High Country Conservation Advocates et al v. United States Forest Service et al
Plaintiff: High Country Conservation Advocates, WildEarth Guardians, Center for Biological Diversity, Sierra Club and Wilderness Workshop
Defendant: United States Forest Service, U.S. Department of Agriculture, Daniel Jiron, Scott Armentrout, United States Department of the Interior, Bureau of Land Management and Katharine MacGregor
Intervenor_defendant: Mountain Coal Company LLC
Case Number: 1:2017cv03025
Filed: December 15, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Gunnison
Presiding Judge: Philip A. Brimmer
Nature of Suit: Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 42:4321
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 10/2/2020, re: 76 Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Entry of Tenth Circuit Mandate is DENIED AS MOOT; 77 Plaintiffs' Emergency Motion to Enforce Remedy is DENIED; 94 Plaintiffs' Motion to Expedite Consideration of Plaintiff' Emergency Motion to Enforce Remedy is DENIED AS MOOT.(sphil, )
August 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER. The Motion of the Institute for Policy Integrity at New York University School of Law to Participate as Amicus Curiae and with Proposed Amicus Brief in Support of Plaintiffs 41 is granted. The Agencies' decisions are affirmed, judgment shall enter in favor of defendants, and this case shall be closed in its entirety. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 8/10/18. (pabsec)
December 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting 6 Mountain Coal Company's Unopposed Motion to Intervene as a Defendant. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 12/19/17. (pabsec)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: High Country Conservation Advocates et al v. United States Forest Service et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: High Country Conservation Advocates
Represented By: Mary Emily Splitek
Represented By: Edward Breckenridge Zukoski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WildEarth Guardians
Represented By: Mary Emily Splitek
Represented By: Edward Breckenridge Zukoski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Center for Biological Diversity
Represented By: Mary Emily Splitek
Represented By: Edward Breckenridge Zukoski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sierra Club
Represented By: Mary Emily Splitek
Represented By: Edward Breckenridge Zukoski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wilderness Workshop
Represented By: Mary Emily Splitek
Represented By: Edward Breckenridge Zukoski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Forest Service
Represented By: John S. Most(Designation Federal Agency Attorney)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Agriculture
Represented By: John S. Most(Designation Federal Agency Attorney)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Jiron
Represented By: John S. Most(Designation Federal Agency Attorney)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Armentrout
Represented By: John S. Most(Designation Federal Agency Attorney)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of the Interior
Represented By: John S. Most(Designation Federal Agency Attorney)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bureau of Land Management
Represented By: John S. Most(Designation Federal Agency Attorney)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katharine MacGregor
Represented By: John S. Most(Designation Federal Agency Attorney)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_defendant: Mountain Coal Company LLC
Represented By: Michael Robert Drysdale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?