Craig Hospital v. Aetna Health, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Craig Hospital
Defendant: Aetna Health, Inc., Coventry Healthcare of Kansas, Inc. and Coventry Health and Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2018cv01789
Filed: July 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Arapahoe
Presiding Judge: Philip A Brimmer
Referring Judge: Michael E Hegarty
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 30, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 08/30/2018. Discovery due by 5/9/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 6/10/2019. (mdave, )
August 29, 2018 Filing 22 COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Scheduling Conference held on 8/29/2018. Set/Reset Hearings: Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/12/2019 10:15 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. FTR: Courtroom A501. (mdave, )
August 22, 2018 Filing 21 Proposed Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Craig Hospital. (Ewing, Robert)
August 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty for non-dispositive matters. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, and (4) conduct a pretrial conference and enter a pretrial order. Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 8/15/18. Text Only Entry (pabsec)
August 8, 2018 Filing 19 MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE by Senior Judge Blackburn. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Philip A. Brimmer. All future pleadings should be designated as 18-cv-01789-PAB. (athom, )
August 6, 2018 Filing 18 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #16 Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn. All future pleadings should be designated as 18-cv-01789-REB. (Text Only Entry) (tsher, )
August 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MINUTE ORDER re: #16 Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge filed by Craig Hospital by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 8/6/2018. Parties do not consent. The Court directs the Clerk of the Court to reassign this case under D.C. Colo. LCivR 40.1(a). (tsher, )
August 3, 2018 Filing 16 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Craig Hospital All parties do not consent.. (Ewing, Robert)
July 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 7/26/2018. Scheduling Conference is VACATED and RESET to 8/29/2018 10:30 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. (tsher, )
July 23, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE of State Court Docket Sheet/Register of Actions by Defendants Aetna Health, Inc., Coventry Health and Life Insurance Company, Coventry Healthcare of Kansas, Inc. (Hardy, Franz)
July 23, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Maral Shoaei on behalf of Aetna Health, Inc., Coventry Health and Life Insurance Company, Coventry Healthcare of Kansas, Inc.Attorney Maral Shoaei added to party Aetna Health, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Maral Shoaei added to party Coventry Health and Life Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Maral Shoaei added to party Coventry Healthcare of Kansas, Inc.(pty:dft) (Shoaei, Maral)
July 20, 2018 Filing 12 ANSWER to #3 Complaint with Jury Demand by Aetna Health, Inc., Coventry Health and Life Insurance Company, Coventry Healthcare of Kansas, Inc..(Hardy, Franz)
July 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 07/20/2018. Consent Form due by 8/3/2018. (mdave, )
July 19, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Robert Craig Ewing on behalf of Craig HospitalAttorney Robert Craig Ewing added to party Craig Hospital(pty:pla) (Ewing, Robert)
July 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 07/17/2018. Scheduling Conference set for 8/14/2018 11:00 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. It is ORDERED that the Defendants shall notify all parties who have not entered an appearance of the date and time of the Scheduling Conference. (mdave, )
July 16, 2018 Filing 7 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (rvill, )
July 13, 2018 Filing 8 STATE COURT ORDER Granting Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Arapahoe County District Court Judge Elizabeth Ann Weishaupl on July 9, 2018. (rvill, )
July 13, 2018 Filing 6 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Text Only Entry. (rvill, )
July 13, 2018 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint upon Coventry Healthcare of Kansas, Inc. on 07/02/2018. (rvill, )
July 13, 2018 Filing 4 Service of Process of Summons and Complaint upon Aetna Health, Inc. on 06/15/2018. (rvill, )
July 13, 2018 Filing 3 COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND against Aetna Health, Inc., Coventry Health and Life Insurance Company and Coventry Healthcare of Kansas, Inc., filed by Craig Hospital.(rvill, )
July 13, 2018 Filing 2 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawls of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (rvill, )
July 13, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Coventry Healthcare of Kansas, Inc., Coventry Health and Life Insurance Company, Aetna Health, Inc. from Arapahoe County District Court, Case Number 2018-CV-31407. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-6196991), filed by Coventry Healthcare of Kansas, Inc., Coventry Health and Life Insurance Company, Aetna Health, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit B to Notice of Removal, #3 Exhibit C to Notice of Removal, #4 Exhibit D to Notice of Removal, #5 State Court Complaint and Jury Demand, #6 State Court Return of Service on Aetna, #7 State Court Return of Service on Coventry, #8 State Court Delay Reduction Order, #9 State Court Order Regarding Plan for Settlement, #10 State Court Order Granting Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time, #11 Civil Cover Sheet, #12 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet)(Hardy, Franz)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Craig Hospital v. Aetna Health, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aetna Health, Inc.
Represented By: Franz Hardy
Represented By: Maral Shoaei
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coventry Healthcare of Kansas, Inc.
Represented By: Franz Hardy
Represented By: Maral Shoaei
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coventry Health and Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Franz Hardy
Represented By: Maral Shoaei
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Craig Hospital
Represented By: Robert Craig Ewing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?