Bank of Colorado v. Wibaux 1, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Bank of Colorado
Defendant: Wibaux 1, LLC, Jeffrey W. Berger, Tami M. Berger, Pro-Frac Heating & Trucking, L.L.C. and USA
Case Number: 1:2017cv02871
Filed: November 30, 2017
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Weld
Presiding Judge: Christine M. Arguello
Referring Judge: Kathleen M. Tafoya
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 21, 2018 104 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Defendants' Motion to Transfer or Stay. The Court ORDERS that Borrower Defendants' Motion to Transfer or Stay (Doc. # 28 ) is GRANTED to the extent it was filed by the LLC Defendants and DENIED AS MOOT to the extent it was filed by the Berger Defendants. This action, in its entirety, is hereby transferred to the United States District Court for the District of Montana. By Judge Christine M. Arguello on 09/21/2018. (athom, )
June 4, 2018 84 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 78 Motion to Stay. The LLC Defendants' Motion to Stay (Doc. # 78 ) is DENIED IN PART as to their request to stay all activity on the Bank's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. The LLC De fendants' Motion to Stay (Doc. # 78 ) is GRANTED IN PART as to their request for an extension within which to file a Response brief to the Bank's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. The LLC Defendants shall file a Response by 6/11/2018. By Judge Christine M. Arguello on 06/04/2018. (athom, )
January 25, 2018 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Defendants' 54 Motion to Stay Case. By Judge Christine M. Arguello on 01/25/2018. (athom, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bank of Colorado v. Wibaux 1, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bank of Colorado
Represented By: John Anthony O'Brien
Represented By: Scott C. Sandberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wibaux 1, LLC
Represented By: Angela L. Ekker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey W. Berger
Represented By: Angela L. Ekker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tami M. Berger
Represented By: Angela L. Ekker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pro-Frac Heating & Trucking, L.L.C.
Represented By: Angela L. Ekker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Represented By: Juan G. Villasenor(Designation Federal Agency Attorney)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?