Kabat v. United States Department of Health and Human Services, The et al
Plaintiff: Mark A. Kabat
Defendant: Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services, The, Alex M. Azar, II, Novitas Solutions, Inc. and United States Department of Health and Human Services, The
Case Number: 1:2018cv01969
Filed: August 2, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: Wiley Y Daniel
Nature of Suit: APA Review/Appeal
Cause of Action: 05:0706
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2018 Filing 9 Utility Resetting Answer Deadlines: Pursuant to the filing of the #8 Stipulation to Respond to Complaint, Alex M. Azar, II answer due 10/30/2018; Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services, The answer due 10/30/2018; United States Department of Health and Human Services, The answer due 10/30/2018. Text Only Entry (evana, )
September 28, 2018 Filing 8 STIPULATION for Extension of Time TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by Defendants Alex M. Azar, II, Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services, The, United States Department of Health and Human Services, The. (Fairclough, Bradyn)
August 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER Defendant Novitas Solutions, Inc.'s ("Novitas") Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time (ECF No. #6 ) is GRANTED. Defendants' consolidated Answer or other response to Plaintiffs Complaint shall be filed not later than October 9, 2018, by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 8/27/2018. (evana, )
August 27, 2018 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint, by Defendant Novitas Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Fairclough, Bradyn)
August 27, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Bradyn T. Fairclough on behalf of All Defendants Attorney Bradyn T. Fairclough added to party Alex M. Azar, II(pty:dft), Attorney Bradyn T. Fairclough added to party Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services, The(pty:dft), Attorney Bradyn T. Fairclough added to party Novitas Solutions, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Bradyn T. Fairclough added to party United States Department of Health and Human Services, The(pty:dft) (Fairclough, Bradyn)
August 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REGARDING INSTRUCTIONS FOR JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN for Administrative Agency Actions, by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 8/6/2018. (evana, )
August 3, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (rvill, )
August 2, 2018 Filing 2 Case assigned to Judge Wiley Y. Daniel. Text Only Entry. (rvill, )
August 2, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR JUDICIAL REVIEW OF ADMINISTRATIVE DECISION against All Plaintiffs (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6228234)Attorney Meghan Elizabeth Pound added to party Mark A Kabat, D.O.(pty:pla), filed by Mark A Kabat, D.O.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons to DHHS, #3 Summons Summons to DHHS Secretary, #4 Summons Summons to CMS, #5 Summons Summons to Novitas Solutions Inc)(Pound, Meghan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kabat v. United States Department of Health and Human Services, The et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services, The
Represented By: Bradyn T. Fairclough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex M. Azar, II
Represented By: Bradyn T. Fairclough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Novitas Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Bradyn T. Fairclough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Health and Human Services, The
Represented By: Bradyn T. Fairclough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark A. Kabat
Represented By: Meghan Elizabeth Pound
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?