Panorama Consulting Solutions, LLC v. Armitage et al
Plaintiff: Panorama Consulting Solutions, LLC
Defendant: Richard Armitage, Richard Farrell, Brian Potts, Patricia Steele and Liberty Technology Advisors, Inc.
Counter_claimant: Richard Armitage
Counter_defendant: Panorama Consulting Solutions, LLC
Case Number: 1:2017cv01400
Filed: June 8, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: Kristen L. Mix
Presiding Judge: Raymond P. Moore
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 18:1836
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 33 Motion to Set Aside, 2 Ex Parte Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction. So Ordered by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 07/10/2017. (rmlc2)
June 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 47 Motion for Protective Order. So Ordered by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 06/29/2017. (rmlc2)
June 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER denying as moot 14 Motion for Protective Order; denying 15 Motion to Expedite; denying 16 Motion for Hearing/Conference. So Ordered by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 06/15/2017. (rmlc2)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Panorama Consulting Solutions, LLC v. Armitage et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Panorama Consulting Solutions, LLC
Represented By: Stacey Alan Campbell
Represented By: Daniel Mitchell Combs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Armitage
Represented By: Kimberly Lynn Koehler
Represented By: Brooke H. Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Farrell
Represented By: Abigail L. Brown
Represented By: Rebecca B. DeCook
Represented By: Daniel Reza Saeedi
Represented By: Brian Weinthal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Potts
Represented By: Abigail L. Brown
Represented By: Rebecca B. DeCook
Represented By: Daniel Reza Saeedi
Represented By: Brian Weinthal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia Steele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Technology Advisors, Inc.
Represented By: Abigail L. Brown
Represented By: Rebecca B. DeCook
Represented By: Daniel Reza Saeedi
Represented By: Brian Weinthal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Richard Armitage
Represented By: Kimberly Lynn Koehler
Represented By: Brooke H. Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Panorama Consulting Solutions, LLC
Represented By: Stacey Alan Campbell
Represented By: Daniel Mitchell Combs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?