Owners Insurance Company v. 11380 East Smith Road, LLC et al
Plaintiff: |
Owners Insurance Company |
Defendant: |
11380 East Smith Road, LLC and 3555 Moline, LLC |
Case Number: |
1:2017cv00346 |
Filed: |
February 8, 2017 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Colorado |
Office: |
Denver Office |
County: |
Arapahoe |
Presiding Judge: |
Richard P. Matsch |
Nature of Suit: |
Insurance |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1332 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
November 30, 2021 |
Filing
157
ORDER by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 11/30/2021, re: 141 Defendants' Motion for Reconsideration of Sua Sponte Order Dismissing Claim for Appraisal is GRANTED. ORDERED that, pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 41.2, this case is a dministratively closed. Either party may move to reopen the case for good cause. Completion of the appraisal process will constitute good cause. ORDERED that, within 30 days after completion of the appraisal process, the parties shall file a joint status report with the Court, advising the Court whether the case should be reopened for good cause. ORDERED that Defendants' Combined Motions in Limine [Docket No. 125] is DENIED without prejudice. ORDERED that D efendants' Renewed Motion to Amend Pretrial Order (Doc. 72) to Grant Leave for Defendants to Designate Witness Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 26(a)(2)(C) [Docket No. 142] is DENIED without prejudice.ORDERED that Plaintiff's Renewed Motion for Leave to File Dispositive Motion after the Scheduling Deadline [Docket No. 146] is DENIED without prejudice. ORDERED that Plaintiffs Motion to Amend Pretrial Order (Doc. 72) for Leave to Designate Insurance Industry Standards Expert [Docket No. 147] is DENIED without prejudice. (sphil, )
|
September 7, 2021 |
Filing
122
ORDER by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 9/7/2021, re: 113 Plaintiff's Objection is OVERRULED; 108 the Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge is ACCEPTED; 120 defendants Objection is OVERRULED; 115 the Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge is ACCEPTED; and 116 Defendants Motion to Continue is DENIED. (sphil, )
|
March 17, 2021 |
Filing
97
ORDER by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 3/17/2021, re: 78 Plaintiff's Opposed Motion to Exclude or Limit Defendants' Expert Edward Fronapfel's Opinion Testimony is GRANTED. (sphil, )
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?