Robinson v. Oil Shale Corporation, The
Plaintiff: Susan Robinson
Defendant: Oil Shale Corporation, The
Case Number: 1:2017cv01373
Filed: June 6, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Rio Blanco
Presiding Judge: Christine M. Arguello
Presiding Judge: Gordon P. Gallagher
Nature of Suit: All Other Real Property
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 101 Order Rejecting the 89 January 23, 2018, Recommendation of the United States Magistrate Judge and Granting Defendant's 61 Motion to Dismiss With Prejudice. Plaintiff's Amended Complaint (Doc. # 48 ) is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Defendant TOSCO shall submit a status report to the Court as to whether it intends to pursue its counterclaim against Plaintiff. This status report shall be submitted on or before 03/26/2018. By Judge Christine M. Arguello on 03/12/2018. (athom, )
March 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER Affirming and Adopting the 88 January 16, 2018 Recommendation of the United States Magistrate Judge. Defendant XTO Energy Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss (Doc. # 71 ) is GRANTED. By Judge Christine M. Arguello on 03/01/2018. (athom, )
January 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 89 RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE re 61 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint filed by TOSCO. I respectfully RECOMMEND that the motion to dismiss be DENIED as to Claims 1, 2, 3, 4, 5, 6, and 8 and that the motion be GRA NTED as to Claim 7. It is additionally respectfully RECOMMENDED that the Court Order claim 4 to be amended to assert negligence rather than intent and to remove from the claim the language related to allegations occurring on federal land. by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 1/23/2018. (GPG)
June 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: returnable by Plaintiff no later than June 22, 2017. by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 6/20/17. (ggall, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robinson v. Oil Shale Corporation, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Robinson
Represented By: Jason Scott Buckley
Represented By: David H. McConaughy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oil Shale Corporation, The
Represented By: Christopher Anthony Chrisman
Represented By: Kurt Vincent Tyler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?