Smith et al v. 3M Company, The et al
Plaintiff: Floyd Trahan, Kym Chavez, Robert S. Money, Debra Calaghan, Frances Louis Cooley, Sandra Blake, Cynthia Beers, William Austin, Bianca Krakofsky, JC Riddle, Christopher Torrez, Paul Price, Regina Williams, Itzy Rodriguez, Pamela Sweet, Gilbert Trujillo, Jr., Nuno Desousa, John Ace, Ruth Norman, Shawna Alvarez, Jazmin Abreu, George Belmore, Lori Petersen, Victoria Flaherty, Terry Trujillo, Korey Smith, Karen Turnell, Diane Johnson, Arturo Nava, Mary Schoelkopf, Angela Payne, Nora Williams, Renee Greene, Zachary Navakuku, Zachariah Krakofsky, Ralph Woods, Susan Bohanon, Gloria Loggins, Brandon Ross, Jenni Wood, Daniel Milano, Tyreece Augillard, Austin Matthias, Jennifer Anaya, Michael Hammon, General Walker, Timothy Hilke, ll, Emily Quintana, Thomas Paine, Ellen Bollens, Joyce Cooley, Larry Smith, Pauline Kwasniewski, Victoria Torres, Amanda Turner, Gerarda Kieselstein, Walter McGrew, Mykhael Graves, Francisco Oquendo, Jennifer Littlepage, Gloria Payne, Jazmene Williams, Leslie Thorne, Ben Maxie, Christa Baca-Chavez, Rodney Stroman, Jermanre Gillins, Rito Moreno, Shirley Grindol, Diane Dumas, Beverly Butcher, Heather Musick, Gary Blake, Stella Stewart, Ashley Samuels, Kaye Wolfe, Stephen Beers, Susan Northup, Isaiah Wallace, Rebecca Willard, Ashley Cox, Jordan Dumas, Alan Wallace, Daniel Levasseur, Emiko Smith, Cornelius Flaherty, Mercedes Amaro, Adeline Lippincott, Robert Willard, Nancy Graham, Sidney Thomas, William Houth, Jay Talley, Jason Schoelkopf, Marie Kiser, Danny Holmes, Christine Walker, Debbie Duran, Verna Doriese Montoya, Steven Johnson, Jerry Sweet, Harue Price, Adonis Wallace, Gene Harvey, Veronica Burke, Peggy Weber, Marianne Paine, Sun Ace, Wendy Houth, Alfredia Riddle, Daniel Rael-Musick, Michael Wheeler, Cynthia Thornton, Jesse Bragg, rebecca Kwasniewski, Otis Littlepage, Paul Christensen, William Persing, B.Precious Wallace, Heather Wheeler, Kathleen Smith, Ruth Welchabney, Jody Navakuku, Erica Tyndall, Mak Tan Lebeau, Joshua Cox, Jack Hendrix, Benn Sher-Rod, Raymond Greene, Linda Kotch, Elizabeth Christensen, Michael Garbizo, Brittany Houth, Erica Johnson, Mikalen Young, Lynette Trahan, Larry Johnson, Morgan Ginther, Maureen Cox, Lady Thomas, Phillip Ledeau, Angelika Austin, Patricia Musick, Joyce McGrew, Wendy Weber, Cesar Collado, Ernestine Trotter, Max Rushing, Christopher Graham, Amanda Smith, James Kwasniewski, Alicia Flaherty, Hannelore Belmore, Don Johnson, Roselie Clarke, Steven Navakuku, Maria Garbizo, Terrance Kotch, Jaqueline Hilke, Travis Dumas, Jr., Mark Kieselstein, Patricia Schaffer, Claudia Powell, Adam Cano, Donna Thorne, Cindy Gillins, Catherine Milano, Shelia Greene, Esedor Quintana, Cory Proffitt, Ashton Hilke, Norman Alvarez, Joshua Bevins, Carol Glommen, Malachi Graves, Garnetta Bevins, Kaliah Williams, Merrill Samuels, Derrick D'Mellow, Thomas Skinner, Perseis Graves, Leann Money, Santos Hernandez, Cesar (I) Collado, B. Precious Wallace, Mikalen (I) Young, Nora (I) Williams, Rebecca (I) Kwasniewski, Maureen (I) Cox, Michael (I) Garbizo, Windy Weber, Raymond (I) Greene, Jaqueline (I) Hilke, Bianca (I) Krakofsky, Alan (I) Wallace, Stella (I) Stewart, Steven (I) Johnson, Michael Hammond, Mary (I) Schoelkopf, Garnetta (I) Bevins, Brendon Ross, Angela (I) Payne, Christa (I) Baca-Chavez and Francisco (I) Oquendo
Defendant: Kidde PLC, Inc., The 3M Company, UTE Fire & Security Americas Corporation, Inc., Chemguard, Kidde Fire Fighting, Inc., Buckeye Fire Equipment, Co., national Foam, Inc., Tyco Fire Products, L.P., Kiddie-Fenwal, Inc, UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation, Inc., 3M Company, The, GE Interlogix, Inc., Minnesota Minning and Manufacturing, Co., Williams US Inc., Williams Holdings, Inc and Chubb National Foam, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv01154
Filed: May 11, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: El Paso
Presiding Judge: R Brooke Jackson
Referring Judge: Kathleen M Tafoya
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 t
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2018 Filing 17 CASE REASSIGNED. In accordance with D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(d)(4), this related case is specially reassigned to Judge R. Brooke Jackson and Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. All future pleadings should reference Judge Jackson and Magistrate Judge Tafoya at the end of the civil action number (e.g., 18-cv-0001-RBJ-KMT). Text Only Entry. (dkals, )
August 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MINUTE ORDER granting #15 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Kelly A. Hyman terminated By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 8/27/18. Text Only Entry (kmtlc1 )
August 27, 2018 Filing 15 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Kelly Hyman by Plaintiffs William Austin, Christa Baca-Chavez, Christa (I) Baca-Chavez, Cynthia Beers, Stephen Beers, George Belmore, Hannelore Belmore, Garnetta Bevins, Joshua Bevins, Garnetta (I) Bevins, Gary Blake, Sandra Blake, Susan Bohanon, Ellen Bollens, Jesse Bragg, Veronica Burke, Beverly Butcher, Debra Calaghan, Adam Cano, Kym Chavez, Elizabeth Christensen, Paul Christensen, Roselie Clarke, Cesar Collado, Cesar (I) Collado, Frances Louis Cooley, Joyce Cooley, Ashley Cox, Joshua Cox, Maureen Cox, Maureen (I) Cox, Derrick D'Mellow, Nuno Desousa, Diane Dumas, Jordan Dumas, Travis Dumas, Jr, Debbie Duran, Alicia Flaherty, Cornelius Flaherty, Victoria Flaherty, Maria Garbizo, Michael Garbizo, Michael (I) Garbizo, Cindy Gillins, Jermanre Gillins, Morgan Ginther, Carol Glommen, Christopher Graham, Nancy Graham, Malachi Graves, Mykhael Graves, Perseis Graves, Raymond Greene, Renee Greene, Shelia Greene, Raymond (I) Greene, Shirley Grindol, Michael Hammond, Gene Harvey, Jack Hendrix, Santos Hernandez, Ashton Hilke, Jaqueline Hilke, Timothy Hilke, ll, Jaqueline (I) Hilke, Danny Holmes, Brittany Houth, Wendy Houth, William Houth, Diane Johnson, Don Johnson, Erica Johnson, Larry Johnson, Steven Johnson, Steven (I) Johnson, Gerarda Kieselstein, Mark Kieselstein, Marie Kiser, Linda Kotch, Terrance Kotch, Bianca Krakofsky, Zachariah Krakofsky, Bianca (I) Krakofsky, James Kwasniewski, Pauline Kwasniewski, Rebecca Kwasniewski, Rebecca (I) Kwasniewski, Mak Tan Lebeau, Phillip Ledeau, Daniel Levasseur, Adeline Lippincott, Jennifer Littlepage, Otis Littlepage, Gloria Loggins, Austin Matthias, Jazmin Abreu, John Ace, Sun Ace, Norman Alvarez, Shawna Alvarez, Mercedes Amaro, Jennifer Anaya, Tyreece Augillard, Angelika Austin, Ben Maxie, Joyce McGrew, Walter McGrew, Catherine Milano, Daniel Milano, Leann Money, Robert S. Money, Verna Doriese Montoya, Rito Moreno, Heather Musick, Patricia Musick, Arturo Nava, Jody Navakuku, Steven Navakuku, Zachary Navakuku, Ruth Norman, Susan Northup, Francisco Oquendo, Francisco (I) Oquendo, Marianne Paine, Thomas Paine, Angela Payne, Gloria Payne, Angela (I) Payne, William Persing, Lori Petersen, Claudia Powell, Harue Price, Paul Price, Cory Proffitt, Emily Quintana, Esedor Quintana, Daniel Rael-Musick, Alfredia Riddle, JC Riddle, Itzy Rodriguez, Brendon Ross, Max Rushing, Ashley Samuels, Merrill Samuels, Patricia Schaffer, Jason Schoelkopf, Mary Schoelkopf, Mary (I) Schoelkopf, Benn Sher-Rod, Thomas Skinner, Amanda Smith, Emiko Smith, Kathleen Smith, Korey Smith, Larry Smith, Stella Stewart, Stella (I) Stewart, Rodney Stroman, Jerry Sweet, Pamela Sweet, Jay Talley, Lady Thomas, Sidney Thomas, Donna Thorne, Leslie Thorne, Cynthia Thornton, Victoria Torres, Christopher Torrez, Floyd Trahan, Lynette Trahan, Ernestine Trotter, Gilbert Trujillo, Jr, Terry Trujillo, Karen Turnell, Amanda Turner, Erica Tyndall, Christine Walker, General Walker, Adonis Wallace, Alan Wallace, Isaiah Wallace, Alan (I) Wallace, B. Precious Wallace, Peggy Weber, Windy Weber, Ruth Welchabney, Heather Wheeler, Michael Wheeler, Rebecca Willard, Robert Willard, Jazmene Williams, Kaliah Williams, Nora Williams, Regina Williams, Nora (I) Williams, Kaye Wolfe, Jenni Wood, Ralph Woods, Mikalen Young, Mikalen (I) Young. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Hyman, Kelly)
July 20, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Michael David Eric McDivitt on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party William Austin(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party William Austin(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Christa Baca-Chavez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Christa Baca-Chavez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Christa (I) Baca-Chavez (pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Christa (I) Baca-Chavez (pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Cynthia Beers(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Cynthia Beers(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Stephen Beers(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Stephen Beers(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party George Belmore(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party George Belmore(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Hannelore Belmore(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Hannelore Belmore(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Garnetta Bevins(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Garnetta Bevins(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Joshua Bevins(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Joshua Bevins(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Garnetta (I) Bevins (pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Garnetta (I) Bevins (pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Gary Blake(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Gary Blake(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Sandra Blake(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Sandra Blake(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Susan Bohanon(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Susan Bohanon(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Ellen Bollens(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Ellen Bollens(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Jesse Bragg(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Jesse Bragg(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Veronica Burke(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Veronica Burke(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Beverly Butcher(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Beverly Butcher(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Debra Calaghan(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Debra Calaghan(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Adam Cano(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Adam Cano(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Kym Chavez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Kym Chavez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Elizabeth Christensen(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Elizabeth Christensen(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Paul Christensen(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Paul Christensen(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Roselie Clarke(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Roselie Clarke(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Cesar Collado(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Cesar Collado(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Cesar (I) Collado (pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Cesar (I) Collado (pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Frances Louis Cooley(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Frances Louis Cooley(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Joyce Cooley(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Joyce Cooley(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Ashley Cox(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Ashley Cox(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Joshua Cox(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Joshua Cox(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Maureen Cox(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Maureen Cox(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Maureen (I) Cox (pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Maureen (I) Cox (pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Derrick D'Mellow(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Derrick D'Mellow(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Nuno Desousa(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Nuno Desousa(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Diane Dumas(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Diane Dumas(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Jordan Dumas(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Jordan Dumas(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Travis Dumas, Jr(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Travis Dumas, Jr(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Debbie Duran(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Debbie Duran(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Alicia Flaherty(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Alicia Flaherty(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Cornelius Flaherty(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Cornelius Flaherty(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Victoria Flaherty(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Victoria Flaherty(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Maria Garbizo(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Maria Garbizo(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Michael Garbizo(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Michael Garbizo(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Michael (I) Garbizo (pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Michael (I) Garbizo (pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Cindy Gillins(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Cindy Gillins(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Jermanre Gillins(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Jermanre Gillins(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Morgan Ginther(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Morgan Ginther(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Carol Glommen(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Carol Glommen(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Christopher Graham(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Christopher Graham(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Nancy Graham(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Nancy Graham(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Malachi Graves(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Malachi Graves(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Mykhael Graves(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Mykhael Graves(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Perseis Graves(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Perseis Graves(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Raymond Greene(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Raymond Greene(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Renee Greene(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Renee Greene(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Shelia Greene(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Shelia Greene(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Raymond (I) Greene (pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Raymond (I) Greene (pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Shirley Grindol(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Shirley Grindol(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Michael Hammond (pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Michael Hammond (pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Gene Harvey(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Gene Harvey(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Jack Hendrix(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Jack Hendrix(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Santos Hernandez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Santos Hernandez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Ashton Hilke(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Ashton Hilke(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Jaqueline Hilke(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Jaqueline Hilke(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Timothy Hilke, ll(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Timothy Hilke, ll(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Jaqueline (I) Hilke (pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Jaqueline (I) Hilke (pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Danny Holmes(pty:pla), Atto
June 22, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Michael W. McDivitt on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party William Austin(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party William Austin(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Christa Baca-Chavez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Christa Baca-Chavez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Christa (I) Baca-Chavez (pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Christa (I) Baca-Chavez (pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Cynthia Beers(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Cynthia Beers(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Stephen Beers(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Stephen Beers(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party George Belmore(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party George Belmore(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Hannelore Belmore(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Hannelore Belmore(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Garnetta Bevins(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Garnetta Bevins(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Joshua Bevins(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Joshua Bevins(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Garnetta (I) Bevins (pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Garnetta (I) Bevins (pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Gary Blake(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Gary Blake(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Sandra Blake(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Sandra Blake(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Susan Bohanon(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Susan Bohanon(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Ellen Bollens(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Ellen Bollens(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jesse Bragg(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jesse Bragg(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Veronica Burke(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Veronica Burke(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Beverly Butcher(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Beverly Butcher(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Debra Calaghan(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Debra Calaghan(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Adam Cano(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Adam Cano(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Kym Chavez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Kym Chavez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Elizabeth Christensen(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Elizabeth Christensen(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Paul Christensen(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Paul Christensen(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Roselie Clarke(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Roselie Clarke(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Cesar Collado(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Cesar Collado(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Cesar (I) Collado (pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Cesar (I) Collado (pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Frances Louis Cooley(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Frances Louis Cooley(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Joyce Cooley(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Joyce Cooley(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Ashley Cox(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Ashley Cox(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Joshua Cox(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Joshua Cox(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Maureen Cox(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Maureen Cox(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Maureen (I) Cox (pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Maureen (I) Cox (pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Derrick D'Mellow(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Derrick D'Mellow(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Nuno Desousa(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Nuno Desousa(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Diane Dumas(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Diane Dumas(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jordan Dumas(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jordan Dumas(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Travis Dumas, Jr(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Travis Dumas, Jr(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Debbie Duran(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Debbie Duran(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Alicia Flaherty(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Alicia Flaherty(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Cornelius Flaherty(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Cornelius Flaherty(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Victoria Flaherty(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Victoria Flaherty(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Maria Garbizo(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Maria Garbizo(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Michael Garbizo(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Michael Garbizo(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Michael (I) Garbizo (pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Michael (I) Garbizo (pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Cindy Gillins(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Cindy Gillins(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jermanre Gillins(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jermanre Gillins(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Morgan Ginther(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Morgan Ginther(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Carol Glommen(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Carol Glommen(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Christopher Graham(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Christopher Graham(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Nancy Graham(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Nancy Graham(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Malachi Graves(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Malachi Graves(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Mykhael Graves(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Mykhael Graves(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Perseis Graves(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Perseis Graves(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Raymond Greene(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Raymond Greene(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Renee Greene(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Renee Greene(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Shelia Greene(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Shelia Greene(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Raymond (I) Greene (pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Raymond (I) Greene (pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Shirley Grindol(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Shirley Grindol(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Michael Hammond (pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Michael Hammond (pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Gene Harvey(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Gene Harvey(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jack Hendrix(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jack Hendrix(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Santos Hernandez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Santos Hernandez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Ashton Hilke(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Ashton Hilke(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jaqueline Hilke(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jaqueline Hilke(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Timothy Hilke, ll(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Timothy Hilke, ll(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jaqueline (I) Hilke (pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jaqueline (I) Hilke (pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Danny Holmes(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Danny Holmes(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Brittany Houth(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Brittany Houth(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Wendy Houth(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Wendy Houth(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party William Houth(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party William Houth(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Diane Johnson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Diane Johnson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Don Johnson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Don Johnson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Erica Johnson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Erica Johnson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Larry Johnson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Larry Johnson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Ste
June 22, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE OF CASE ASSOCIATION Bell, et al., v. The 3M Company, et al.,16-cv-2351-RBJ by Kelly A. Hyman on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Hyman, Kelly)
June 22, 2018 Filing 11 SUMMONS REQUEST as to The 3M Company by Plaintiffs William Austin, Christa Baca-Chavez, Christa (I) Baca-Chavez, Cynthia Beers, Stephen Beers, George Belmore, Hannelore Belmore, Garnetta Bevins, Joshua Bevins, Garnetta (I) Bevins, Gary Blake, Sandra Blake, Susan Bohanon, Ellen Bollens, Jesse Bragg, Veronica Burke, Beverly Butcher, Debra Calaghan, Adam Cano, Kym Chavez, Elizabeth Christensen, Paul Christensen, Roselie Clarke, Cesar Collado, Cesar (I) Collado, Frances Louis Cooley, Joyce Cooley, Ashley Cox, Joshua Cox, Maureen Cox, Maureen (I) Cox, Derrick D'Mellow, Nuno Desousa, Diane Dumas, Jordan Dumas, Travis Dumas, Jr, Debbie Duran, Alicia Flaherty, Cornelius Flaherty, Victoria Flaherty, Maria Garbizo, Michael Garbizo, Michael (I) Garbizo, Cindy Gillins, Jermanre Gillins, Morgan Ginther, Carol Glommen, Christopher Graham, Nancy Graham, Malachi Graves, Mykhael Graves, Perseis Graves, Raymond Greene, Renee Greene, Shelia Greene, Raymond (I) Greene, Shirley Grindol, Michael Hammond, Gene Harvey, Jack Hendrix, Santos Hernandez, Ashton Hilke, Jaqueline Hilke, Timothy Hilke, ll, Jaqueline (I) Hilke, Danny Holmes, Brittany Houth, Wendy Houth, William Houth, Diane Johnson, Don Johnson, Erica Johnson, Larry Johnson, Steven Johnson, Steven (I) Johnson, Gerarda Kieselstein, Mark Kieselstein, Marie Kiser, Linda Kotch, Terrance Kotch, Bianca Krakofsky, Zachariah Krakofsky, Bianca (I) Krakofsky, James Kwasniewski, Pauline Kwasniewski, Rebecca Kwasniewski, Rebecca (I) Kwasniewski, Mak Tan Lebeau, Phillip Ledeau, Daniel Levasseur, Adeline Lippincott, Jennifer Littlepage, Otis Littlepage, Gloria Loggins, Austin Matthias, Jazmin Abreu, John Ace, Sun Ace, Norman Alvarez, Shawna Alvarez, Mercedes Amaro, Jennifer Anaya, Tyreece Augillard, Angelika Austin, Ben Maxie, Joyce McGrew, Walter McGrew, Catherine Milano, Daniel Milano, Leann Money, Robert S. Money, Verna Doriese Montoya, Rito Moreno, Heather Musick, Patricia Musick, Arturo Nava, Jody Navakuku, Steven Navakuku, Zachary Navakuku, Ruth Norman, Susan Northup, Francisco Oquendo, Francisco (I) Oquendo, Marianne Paine, Thomas Paine, Angela Payne, Gloria Payne, Angela (I) Payne, William Persing, Lori Petersen, Claudia Powell, Harue Price, Paul Price, Cory Proffitt, Emily Quintana, Esedor Quintana, Daniel Rael-Musick, Alfredia Riddle, JC Riddle, Itzy Rodriguez, Brendon Ross, Max Rushing, Ashley Samuels, Merrill Samuels, Patricia Schaffer, Jason Schoelkopf, Mary Schoelkopf, Mary (I) Schoelkopf, Benn Sher-Rod, Thomas Skinner, Amanda Smith, Emiko Smith, Kathleen Smith, Korey Smith, Larry Smith, Stella Stewart, Stella (I) Stewart, Rodney Stroman, Jerry Sweet, Pamela Sweet, Jay Talley, Lady Thomas, Sidney Thomas, Donna Thorne, Leslie Thorne, Cynthia Thornton, Victoria Torres, Christopher Torrez, Floyd Trahan, Lynette Trahan, Ernestine Trotter, Gilbert Trujillo, Jr, Terry Trujillo, Karen Turnell, Amanda Turner, Erica Tyndall, Christine Walker, General Walker, Adonis Wallace, Alan Wallace, Isaiah Wallace, Alan (I) Wallace, B. Precious Wallace, Peggy Weber, Windy Weber, Ruth Welchabney, Heather Wheeler, Michael Wheeler, Rebecca Willard, Robert Willard, Jazmene Williams, Kaliah Williams, Nora Williams, Regina Williams, Nora (I) Williams, Kaye Wolfe, Jenni Wood, Ralph Woods, Mikalen Young, Mikalen (I) Young. (Attachments: #1 Summons Summons Request - Buckeye Fire Protection Co., #2 Summons Summons Request - Chemguard, #3 Summons Summons Request - Kidde Fire Fighting, #4 Summons Summons Request - Kidde PLC, #5 Summons Summons Request - Kidde Fenwal, #6 Summons Summons Request - National Foam, Inc., #7 Summons Summons Request - Tyco Fire Products LP, #8 Summons Summons Request - UTC Fire)(Hyman, Kelly)
June 21, 2018 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by William Austin, Christa Baca-Chavez, Christa (I) Baca-Chavez, Cynthia Beers, Stephen Beers, George Belmore, Hannelore Belmore, Garnetta Bevins, Joshua Bevins, Garnetta (I) Bevins, Gary Blake, Sandra Blake, Susan Bohanon, Ellen Bollens, Jesse Bragg, Veronica Burke, Beverly Butcher, Debra Calaghan, Adam Cano, Kym Chavez, Elizabeth Christensen, Paul Christensen, Roselie Clarke, Cesar Collado, Cesar (I) Collado, Frances Louis Cooley, Joyce Cooley, Ashley Cox, Joshua Cox, Maureen Cox, Maureen (I) Cox, Derrick D'Mellow, Nuno Desousa, Diane Dumas, Jordan Dumas, Travis Dumas, Jr, Debbie Duran, Alicia Flaherty, Cornelius Flaherty, Victoria Flaherty, Maria Garbizo, Michael Garbizo, Michael (I) Garbizo, Cindy Gillins, Jermanre Gillins, Morgan Ginther, Carol Glommen, Christopher Graham, Nancy Graham, Malachi Graves, Mykhael Graves, Perseis Graves, Raymond Greene, Renee Greene, Shelia Greene, Raymond (I) Greene, Shirley Grindol, Michael Hammond, Gene Harvey, Jack Hendrix, Santos Hernandez, Ashton Hilke, Jaqueline Hilke, Timothy Hilke, ll, Jaqueline (I) Hilke, Danny Holmes, Brittany Houth, Wendy Houth, William Houth, Diane Johnson, Don Johnson, Erica Johnson, Larry Johnson, Steven Johnson, Steven (I) Johnson, Gerarda Kieselstein, Mark Kieselstein, Marie Kiser, Linda Kotch, Terrance Kotch, Bianca Krakofsky, Zachariah Krakofsky, Bianca (I) Krakofsky, James Kwasniewski, Pauline Kwasniewski, Rebecca Kwasniewski, Rebecca (I) Kwasniewski, Mak Tan Lebeau, Phillip Ledeau, Daniel Levasseur, Adeline Lippincott, Jennifer Littlepage, Otis Littlepage, Gloria Loggins, Austin Matthias, Jazmin Abreu, John Ace, Sun Ace, Norman Alvarez, Shawna Alvarez, Mercedes Amaro, Jennifer Anaya, Tyreece Augillard, Angelika Austin, Ben Maxie, Joyce McGrew, Walter McGrew, Catherine Milano, Daniel Milano, Leann Money, Robert S. Money, Verna Doriese Montoya, Rito Moreno, Heather Musick, Patricia Musick, Arturo Nava, Jody Navakuku, Steven Navakuku, Zachary Navakuku, Ruth Norman, Susan Northup, Francisco Oquendo, Francisco (I) Oquendo, Marianne Paine, Thomas Paine, Angela Payne, Gloria Payne, Angela (I) Payne, William Persing, Lori Petersen, Claudia Powell, Harue Price, Paul Price, Cory Proffitt, Emily Quintana, Esedor Quintana, Daniel Rael-Musick, Alfredia Riddle, JC Riddle, Itzy Rodriguez, Brendon Ross, Max Rushing, Ashley Samuels, Merrill Samuels, Patricia Schaffer, Jason Schoelkopf, Mary Schoelkopf, Mary (I) Schoelkopf, Benn Sher-Rod, Thomas Skinner, Amanda Smith, Emiko Smith, Kathleen Smith, Korey Smith, Larry Smith, Stella Stewart, Stella (I) Stewart, Rodney Stroman, Jerry Sweet, Pamela Sweet, Jay Talley, Lady Thomas, Sidney Thomas, Donna Thorne, Leslie Thorne, Cynthia Thornton, Victoria Torres, Christopher Torrez, Floyd Trahan, Lynette Trahan, Ernestine Trotter, Gilbert Trujillo, Jr, Terry Trujillo, Karen Turnell, Amanda Turner, Erica Tyndall, Christine Walker, General Walker, Adonis Wallace, Alan Wallace, Isaiah Wallace, Alan (I) Wallace, B. Precious Wallace, Peggy Weber, Windy Weber, Ruth Welchabney, Heather Wheeler, Michael Wheeler, Rebecca Willard, Robert Willard, Jazmene Williams, Kaliah Williams, Nora Williams, Regina Williams, Nora (I) Williams, Kaye Wolfe, Jenni Wood, Ralph Woods, Mikalen Young, Mikalen (I) Young. (Attachments: #1 Second Amended Complaint (noted changes))(Hyman, Kelly)
June 20, 2018 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by William Austin, Christa Baca-Chavez, Christa (I) Baca-Chavez, Cynthia Beers, Stephen Beers, George Belmore, Hannelore Belmore, Garnetta Bevins, Joshua Bevins, Garnetta (I) Bevins, Gary Blake, Sandra Blake, Susan Bohanon, Ellen Bollens, Jesse Bragg, Veronica Burke, Beverly Butcher, Debra Calaghan, Adam Cano, Kym Chavez, Elizabeth Christensen, Paul Christensen, Roselie Clarke, Cesar Collado, Cesar (I) Collado, Frances Louis Cooley, Joyce Cooley, Ashley Cox, Joshua Cox, Maureen Cox, Maureen (I) Cox, Derrick D'Mellow, Nuno Desousa, Diane Dumas, Jordan Dumas, Travis Dumas, Jr, Debbie Duran, Alicia Flaherty, Cornelius Flaherty, Victoria Flaherty, Maria Garbizo, Michael Garbizo, Michael (I) Garbizo, Cindy Gillins, Jermanre Gillins, Morgan Ginther, Carol Glommen, Christopher Graham, Nancy Graham, Malachi Graves, Mykhael Graves, Perseis Graves, Raymond Greene, Renee Greene, Shelia Greene, Raymond (I) Greene, Shirley Grindol, Michael Hammond, Gene Harvey, Jack Hendrix, Santos Hernandez, Ashton Hilke, Jaqueline Hilke, Timothy Hilke, ll, Jaqueline (I) Hilke, Danny Holmes, Brittany Houth, Wendy Houth, William Houth, Diane Johnson, Don Johnson, Erica Johnson, Larry Johnson, Steven Johnson, Steven (I) Johnson, Gerarda Kieselstein, Mark Kieselstein, Marie Kiser, Linda Kotch, Terrance Kotch, Bianca Krakofsky, Zachariah Krakofsky, Bianca (I) Krakofsky, James Kwasniewski, Pauline Kwasniewski, Rebecca Kwasniewski, Rebecca (I) Kwasniewski, Mak Tan Lebeau, Phillip Ledeau, Daniel Levasseur, Adeline Lippincott, Jennifer Littlepage, Otis Littlepage, Gloria Loggins, Austin Matthias, Jazmin Abreu, John Ace, Sun Ace, Norman Alvarez, Shawna Alvarez, Mercedes Amaro, Jennifer Anaya, Tyreece Augillard, Angelika Austin, Ben Maxie, Joyce McGrew, Walter McGrew, Catherine Milano, Daniel Milano, Leann Money, Robert S. Money, Verna Doriese Montoya, Rito Moreno, Heather Musick, Patricia Musick, Arturo Nava, Jody Navakuku, Steven Navakuku, Zachary Navakuku, Ruth Norman, Susan Northup, Francisco Oquendo, Francisco (I) Oquendo, Marianne Paine, Thomas Paine, Angela Payne, Gloria Payne, Angela (I) Payne, William Persing, Lori Petersen, Claudia Powell, Harue Price, Paul Price, Cory Proffitt, Emily Quintana, Esedor Quintana, Daniel Rael-Musick, Alfredia Riddle, JC Riddle, Itzy Rodriguez, Brendon Ross, Max Rushing, Ashley Samuels, Merrill Samuels, Patricia Schaffer, Jason Schoelkopf, Mary Schoelkopf, Mary (I) Schoelkopf, Benn Sher-Rod, Thomas Skinner, Amanda Smith, Emiko Smith, Kathleen Smith, Korey Smith, Larry Smith, Stella Stewart, Stella (I) Stewart, Rodney Stroman, Jerry Sweet, Pamela Sweet, Jay Talley, Lady Thomas, Sidney Thomas, Donna Thorne, Leslie Thorne, Cynthia Thornton, Victoria Torres, Christopher Torrez, Floyd Trahan, Lynette Trahan, Ernestine Trotter, Gilbert Trujillo, Jr, Terry Trujillo, Karen Turnell, Amanda Turner, Erica Tyndall, Christine Walker, General Walker, Adonis Wallace, Alan Wallace, Isaiah Wallace, Alan (I) Wallace, B. Precious Wallace, Peggy Weber, Windy Weber, Ruth Welchabney, Heather Wheeler, Michael Wheeler, Rebecca Willard, Robert Willard, Jazmene Williams, Kaliah Williams, Nora Williams, Regina Williams, Nora (I) Williams, Kaye Wolfe, Jenni Wood, Ralph Woods, Mikalen Young, Mikalen (I) Young. (Attachments: #1 Second Amended Complaint (noted changes))(Hyman, Kelly) Modified on 6/20/2018 to update docket text (tsher, ).
June 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER granting #7 Motion to File Second Amended Complaint. Plaintiffs may file their amended complaint no later than June 22, 2018. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 6/19/18. Text Only Entry (kmtlc1 )
June 19, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION for Order to File Second Amended Complaint by Plaintiffs William Austin, Christa Baca-Chavez, Christa (I) Baca-Chavez, Cynthia Beers, Stephen Beers, George Belmore, Hannelore Belmore, Garnetta Bevins, Joshua Bevins, Garnetta (I) Bevins, Gary Blake, Sandra Blake, Susan Bohanon, Ellen Bollens, Jesse Bragg, Veronica Burke, Beverly Butcher, Debra Calaghan, Adam Cano, Kym Chavez, Elizabeth Christensen, Paul Christensen, Roselie Clarke, Cesar Collado, Cesar (I) Collado, Frances Louis Cooley, Joyce Cooley, Ashley Cox, Joshua Cox, Maureen Cox, Maureen (I) Cox, Derrick D'Mellow, Nuno Desousa, Diane Dumas, Jordan Dumas, Travis Dumas, Jr, Debbie Duran, Alicia Flaherty, Cornelius Flaherty, Victoria Flaherty, Maria Garbizo, Michael Garbizo, Michael (I) Garbizo, Cindy Gillins, Jermanre Gillins, Morgan Ginther, Carol Glommen, Christopher Graham, Nancy Graham, Malachi Graves, Mykhael Graves, Perseis Graves, Raymond Greene, Renee Greene, Shelia Greene, Raymond (I) Greene, Shirley Grindol, Michael Hammond, Gene Harvey, Jack Hendrix, Santos Hernandez, Ashton Hilke, Jaqueline Hilke, Timothy Hilke, ll, Jaqueline (I) Hilke, Danny Holmes, Brittany Houth, Wendy Houth, William Houth, Diane Johnson, Don Johnson, Erica Johnson, Larry Johnson, Steven Johnson, Steven (I) Johnson, Gerarda Kieselstein, Mark Kieselstein, Marie Kiser, Linda Kotch, Terrance Kotch, Bianca Krakofsky, Zachariah Krakofsky, Bianca (I) Krakofsky, James Kwasniewski, Pauline Kwasniewski, Rebecca Kwasniewski, Rebecca (I) Kwasniewski, Mak Tan Lebeau, Phillip Ledeau, Daniel Levasseur, Adeline Lippincott, Jennifer Littlepage, Otis Littlepage, Gloria Loggins, Austin Matthias, Jazmin Abreu, John Ace, Sun Ace, Norman Alvarez, Shawna Alvarez, Mercedes Amaro, Jennifer Anaya, Tyreece Augillard, Angelika Austin, Ben Maxie, Joyce McGrew, Walter McGrew, Catherine Milano, Daniel Milano, Leann Money, Robert S. Money, Verna Doriese Montoya, Rito Moreno, Heather Musick, Patricia Musick, Arturo Nava, Jody Navakuku, Steven Navakuku, Zachary Navakuku, Ruth Norman, Susan Northup, Francisco Oquendo, Francisco (I) Oquendo, Marianne Paine, Thomas Paine, Angela Payne, Gloria Payne, Angela (I) Payne, William Persing, Lori Petersen, Claudia Powell, Harue Price, Paul Price, Cory Proffitt, Emily Quintana, Esedor Quintana, Daniel Rael-Musick, Alfredia Riddle, JC Riddle, Itzy Rodriguez, Brendon Ross, Max Rushing, Ashley Samuels, Merrill Samuels, Patricia Schaffer, Jason Schoelkopf, Mary Schoelkopf, Mary (I) Schoelkopf, Benn Sher-Rod, Thomas Skinner, Amanda Smith, Emiko Smith, Kathleen Smith, Korey Smith, Larry Smith, Stella Stewart, Stella (I) Stewart, Rodney Stroman, Jerry Sweet, Pamela Sweet, Jay Talley, Lady Thomas, Sidney Thomas, Donna Thorne, Leslie Thorne, Cynthia Thornton, Victoria Torres, Christopher Torrez, Floyd Trahan, Lynette Trahan, Ernestine Trotter, Gilbert Trujillo, Jr, Terry Trujillo, Karen Turnell, Amanda Turner, Erica Tyndall, Christine Walker, General Walker, Adonis Wallace, Alan Wallace, Isaiah Wallace, Alan (I) Wallace, B. Precious Wallace, Peggy Weber, Windy Weber, Ruth Welchabney, Heather Wheeler, Michael Wheeler, Rebecca Willard, Robert Willard, Jazmene Williams, Kaliah Williams, Nora Williams, Regina Williams, Nora (I) Williams, Kaye Wolfe, Jenni Wood, Ralph Woods, Mikalen Young, Mikalen (I) Young. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT, #2 Second Amended Complaint (mark-through), #3 Second Amended Complaint (Clean))(Hyman, Kelly)
June 19, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Kelly A. Hyman on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party William Austin(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party William Austin(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Christa Baca-Chavez(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Christa Baca-Chavez(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Christa (I) Baca-Chavez (pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Christa (I) Baca-Chavez (pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Cynthia Beers(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Cynthia Beers(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Stephen Beers(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Stephen Beers(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party George Belmore(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party George Belmore(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Hannelore Belmore(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Hannelore Belmore(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Garnetta Bevins(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Garnetta Bevins(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Joshua Bevins(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Joshua Bevins(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Garnetta (I) Bevins (pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Garnetta (I) Bevins (pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Gary Blake(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Gary Blake(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Sandra Blake(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Sandra Blake(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Susan Bohanon(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Susan Bohanon(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Ellen Bollens(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Ellen Bollens(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jesse Bragg(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jesse Bragg(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Veronica Burke(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Veronica Burke(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Beverly Butcher(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Beverly Butcher(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Debra Calaghan(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Debra Calaghan(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Adam Cano(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Adam Cano(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Kym Chavez(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Kym Chavez(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Elizabeth Christensen(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Elizabeth Christensen(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Paul Christensen(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Paul Christensen(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Roselie Clarke(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Roselie Clarke(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Cesar Collado(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Cesar Collado(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Cesar (I) Collado (pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Cesar (I) Collado (pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Frances Louis Cooley(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Frances Louis Cooley(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Joyce Cooley(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Joyce Cooley(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Ashley Cox(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Ashley Cox(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Joshua Cox(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Joshua Cox(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Maureen Cox(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Maureen Cox(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Maureen (I) Cox (pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Maureen (I) Cox (pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Derrick D'Mellow(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Derrick D'Mellow(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Nuno Desousa(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Nuno Desousa(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Diane Dumas(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Diane Dumas(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jordan Dumas(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jordan Dumas(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Travis Dumas, Jr(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Travis Dumas, Jr(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Debbie Duran(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Debbie Duran(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Alicia Flaherty(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Alicia Flaherty(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Cornelius Flaherty(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Cornelius Flaherty(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Victoria Flaherty(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Victoria Flaherty(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Maria Garbizo(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Maria Garbizo(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Michael Garbizo(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Michael Garbizo(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Michael (I) Garbizo (pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Michael (I) Garbizo (pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Cindy Gillins(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Cindy Gillins(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jermanre Gillins(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jermanre Gillins(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Morgan Ginther(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Morgan Ginther(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Carol Glommen(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Carol Glommen(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Christopher Graham(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Christopher Graham(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Nancy Graham(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Nancy Graham(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Malachi Graves(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Malachi Graves(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Mykhael Graves(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Mykhael Graves(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Perseis Graves(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Perseis Graves(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Raymond Greene(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Raymond Greene(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Renee Greene(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Renee Greene(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Shelia Greene(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Shelia Greene(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Raymond (I) Greene (pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Raymond (I) Greene (pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Shirley Grindol(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Shirley Grindol(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Michael Hammond (pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Michael Hammond (pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Gene Harvey(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Gene Harvey(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jack Hendrix(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jack Hendrix(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Santos Hernandez(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Santos Hernandez(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Ashton Hilke(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Ashton Hilke(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jaqueline Hilke(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jaqueline Hilke(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Timothy Hilke, ll(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Timothy Hilke, ll(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jaqueline (I) Hilke (pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jaqueline (I) Hilke (pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Danny Holmes(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Danny Holmes(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Brittany Houth(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Brittany Houth(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Wendy Houth(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Wendy Houth(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party William Houth(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party William Houth(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Diane Johnson(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Diane Johnson(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Don Johnson(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Don Johnson(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Erica Johnson(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Erica Johnson(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Larry Johnson(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Larry Johnson(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Steven Johnson(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Steven Johnson(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Steven (I) Johnson (pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Steven (I) Johnson (pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Gerarda Kieselstein(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Gerarda Kieselstein(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Mark Kieselstein(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Mark Kieselstein(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Marie Kiser(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Marie Kiser(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Linda Kotch(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Linda Kotch(pty:pla), At
June 14, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Patrick James Lanciotti on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party William Austin(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party William Austin(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Christa Baca-Chavez(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Christa Baca-Chavez(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Christa (I) Baca-Chavez (pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Christa (I) Baca-Chavez (pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Cynthia Beers(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Cynthia Beers(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Stephen Beers(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Stephen Beers(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party George Belmore(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party George Belmore(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Hannelore Belmore(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Hannelore Belmore(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Garnetta Bevins(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Garnetta Bevins(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Joshua Bevins(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Joshua Bevins(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Garnetta (I) Bevins (pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Garnetta (I) Bevins (pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Gary Blake(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Gary Blake(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Sandra Blake(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Sandra Blake(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Susan Bohanon(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Susan Bohanon(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Ellen Bollens(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Ellen Bollens(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Jesse Bragg(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Jesse Bragg(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Veronica Burke(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Veronica Burke(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Beverly Butcher(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Beverly Butcher(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Debra Calaghan(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Debra Calaghan(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Adam Cano(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Adam Cano(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Kym Chavez(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Kym Chavez(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Elizabeth Christensen(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Elizabeth Christensen(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Paul Christensen(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Paul Christensen(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Roselie Clarke(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Roselie Clarke(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Cesar Collado(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Cesar Collado(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Cesar (I) Collado (pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Cesar (I) Collado (pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Frances Louis Cooley(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Frances Louis Cooley(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Joyce Cooley(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Joyce Cooley(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Ashley Cox(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Ashley Cox(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Joshua Cox(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Joshua Cox(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Maureen Cox(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Maureen Cox(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Maureen (I) Cox (pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Maureen (I) Cox (pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Derrick D'Mellow(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Derrick D'Mellow(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Nuno Desousa(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Nuno Desousa(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Diane Dumas(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Diane Dumas(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Jordan Dumas(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Jordan Dumas(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Travis Dumas, Jr(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Travis Dumas, Jr(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Debbie Duran(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Debbie Duran(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Alicia Flaherty(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Alicia Flaherty(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Cornelius Flaherty(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Cornelius Flaherty(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Victoria Flaherty(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Victoria Flaherty(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Maria Garbizo(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Maria Garbizo(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Michael Garbizo(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Michael Garbizo(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Michael (I) Garbizo (pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Michael (I) Garbizo (pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Cindy Gillins(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Cindy Gillins(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Jermanre Gillins(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Jermanre Gillins(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Morgan Ginther(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Morgan Ginther(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Carol Glommen(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Carol Glommen(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Christopher Graham(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Christopher Graham(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Nancy Graham(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Nancy Graham(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Malachi Graves(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Malachi Graves(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Mykhael Graves(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Mykhael Graves(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Perseis Graves(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Perseis Graves(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Raymond Greene(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Raymond Greene(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Renee Greene(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Renee Greene(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Shelia Greene(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Shelia Greene(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Raymond (I) Greene (pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Raymond (I) Greene (pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Shirley Grindol(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Shirley Grindol(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Michael Hammond (pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Michael Hammond (pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Gene Harvey(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Gene Harvey(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Jack Hendrix(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Jack Hendrix(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Santos Hernandez(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Santos Hernandez(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Ashton Hilke(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Ashton Hilke(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Jaqueline Hilke(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Jaqueline Hilke(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Timothy Hilke, ll(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Timothy Hilke, ll(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Jaqueline (I) Hilke (pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Jaqueline (I) Hilke (pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Danny Holmes(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Danny Holmes(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Brittany Houth(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Brittany Houth(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Wendy Houth(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Wendy Houth(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party William Houth(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party William Houth(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciott
May 17, 2018 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs, filed by Veronica Burke, Beverly Butcher, Debra Calaghan, Adam Cano, Kym Chavez, Elizabeth Christensen, Paul Christensen, Roselie Clarke, Cesar Collado, Cesar (I) Collado, Frances Louis Cooley, Joyce Cooley, Ashley Cox, Joshua Cox, Maureen Cox, Maureen (I) Cox, Derrick D'Mellow, Nuno Desousa, Diane Dumas, Jordan Dumas, Travis Dumas, Jr, Debbie Duran, Alicia Flaherty, Cornelius Flaherty, Victoria Flaherty, Maria Garbizo, Michael Garbizo, Michael (I) Garbizo, Cindy Gillins, Jermanre Gillins, Morgan Ginther, Carol Glommen, Christopher Graham, Nancy Graham, Malachi Graves, Mykhael Graves, Perseis Graves, Raymond Greene, Renee Greene, Shelia Greene, Raymond (I) Greene, Shirley Grindol, Michael Hammon, Gene Harvey, Jack Hendrix, Santos Hernandez, Ashton Hilke, Jaqueline Hilke, Timothy Hilke, ll, Jaqueline (I) Hilke, Danny Holmes, Brittany Houth, Wendy Houth, William Houth, Diane Johnson, Don Johnson, Erica Johnson, Larry Johnson, Steven Johnson, Steven (I) Johnson, Gerarda Kieselstein, Mark Kieselstein, Marie Kiser, Linda Kotch, Terrance Kotch, Bianca Krakofsky, Zachariah Krakofsky, Bianca (I) Krakofsky, James Kwasniewski, Pauline Kwasniewski, Rebecca Kwasniewski, Rebecca (I) Kwasniewski, Mak Tan Lebeau, Phillip Ledeau, Daniel Levasseur, Adeline Lippincott, Jennifer Littlepage, Otis Littlepage, Gloria Loggins, Austin Matthias, Ben Maxie, Joyce McGrew, Walter McGrew, Catherine Milano, Daniel Milano, Leann Money, Robert S. Money, Verna Doriese Montoya, Rito Moreno, Heather Musick, Patricia Musick, Arturo Nava, Jody Navakuku, Steven Navakuku, Zachary Navakuku, Ruth Norman, Susan Northup, Francisco Oquendo, Francisco (I) Oquendo, Marianne Paine, Thomas Paine, Angela Payne, Gloria Payne, Angela (I) Payne, William Persing, Lori Petersen, Claudia Powell, Harue Price, Paul Price, Cory Proffitt, Emily Quintana, Esedor Quintana, Daniel Rael-Musick, Alfredia Riddle, JC Riddle, Itzy Rodriguez, Brendon Ross, Max Rushing, Ashley Samuels, Merrill Samuels, Patricia Schaffer, Jason Schoelkopf, Mary Schoelkopf, Mary (I) Schoelkopf, Benn Sher-Rod, Thomas Skinner, Amanda Smith, Emiko Smith, Kathleen Smith, Korey Smith, Larry Smith, Stella Stewart, Stella (I) Stewart, Rodney Stroman, Jerry Sweet, Pamela Sweet, Jay Talley, Lady Thomas, Sidney Thomas, Donna Thorne, Leslie Thorne, Cynthia Thornton, Victoria Torres, Christopher Torrez, Floyd Trahan, Lynette Trahan, Ernestine Trotter, Gilbert Trujillo, Jr, Terry Trujillo, Karen Turnell, Amanda Turner, Erica Tyndall, Christine Walker, General Walker, Adonis Wallace, Alan Wallace, Isaiah Wallace, Alan (I) Wallace, B. Precious Wallace, Peggy Weber, Windy Weber, Ruth Welchabney, Heather Wheeler, Michael Wheeler, Rebecca Willard, Robert Willard, Jazmene Williams, Kaliah Williams, Nora Williams, Regina Williams, Nora (I) Williams, Kaye Wolfe, Jenni Wood, Ralph Woods, Mikalen Young, Mikalen (I) Young.(Davidson, Durant)
May 11, 2018 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (rsams, )
May 11, 2018 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Text Only Entry. (rsams, ) Modified on 5/21/2018 to correct docket entry (rsams, ).
May 11, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6100446)Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Veronica Burke(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Veronica Burke(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Beverly Butcher(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Beverly Butcher(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Debra Calaghan(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Debra Calaghan(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Adam Cano(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Adam Cano(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Kym Chavez(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Kym Chavez(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Elizabeth Christensen(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Elizabeth Christensen(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Paul Christensen(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Paul Christensen(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Roselie Clarke(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Roselie Clarke(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Cesar Collado(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Cesar Collado(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Cesar Collado(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Cesar Collado(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Cesar Collado(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Cesar Collado(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Cesar Collado(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Cesar Collado(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Frances Louis Cooley(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Frances Louis Cooley(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Joyce Cooley(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Joyce Cooley(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Ashley Cox(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Ashley Cox(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Joshua Cox(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Joshua Cox(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Maureen Cox(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Maureen Cox(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Maureen Cox(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Maureen Cox(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Maureen Cox(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Maureen Cox(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Derrick D'Mellow(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Derrick D'Mellow(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Nuno Desousa(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Nuno Desousa(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Diane Dumas(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Diane Dumas(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Jordan Dumas(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Jordan Dumas(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Debbie Duran(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Debbie Duran(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Alicia Flaherty(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Alicia Flaherty(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Cornelius Flaherty(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Cornelius Flaherty(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Victoria Flaherty(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Victoria Flaherty(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Maria Garbizo(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Maria Garbizo(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Michael Garbizo(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Michael Garbizo(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Michael Garbizo(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Michael Garbizo(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Cindy Gillins(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Cindy Gillins(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Jermanre Gillins(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Jermanre Gillins(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Morgan Ginther(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Morgan Ginther(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Carol Glommen(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Carol Glommen(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Christopher Graham(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Christopher Graham(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Nancy Graham(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Nancy Graham(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Malachi Graves(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Malachi Graves(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Mykhael Graves(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Mykhael Graves(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Perseis Graves(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Perseis Graves(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Raymond Greene(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Raymond Greene(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Raymond Greene(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Raymond Greene(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Renee Greene(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Renee Greene(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Shelia Greene(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Shelia Greene(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Shirley Grindol(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Shirley Grindol(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Michael Hammon(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Michael Hammon(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Gene Harvey(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Gene Harvey(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Jack Hendrix(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Jack Hendrix(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Santos Hernandez(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Santos Hernandez(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Ashton Hilke(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Ashton Hilke(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Jaqueline Hilke(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Jaqueline Hilke(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Jaqueline Hilke(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Jaqueline Hilke(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Timothy Hilke, ll(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Timothy Hilke, ll(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Danny Holmes(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Danny Holmes(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Brittany Houth(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Brittany Houth(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Wendy Houth(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Wendy Houth(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party William Houth(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party William Houth(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Diane Johnson(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Diane Johnson(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Don Johnson(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Don Johnson(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Erica Johnson(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Erica Johnson(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Larry Johnson(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Larry Johnson(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Steven Johnson(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Steven Johnson(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Steven Johnson(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Steven Johnson(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Gerarda Kieselstein(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Gerarda Kieselstein(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Mark Kieselstein(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Mark Kieselstein(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Marie Kiser(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Marie Kiser(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Linda Kotch(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Linda Kotch(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Terrance Kotch(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Terrance Kotch(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Bianca Krakofsky(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Bianca Krakofsky(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Bianca Krakofsky(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Bianca Krakofsky(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Zachariah Krakofsky(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Zachariah Krakofsky(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party James Kwasniewski(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party James Kwasniewski(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Pauline Kwasniewski(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Pauline Kwasniewski(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Rebecca Kwasniewski(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Rebecca Kwasniewski(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party rebecca Kwasniewski(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party rebecca Kwasniewski(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Mak Tan Lebeau(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davids

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith et al v. 3M Company, The et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Floyd Trahan
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kym Chavez
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert S. Money
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra Calaghan
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frances Louis Cooley
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Blake
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia Beers
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Austin
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bianca Krakofsky
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JC Riddle
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Torrez
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Price
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Regina Williams
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Itzy Rodriguez
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela Sweet
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gilbert Trujillo, Jr.
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nuno Desousa
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Ace
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruth Norman
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shawna Alvarez
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jazmin Abreu
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Belmore
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lori Petersen
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victoria Flaherty
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry Trujillo
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Korey Smith
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Turnell
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diane Johnson
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arturo Nava
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Schoelkopf
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Payne
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nora Williams
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Renee Greene
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zachary Navakuku
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zachariah Krakofsky
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ralph Woods
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Bohanon
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gloria Loggins
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon Ross
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jenni Wood
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Milano
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyreece Augillard
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Austin Matthias
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Anaya
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Hammon
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: General Walker
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Hilke, ll
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emily Quintana
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Paine
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ellen Bollens
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joyce Cooley
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Smith
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pauline Kwasniewski
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victoria Torres
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda Turner
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerarda Kieselstein
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Walter McGrew
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mykhael Graves
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francisco Oquendo
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Littlepage
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gloria Payne
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jazmene Williams
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leslie Thorne
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ben Maxie
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christa Baca-Chavez
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rodney Stroman
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jermanre Gillins
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rito Moreno
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shirley Grindol
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diane Dumas
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beverly Butcher
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heather Musick
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Blake
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stella Stewart
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashley Samuels
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kaye Wolfe
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Beers
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Northup
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Isaiah Wallace
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebecca Willard
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashley Cox
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jordan Dumas
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alan Wallace
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Levasseur
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emiko Smith
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cornelius Flaherty
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mercedes Amaro
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adeline Lippincott
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Willard
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy Graham
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sidney Thomas
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Houth
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jay Talley
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Schoelkopf
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marie Kiser
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danny Holmes
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine Walker
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debbie Duran
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Verna Doriese Montoya
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Johnson
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry Sweet
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harue Price
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adonis Wallace
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gene Harvey
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Veronica Burke
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peggy Weber
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marianne Paine
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sun Ace
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wendy Houth
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alfredia Riddle
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Rael-Musick
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Wheeler
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia Thornton
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesse Bragg
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: rebecca Kwasniewski
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Otis Littlepage
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Christensen
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Persing
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: B.Precious Wallace
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heather Wheeler
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathleen Smith
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruth Welchabney
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jody Navakuku
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erica Tyndall
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mak Tan Lebeau
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Cox
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jack Hendrix
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benn Sher-Rod
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond Greene
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Kotch
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Christensen
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Garbizo
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brittany Houth
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erica Johnson
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mikalen Young
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lynette Trahan
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Johnson
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Morgan Ginther
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maureen Cox
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lady Thomas
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phillip Ledeau
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angelika Austin
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Musick
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joyce McGrew
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wendy Weber
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cesar Collado
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ernestine Trotter
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Max Rushing
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Graham
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda Smith
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Kwasniewski
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alicia Flaherty
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hannelore Belmore
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Don Johnson
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roselie Clarke
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Navakuku
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Garbizo
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terrance Kotch
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jaqueline Hilke
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travis Dumas, Jr.
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Kieselstein
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Schaffer
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Claudia Powell
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adam Cano
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Thorne
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cindy Gillins
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Catherine Milano
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shelia Greene
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Esedor Quintana
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cory Proffitt
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashton Hilke
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Norman Alvarez
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Bevins
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol Glommen
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Malachi Graves
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Garnetta Bevins
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kaliah Williams
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Merrill Samuels
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derrick D'Mellow
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Skinner
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Perseis Graves
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leann Money
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Santos Hernandez
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cesar (I) Collado
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: B. Precious Wallace
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mikalen (I) Young
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nora (I) Williams
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebecca (I) Kwasniewski
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maureen (I) Cox
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael (I) Garbizo
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Windy Weber
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond (I) Greene
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jaqueline (I) Hilke
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bianca (I) Krakofsky
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alan (I) Wallace
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stella (I) Stewart
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven (I) Johnson
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Hammond
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary (I) Schoelkopf
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Garnetta (I) Bevins
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brendon Ross
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela (I) Payne
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christa (I) Baca-Chavez
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francisco (I) Oquendo
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kidde PLC, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The 3M Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UTE Fire & Security Americas Corporation, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chemguard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kidde Fire Fighting, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Buckeye Fire Equipment, Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: national Foam, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyco Fire Products, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kiddie-Fenwal, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M Company, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GE Interlogix, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Minnesota Minning and Manufacturing, Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Williams US Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Williams Holdings, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chubb National Foam, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?