Tso v. Murray et al
Plaintiff: Gilbert T. Tso
Defendant: Rebecca Murray, Tanya Akins, Sherr Puttmann Akins Lamb PC, Jeannie Ridings, Kililis Ridings & Vanau PC, Elizabeth A. Starrs, Charles D. Johnson, Christian Maddy, Christian (I) Maddy, Barry Pardus, City and County of Denver and David H. Goldberg
Case Number: 1:2017cv02523
Filed: October 20, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: William J. Martinez
Presiding Judge: Scott T. Varholak
Nature of Suit: Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause of Action: 18:1962
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 227 ORDER by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 9/18/2019, re: 219 Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge is ACCEPTED; 207 the Colorado Defendants' Amended Motion for Filing Sanctions and Request for Expedited Ruling is GRANTED. ORDERED that Plaintiff's Objections to Magistrate Judge's Recommendations [ECF #219] [Docket No. 225] are OVERRULED. (sphil, )
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 188 ORDER Adopting Recommendation of Magistrate Judge. ORDERED that plaintiff's Objections to Magistrate Judge's Recommendations and Motion for Court Review of Magistrate's Order 162 is OVERRULED. Order and Recommendation of United St ates Magistrate Judge 158 is ADOPTED in its entirety. The Illinois judicial defendants' Motion to Dismiss 98 is GRANTED. The Colorado defendants' Motion to Dismiss 100 is GRANTED. The attorney defendants' Motion to Dismiss [10 2] is GRANTED. The Denver defendants' Motion to Dismiss 103 is GRANTED. Dr. Richard F. Spiegle's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint 105 is GRANTED. The Murray defendants' Motion to Dismiss 107 is GRANTE D. All claims against all defendants are dismissed without prejudice for lack of jurisdiction. Plaintiff's Motion to Set Aside the Scheduling Order for Amendments to the Complaint; and Motion for Leave to Amend and Supplement Complaint for Go od Cause Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) (4), Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(a)(2) and 15(d); and Counter-Motion to Motions to Dismiss 117 is DENIED. Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint Pursuant to Fed R. Civ. P. 15(a)(2) 161 is DENIED. All other pending motions are DENIED as moot. Within 14 days of the entry of judgment, defendants may have their costs by filing a bill of costs with the Clerk of the Court. This case is closed, by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 12/18/18. (sgrim)
September 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ORDER. Plaintiff's Memorandum of Law in Support of (2nd) Order to Show Cause for Preliminary Injunction and Temporary Restraining Order 62 is DENIED. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 9/30/18. (pabsec)
July 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER denying 151 Motion for Sanctions by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 7/19/2018. (jgonz, )
February 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 02/22/2018, re: 49 Plaintiff's Memorandum of Law In Support of Order to Show Cause for Preliminary Injunction and Temporary Restraining Order is DENIED (sphil, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tso v. Murray et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gilbert T. Tso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rebecca Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tanya Akins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sherr Puttmann Akins Lamb PC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeannie Ridings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kililis Ridings & Vanau PC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth A. Starrs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles D. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christian Maddy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christian (I) Maddy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barry Pardus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City and County of Denver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David H. Goldberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?