Lindstrom et al v. Century Communities, Inc et al
Plaintiff: Nina Lindstrom and Robert Lindstrom
Defendant: Century Communities, Inc and Century at Autumn Valley Ranch, LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv01979
Filed: August 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Weld
Presiding Judge: Christine M Arguello
Referring Judge: Michael E Hegarty
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 3604 (f)(3)(c) - Fair Housing Amendments Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2018 Filing 18 Defendants' ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Century Communities, Inc, Century at Autumn Valley Ranch, LLC.(Casey, Patrick)
September 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MINUTE ORDER granting in part and denying in part #15 Joint Motion for Continuance of Scheduling Conference by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 09/19/2018. Scheduling Conference set for 10/9/2018 is vacated and rescheduled to 10/25/2018 10:15 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. (mdave, )
September 18, 2018 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM regarding #15 Joint MOTION to Continue Scheduling Conference filed by Century at Autumn Valley Ranch, LLC, Century Communities, Inc. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 9/18/2018. Text Only Entry (cmasec )
September 18, 2018 Filing 15 Joint MOTION to Continue Scheduling Conference by Defendants Century Communities, Inc, Century at Autumn Valley Ranch, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Casey, Patrick)
September 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER granting #12 Defendants Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 09/18/2018. Century Communities, Inc answer due 10/2/2018; Century at Autumn Valley Ranch, LLC answer due 10/2/2018. (mdave, )
September 17, 2018 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM regarding #12 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint, filed by Century at Autumn Valley Ranch, LLC, Century Communities, Inc. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 9/17/2018. Text Only Entry (cmasec)
September 17, 2018 Filing 12 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint, by Defendants Century Communities, Inc, Century at Autumn Valley Ranch, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) to the Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint)(Casey, Patrick)
August 28, 2018 Filing 11 Utility Setting/Resetting Deadlines/Hearings: Century Communities, Inc answer due 9/18/2018; Century at Autumn Valley Ranch, LLC answer due 9/18/2018 per #9 Stipulation. Text Only Entry (athom, )
August 28, 2018 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Casey, Patrick)
August 28, 2018 Filing 9 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Defendants Century Communities, Inc, Century at Autumn Valley Ranch, LLC. (Casey, Patrick)
August 28, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Patrick James Casey, II on behalf of All Defendants Attorney Patrick James Casey, II added to party Century Communities, Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Patrick James Casey, II added to party Century at Autumn Valley Ranch, LLC(pty:dft) (Casey, Patrick)
August 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 08/08/2018. Scheduling Conference set for 10/9/2018 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. The Plaintiffs shall notify all parties who have not entered an appearance of the date and time of the Scheduling Conference. (mdave, )
August 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Magistrate Judge Hegarty is designated to conduct NDISPO proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b). The parties should expect to be given a firm trial setting that is 90 to 120 days from the date of the final pretrial conference, and should be available for trial accordingly. FURTHER, Court-sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, the Court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. SO ORDERED by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 8/7/2018. Text Only Entry (cmasec)
August 7, 2018 Filing 5 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #4 Memorandum Returning Case. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Christine M. Arguello. All future pleadings should be designated as 18-cv-01979-CMA. (Text Only Entry) (rkeec)
August 7, 2018 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel. (rkeec)
August 6, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (rvill, )
August 6, 2018 Filing 2 Case assigned to Judge Wiley Y. Daniel and drawn to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Text Only Entry. (rvill, )
August 6, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Century Communities, Inc, Century at Autumn Valley Ranch, LLC (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6231095)Attorney Amy Farr Robertson added to party Nina Lindstrom(pty:pla), Attorney Amy Farr Robertson added to party Robert Lindstrom(pty:pla), filed by Nina Lindstrom, Robert Lindstrom. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Robertson, Amy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lindstrom et al v. Century Communities, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Century Communities, Inc
Represented By: Patrick James Casey, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Century at Autumn Valley Ranch, LLC
Represented By: Patrick James Casey, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nina Lindstrom
Represented By: Amy Farr Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Lindstrom
Represented By: Amy Farr Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?