State Farm Fire and Casualty Company et al v. BSH Home Appliances Corporation
Plaintiff: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, Millicent Flanigan and Gardner Flanigan
Defendant: BSH Home Appliances Corporation
Case Number: 1:2018cv01983
Filed: August 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Routt
Presiding Judge: Wiley Y Daniel
Referring Judge: Gordon P Gallagher
2 Judge: Raymond P Moore
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER:Scheduling Conference is re-set for 10/15/2018 at 09:45 AM (instead of 09:00 AM) still in Room 323 (Grand Junction) before Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Telephone appearances still approved on the terms set forth in the Court's prior order. By Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on October 2, 2018. Text Only Entry (gpgsec )
September 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #21 Joint Motion for Leave to appear telephonically. The parties shall contact the Court at (970) 241-8932, Extension 8225 at the time of the hearing. The parties shall coordinate among themselves so that all parties are on one line at the time the call is placed to the Court. The Court does not have the ability to conference multiple parties. By Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on September 27, 2018. Text Only Entry (gpgsec )
September 27, 2018 Filing 21 Joint MOTION for Leave to Attend Scheduling Conference by Telephone, filed by Plaintiffs and by Defendant BSH Home Appliances Corporation. (Ream, Lance)
August 20, 2018 Filing 20 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent BSH Hausgerate GmbH for BSH Home Appliances Corporation. (Ream, Lance)
August 17, 2018 Filing 19 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company for State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Tilley, Adrian)
August 17, 2018 Filing 18 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Adrian P. Tilley on behalf of State Farm Fire and Casualty CompanyAttorney Adrian P. Tilley added to party State Farm Fire and Casualty Company(pty:pla) (Tilley, Adrian)
August 16, 2018 Filing 17 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Anthony Charles Coveny on behalf of Gardner Flanigan, Millicent FlaniganAttorney Anthony Charles Coveny added to party Gardner Flanigan(pty:pla), Attorney Anthony Charles Coveny added to party Millicent Flanigan(pty:pla) (Coveny, Anthony)
August 16, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Ronald Jerome Simon on behalf of Gardner Flanigan, Millicent FlaniganAttorney Ronald Jerome Simon added to party Gardner Flanigan(pty:pla), Attorney Ronald Jerome Simon added to party Millicent Flanigan(pty:pla) (Simon, Ronald)
August 14, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE of State Court Docket Sheet by Defendant BSH Home Appliances Corporation (Ream, Lance)
August 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 10/15/2018 09:00 AM in Room 323 (Grand Junction) before Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. A Scheduling Conference is set in GRAND JUNCTION, Colorado at the Wayne Aspinall Federal Building - United States Courthouse, 400 Rood Avenue, Grand Junction, CO 81501 before U.S. Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. The parties shall comply with the Instructions to Scheduling Order for U.S. Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher which can be found at www.cod.uscourts.gov. Parties concerned regarding travel time and expense to Grand Junction for appearances before the Magistrate Judge are referred to this Magistrate Judge's policy in that regard which can be found at the above website. By Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on August 9, 2018. Text Only Entry (gpgsec )
August 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER REASSIGNING MAGISTRATE The case is REASSIGNED to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher and all future filings in Civil Action No. 18-cv-01983-RM-NYW shall be docketed under the case number 18-cv-01983-RM-GPG. ORDERED by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 8/9/2018. (cthom, )
August 8, 2018 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE of Mailing/Service re #7 Answer to Complaint - Amended by Defendant BSH Home Appliances Corporation. (Ream, Lance)
August 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER: With the assignment of this matter, the parties are advised that throughout this case they are expected to be familiar and comply with not only the Local Rules of this District, but also Judge Raymond P. Moore's Civil Practice Standards, which may be found at: http://www.cod.uscourts.gov/JudicialOfficers/ActiveArticleIIIJudges/HonRaymondPMoore.aspx. SO ORDERED by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 8/8/2018. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec )
August 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct a pretrial conference and enter a pretrial order, and (5) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions. Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. Entered by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 8/8/2018. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec )
August 8, 2018 Filing 9 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #8 Memorandum Returning Case. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Raymond P. Moore. All future pleadings should be designated as 18-cv-01983-RM. (Text Only Entry) (rkeec)
August 8, 2018 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel. (rkeec)
August 7, 2018 Filing 7 ANSWER to #2 Complaint by BSH Home Appliances Corporation.(Ream, Lance)
August 6, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Lance John Ream on behalf of BSH Home Appliances CorporationAttorney Lance John Ream added to party BSH Home Appliances Corporation(pty:dft) (Ream, Lance)
August 6, 2018 Filing 5 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawls of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (rroge, )
August 6, 2018 Filing 4 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (rroge, )
August 6, 2018 Filing 3 Case assigned to Judge Wiley Y. Daniel and drawn to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Text Only Entry. (rroge, )
August 6, 2018 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against BSH Home Appliances Corporation, filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, Millicent Flanigan, Gardner Flanigan.(rroge, )
August 6, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by BSH Home Appliances Corporation from Routt County District Court, Case Number 2018-CV-30057. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-6231992), filed by BSH Home Appliances Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit B to Notice of Removal, #3 Exhibit C to Notice of Removal, #4 Exhibit D to Notice of Removal, #5 Exhibit E to Notice of Removal, #6 State Court Complaint, #7 State Court Summons and Return of Service, #8 Civil Cover Sheet, #9 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet)(Hearing, Gregory)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company et al v. BSH Home Appliances Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Represented By: Adrian P. Tilley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Millicent Flanigan
Represented By: Ronald Jerome Simon
Represented By: Anthony Charles Coveny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gardner Flanigan
Represented By: Ronald Jerome Simon
Represented By: Anthony Charles Coveny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BSH Home Appliances Corporation
Represented By: Gregory Steve Hearing, II
Represented By: Lance John Ream
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?