Judd v. Keypoint Government Solutions Incorporated

Plaintiff: Orson Judd
Defendant: Keypoint Government Solutions Incorporated
Case Number: 1:2018cv00327
Filed: February 9, 2018
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Raymond P. Moore
Referring Judge: Scott T. Varholak
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 23, 2018 91 Opinion or Order of the Court RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 7/23/18 re 51 MOTION to Compel Arbitration of Opt-In Kristin Hettler's Claims filed by Keypoint Government Solutions Incorporated. This Court respectfully RECOMMENDS that KeyPoints Motion to Compel Arbitration [#51] be GRANTED and that Kristin Hettler be ordered to proceed individually to arbitration on her claims against KeyPoint.6 (nmarb, )
June 20, 2018 83 Opinion or Order of the Court REVISED RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 6/20/18 respectfully RECOMMENDING that 41 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Keypoint Government Solutions Incorporated be DENIED. (nmarb, ) Modified on 6/20/2018 to add "Revised". (nmarb, ).
February 9, 2018 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Defendant's 9 Motion is granted in part as to transfer of venue, and denied in part without prejudice as to dismissal for failure to state a claim. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Clerk of Court transfer this matter to the United States District Court for the District of Colorado and terminate the case in the District of Arizona. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 2/8/2018. (ATD) [Transferred from Arizona on 2/9/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Judd v. Keypoint Government Solutions Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Orson Judd
Represented By: Leslie H. Joyner
Represented By: Joshua G. Konecky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keypoint Government Solutions Incorporated
Represented By: Karin M. Cogbill
Represented By: Claire B. Deason
Represented By: Michelle Lynn Gomez
Represented By: Margaret Parnell Hogan
Represented By: Jacqueline Elise Kalk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?