Vreeland v. Fisher et al
Plaintiff: Delmart E.J.M. Vreeland, II
Defendant: Thomas C. Fisher, Rene Jordan, Susan M. Tiona, Director of CDOC Pharmacy, Destin Foree, Brian Hoffmann, Mary Ann Aldrich, Robert Magnuson, Gina Nelson, Anita Normandy, Rebecka Wilson, Jody Sinker, Two Unknown CDOC Pharmacy Staff, Colorado Department of Corrections, Correctional Health Partners, Inc., Mark Wienpahl, S. Tateosian, Law Firm of Cain & White, LLP, The, Craig W. Cain, Jennifer L. White and Documart, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2017cv01580
Filed: June 28, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Fremont
Presiding Judge: Gordon P. Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 461 ORDER by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 3/24/2021, re: 432 Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Pleadings and to Vacate all Court Orders IssuedAfter April 5, 2019 and the Court's Receipt of ECF 293 is DENIED; 455 The Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews is ACCEPTED.(sphil, )
February 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 454 ORDER by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 2/3/2021, re: 417 The Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews is ACCEPTED; 410 Plaintiff's Emergency Motion for Hearing and Fed. R. Civ. P. Rule 65 Injunction is DENIED AS MOOT. (sphil, )
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 451 ORDER by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 1/22/2021. ORDERED that the Recommendation of Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews [Docket No. 420] is ACCEPTED. It is further ORDERED that plaintiffs Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint to Conform to Evidence [Doc ket No. 387] is DENIED. ORDERED that plaintiffs Motion to Address Service of Complaint on all Parties [Docket No. 396] is DENIED. It is further ORDERED that plaintiffs Objection to Magistrate Recommendation ECF 420 as to ECF 387 Motion to Amend Complaint and ECF 396 Motion to Effect Service [Docket No. 430] is OVERRULED. (sphil, ) Modified on 1/22/2021 to edit text. (sphil, ).
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 340 ORDER by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 9/23/2019, re: 319 the Recommendation Re: Defendants' Motion to Dismiss is ADOPTED. ORDERED that Plaintiff's Response to the Recommendation of Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews Re: Def endant's Motion to Dismiss [Docket No. 331], construed as an objection, is OVERRULED; 256 the Motion to Dismiss in Part Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint 256 is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART as consistent with this order. ORDERED that all claims against defendants Rene Jordan, Anita Normandy, andJody Sinker are DISMISSED because the claims were previously dismissed with prejudice. ORDERED that the Eighth Amendment claims against Gina Nelson, Dolf Hall, and Theodore Laurence are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE for failure to state a claim. ORDERED that the First and Fourteenth Amendment claims against Gina Nelson, Dolf Hall, and Theodore Laurence are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE for failure to state a claim. ORDERED that defendants Rene Jordan, Anita Normandy, Jody Sinker, Gina Nelson, Dolf Hall, and Theodore Laurence are dismissed from this case. ORDERED that the Eighth Amendment claims against Susan Tiona areDISMISSED IN PART as barred by the statute of limitations. ORDERED that plaintiff may proceed on his First and Fourteenth Amendmentclaim against Susan Tiona on a theory of First Amendment retaliation. (sphil, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vreeland v. Fisher et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Delmart E.J.M. Vreeland, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas C. Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rene Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan M. Tiona
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director of CDOC Pharmacy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Destin Foree
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Hoffmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Ann Aldrich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Magnuson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gina Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anita Normandy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rebecka Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jody Sinker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Two Unknown CDOC Pharmacy Staff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colorado Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correctional Health Partners, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Wienpahl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Tateosian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Law Firm of Cain & White, LLP, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craig W. Cain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer L. White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Documart, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?