Ziankovich v. Large et al
Plaintiff: |
Youras Ziankovich |
Defendant: |
Bryon M. Large and James C. Coyle |
Case Number: |
1:2017cv02039 |
Filed: |
August 24, 2017 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Colorado |
Office: |
Denver Office |
County: |
Arapahoe |
Presiding Judge: |
Christine M. Arguello |
Presiding Judge: |
Nina Y. Wang |
Nature of Suit: |
Other Statutory Actions |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 2201 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
January 31, 2020 |
Filing
84
ORDER that Plaintiff Youras Ziankovich's Motion to Relieve Plaintiff from the Order Affirming and Adopting the Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge and Denying as Moot Plaintiff's Fourth Preliminary Injunction Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 60(b) (Doc. # 79 ) is DENIED, by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 1/30/2020.(evana, )
|
September 18, 2019 |
Filing
77
ORDER That Plaintiff's Objection (Doc. # 70 ) to the Recommendation is OVERRULED; Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang's Recommendation (Doc. # 69 ) as to issue preclusion is AFFIRMED and ADOPTED as an Order of this Court; Pursuant to Rule 1 2(d), Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Doc. # 52 ) is CONVERTED into a Motion for Summary Judgment; Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. # 52 ) is GRANTED; Plaintiff's Amended Complaint (Doc. # 12 ) is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE; and Plaintiff's Fourth Application for Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause Why a Preliminary Injunction Should Not Be Issued (Doc. # 48 ) is DENIED AS MOOT, by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 9/18/2019.(evana, )
|
March 8, 2019 |
Filing
59
RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 3/8/2019. This court respectfully RECOMMENDS that Plaintiff's 48 Fourth MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Order to Show Cause be DENIED. (nywlc2, )
|
December 11, 2017 |
Filing
29
ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 25 Motion for Relief From the Final Judgment and for Reconsideration of the Final Judgment. By Judge Christine M. Arguello on 12/11/2017. (athom, )
|
October 5, 2017 |
Filing
21
RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 10/5/2017. I respectfully RECOMMEND that Plaintiff's Second MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and for Order to Show Cause 14 be DENIED without prejudice; and that Plaintiff's Amended Complaint 12 be DISMISSED without prejudice pursuant to Younger v. Harris, 401 U.S. 37 (1971). (nywlc2, )
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?