Handy et al v. Board of County Commissioners for the County of Jefferson et al
Plaintiff: |
Wyatt T. Handy, Jr. and Ashlee M. Handy |
Defendant: |
Board of County Commissioners for the County of Jefferson, Tera L. Fisher and Brandon H. Johnson |
Case Number: |
1:2018cv00789 |
Filed: |
April 4, 2018 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Colorado |
Office: |
Denver Office |
County: |
Denver |
Presiding Judge: |
Gordon P. Gallagher |
Nature of Suit: |
Other Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
July 1, 2020 |
Filing
130
ORDER denying 122 Motion to Alter or Amend a Judgment by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 7/1/20.(jdyne, )
|
April 28, 2020 |
Filing
118
ORDER granting 80 Motion for Summary Judgment by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 4/28/20.(jdyne, )
|
January 6, 2020 |
Filing
107
ORDER DENYING 90 Motion for Discovery. IT IS ORDERED that the Motion is DENIED. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 1/6/2020. (skclc2)
|
December 12, 2019 |
Filing
97
ORDER GRANTING 94 Motion to Strike 92 Plaintiffs' Response to Motion for Summary Judgment. The Motion [# 94 ] is GRANTED. IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiffs Response to the Motion for Summary Judgment [# 92 ] is STRICKEN. IT IS FURTHER ORD ERED that Plaintiffs shall have until December 23, 2019 to file a response to the motion for summary judgment that complies with Judge Jacksons Practice Standards and the Local Rules. Plaintiffs are warned that failure to file a response that complies with Local Rule of Practice 10.1 and Judge Jackson's practice standards may result in the response being summarily stricken without leave to refile. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 12/12/2019. (skclc2)
|
November 14, 2019 |
Filing
85
ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 76 Plaintiff's Second Motion to Compel Discovery. The Motion is GRANTED IN PART to the extent that Defendant Fisher shall supplement her response to Interrogatory No. 14 in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 33(d) by either (a) ascertaining the answer to No. 14 by her review of the applicable records she mentioned, or, assuming the burden of deriving or ascertaining the answer will be substantially the same for either party, (b) specifying th e records (by bates number) that must be reviewed and giving Plaintiffs a reasonable opportunity to examine those records to the extent not already produced. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 33(d). Defendant Fisher's supplemental response shall be serv ed on Plaintiffs no later than November 25, 2020.The Motion is DENIED IN PART to the extent that no additional response is required by Defendants to Interrogatory Nos. 2, 3, 4, and 5, and Requests for Production Nos. 15, 16, and 23.3. Finally, the Motion is DENIED IN PART to the extent it seeks leave to request the additional information discussed above. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 11/14/2019. (skclc2)
|
March 27, 2019 |
Filing
47
ORDER adopting 45 Report and Recommendations; granting in part and denying in part 31 Motion to Dismiss by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 3/27/19. (jdyne, )
|
March 4, 2019 |
Filing
45
RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 3/4/19 re 31 Defendants MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint [Doc. No. 9] filed by Brandon H. Johnson, Tera L. Fisher. The Court RECOMMENDS that Defenda nts Fisher and Johnsons Motion to Dismiss [ECF. #31] be GRANTED in part, to the extent it seeks dismissal of Plaintiffs Fourteenth Amendment Equal Protection claims against Defendants in their individual and official capacities, and the Fourth Amendment official capacity claims against Defendants, and DENIED in part, to the extent it seeks dismissal of the Plaintiffs Fourth Amendment individual capacity claims against Defendants. (nmarb, )
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?