Gentle Giant Moving Co., Inc. v. Gentle Giant Moving and Storage, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: |
Gentle Giant Moving Co., Inc. |
Defendant: |
Gentle Giant Moving and Storage, Inc., Jose M. Esquivel, Itamar Friedman, Sr and Empier Moving and Storage Services Co |
Case Number: |
1:2017cv02762 |
Filed: |
November 17, 2017 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Colorado |
Office: |
Denver Office |
County: |
XX US, Outside State |
Presiding Judge: |
Michael J. Watanabe |
Nature of Suit: |
Trademark |
Cause of Action: |
15 U.S.C. § 1051 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
August 19, 2020 |
Filing
49
ORDER. Plaintiff's Additional Motion for Default Judgment on the Issue of Injunctive Relief Against Defendants Gentle Giant Moving and Storage, Inc., Empier Moving and Storage Services Co., Jose M. Esquivel and Itamar Friedman, Sr. Pursuant to Order of September 04, 2019 45 is GRANTED. Judgment shall enter in favor of plaintiff and against defendants. Defendants Gentle Giant Moving and Storage Inc., Empier Moving and Storage Services Co., Jose M. Esquivel, and Itamar Friedman, Sr., a nd all of defendants owners, officers, agents, servants, employees, representatives, assigns, affiliates, and subsidiaries, are permanently restrained, enjoined, and prohibited, until further order of the Court, from certain activity as listed in the order, by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 8/19/20.(sgrim)
|
September 4, 2019 |
Filing
44
ORDER by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 9/4/2019, re: 42 plaintiff's Motion for Sanctions and Application for Default Judgment Against Defendants Jose M. Esquivel, and Itamar Friedman, Sr. is GRANTED IN PART, and DENIED WITHOUT P REJUDICE IN PART as follows: It is (1) GRANTED to the extent it seeks entry of a default judgment pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 16(f) and 37(b)(2); (2) GRANTED to the extent it seeks an award of disgorgement of de fendants profits and attorney's fees under 15 U.S.C. § 1117(a); and (3) DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE to the extent it seeks entry of a permanent injunction against defendants. ORDERED that the Order and Recommendation of the ma gistrate judge [Docket No. 36] is not accepted as MOOT. ORDERED that any additional motion for default judgment on the issue of injunctive relief shall be filed on or before September 20, 2019. ORDERED that defendants shall be liable for disgorgement of $63,903.47, representing profits gained as a result of the conduct alleged in the Complaint [Docket No. 1]..(sphil, )
|
May 1, 2018 |
Filing
36
RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE Regarding Order to Show Cause 34 , by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 5/01/2018. RECOMMENDS that Judge Brimmer enter default against Defendants Gentle Giant Moving and Storage Inc. and Empier Moving and Storage Services Co. and allow Plaintiff to file a motion for default judgment against these two Defendants. (slibi, )
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?