cause Hearing set for 8/15/2017 01:30 PM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. (tsher, ) Modified on 8/29/2017 to vacate pursuant to #31 (slibi, ).
June 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MINUTE ORDER Settlement Conference set for 8/15/2017 01:30 PM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 6/12/2017. (slibi, )
June 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 CASE REASSIGNED Pursuant to 23 Minute Order. This case is randomly reassigned to Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe in the referral role for the purpose of a settlement conference. All future pleadings should be designated as 17-cv-00337-KMT-MJW. (Text Only Entry) (slibi, )
June 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to 23 Minute Order. This case is randomly reassigned to Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe in the referral role. All future pleadings should be designated as 17-cv-00337-KMT-MJW. (Text Only Entry) (jgonz, )
June 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MINUTE ORDER granting #22 Joint Motion for Settlement Conference. The clerk shall randomly assign this case to a magistrate judge to conduct a settlement conference, pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(c)(11). By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 6/6/17. Text Only Entry (kmtlc1 )
May 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Joint MOTION for Hearing/Conference (Settlement Conference) by Defendant Board of County Commissioners of the County of Garfield, The. (Loy, Brendan)
May 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 AMENDED ANSWER to #1 Complaint AND JURY DEMAND by Board of County Commissioners of the County of Garfield, The.(Greer, Cathy)
May 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to Plaintiff's request to amend the caption of the Complaint to name the correct defendant and the defendant's agreement that Plaintiff has incorrectly named the defendant, the caption shall be amended to substitute The Board of County Commissioners of the County of Garfield as the defendant in this action. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 5/15/17. Text Only Entry (kmtlc1 )
May 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #11 Defendants Motion for Partial Dismissal. The motion is DENIED as to Plaintiffs Third Claim for Relief for hostile work environment; and the motion is GRANTED as to Plaintiffs Second Claim for Relief for defamation, which is dismissed without prejudice for lack of subject matter jurisdiction, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 5/12/2017. (jgonz, )
May 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 5/9/17. (sgrim)
May 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 COURTROOM MINUTES for Scheduling Conference held on 5/9/2017 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Discovery due by 11/1/2017. Dispositive Motions due by 12/1/2017. ORDERED: Plaintiff shall provide initial disclosures to Defendant pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26 within 10 days. FTR: KMT C201. (sgrim)
May 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 RESPONSE to Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiff Wade Noflin. (jgonz, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/8/2017: #1 Envelope) (jgonz, ). Modified on 5/8/2017 to correct event type (jgonz, ).
May 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER OF REFERENCE Upon Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge: Upon consent of the parties evidenced by Docket Entry #13, this case is referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya for all purposes pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 72.2(d) and 28 U.S.C. 636(c). by Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 5/3/17. Text Only Entry (msksec, )
May 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Proposed Scheduling Order by Defendant Garfield County (Colorado) Government. (Greer, Cathy)
May 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant Garfield County (Colorado) Government All parties consent.. (Greer, Cathy)
April 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint and Jury Demand by Garfield County (Colorado) Government.(Loy, Brendan)
April 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss (Partial) by Defendant Garfield County (Colorado) Government. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Loy, Brendan)
April 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 5/9/2017 10:30 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Consent Form due by 5/2/2017, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 4/4/17. (sgrim)
April 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER granting #8 Motion for a Four-Day Extension of Time to Fuke Responsive Pleading. Defendant Garfield County (Colorado) Government shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint no later than 4/14/2017. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 4/4/17. Text Only Entry (kmtlc1 )
April 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint by Defendant Garfield County (Colorado) Government. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Greer, Cathy)
April 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Brendan L. Loy on behalf of Garfield County (Colorado) GovernmentAttorney Brendan L. Loy added to party Garfield County (Colorado) Government(pty:dft) (Loy, Brendan)
April 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Cathy Havener Greer on behalf of Garfield County (Colorado) GovernmentAttorney Cathy Havener Greer added to party Garfield County (Colorado) Government(pty:dft) (Greer, Cathy)
April 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER denying #4 Motion to Appoint Pro Bono Counsel by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 4/3/2017. (jgonz, )
March 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MOTION for Appointment of Counsel by Plaintiff Wade Noflin. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jgonz, )
February 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3 No Summons Issued. Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (sphil, )
February 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Text Only Entry (sphil, )
February 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Garfield County (Colorado) Government (Filing Fee: $400.00 Receipt Number:cox078394), filed by Wade Noflin. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Envelope)(sphil, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Noflin v. Board of County Commissioners of the County of Garfield, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Garfield County (Colorado) Government
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of County Commissioners of the County of Garfield, The
Represented By: Brendan L. Loy
Represented By: Cathy Havener Greer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Noflin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wade Noflin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?