Craig Hospital v. Baker Hughes Incorporated Welfare Benefits Plan et al

Plaintiff: Craig Hospital
Defendant: United HealthCare Services, Inc., Baker Hughes Incorporated Welfare Benefit Plan and Baker Hughes Incorporated Welfare Benefits Plan
Case Number: 1:2018cv01791
Filed: July 13, 2018
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Arapahoe
Presiding Judge: Richard P Matsch
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act (ERISA)
Cause of Action: 29:1104
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
August 27, 2018 11 Featured Case ORDER DISMISSING CASE without prejudice, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 8/27/2018. Text Only Entry (ktera)
August 24, 2018 10 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES:re: 9 Notice of Noncompliance with Court Procedures/Rules, filed by attorney R. Craig Ewing. Attorney has used an incorrect signature format in violation of D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 4.3(a) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases). DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. (Text Only Entry) (evana, )
August 24, 2018 9 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES: re: #8 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Case filed by attorney R. Craig Ewing. The document is incorrectly formatted. DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - future documents must be filed pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 10.1 (Text Only Entry) (evana, )
August 24, 2018 8 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Case Without Prejudice by Plaintiff Craig Hospital (Ewing, Robert)
August 3, 2018 7 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Mark Douglas Gibson on behalf of Baker Hughes Incorporated Welfare Benefits Plan, United HealthCare Services, Inc.Attorney Mark Douglas Gibson added to party Baker Hughes Incorporated Welfare Benefits Plan(pty:dft), Attorney Mark Douglas Gibson added to party United HealthCare Services, Inc.(pty:dft) (Gibson, Mark)
August 3, 2018 6 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Briana Liston Black on behalf of Baker Hughes Incorporated Welfare Benefits Plan, United HealthCare Services, Inc. (Black, Briana)
August 3, 2018 5 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond to the Complaint by Defendants United HealthCare Services, Inc., Baker Hughes Incorporated Welfare Benefits Plan. United HealthCare Services, Inc. answer due 8/27/2018; Baker Hughes Incorporated Welfare Benefits Plan answer due 8/27/2018. (Black, Briana)
July 16, 2018 4 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES:re: #1 Complaint, filed by attorneyRobert Craig Ewing.Attorney or pro se has used an incorrect signature format in violation of D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 4.3(d) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases). DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. In the future, the filer must use the correct format for the signature block on all future documents. (Text Only Entry) (rroge, )
July 13, 2018 3 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (rroge, )
July 13, 2018 2 Case assigned to Judge Richard P. Matsch and drawn to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Text Only Entry. (rroge, )
July 13, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against Baker Hughes Incorporated Welfare Benefit Plan, United HealthCare Services, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6197151)Attorney Robert Craig Ewing added to party Craig Hospital(pty:pla), filed by Craig Hospital. (Attachments: #1 Summons Proposed Summons Baker Hughes, #2 Summons Proposed Summons United, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Ewing, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Craig Hospital v. Baker Hughes Incorporated Welfare Benefits Plan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Craig Hospital
Represented By: Robert Craig Ewing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United HealthCare Services, Inc.
Represented By: Briana Liston Black
Represented By: Mark Douglas Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baker Hughes Incorporated Welfare Benefit Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baker Hughes Incorporated Welfare Benefits Plan
Represented By: Briana Liston Black
Represented By: Mark Douglas Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?