Beierwaltes et al v. LOffice Fdrale De La Culture De La Confdration Suisse et al
Plaintiff: William Beierwaltes and Lynda Beierwaltes
Defendant: La Republique et Canton De Geneve, LOffice Federale De La Culture De La Confederation Suisse and LAdministration Federale Des Douanes De La Confederation Suisse
Case Number: 1:2018cv02011
Filed: August 8, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Larimer
Presiding Judge: Michael E Hegarty
Referring Judge: Marcia S Krieger
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1605
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 27, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2018 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant(s) LAdministration Federale Des Douanes De La Confederation Suisse served on 9/11/2018, answer due 11/13/2018; LOffice Federale De La Culture De La Confederation Suisse served on 9/11/2018, answer due 11/13/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Livingston, Jessica)
August 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty: IT IS ORDERED that pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and FED. R. CIV. P. 72(a) and (b), this matter is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to:(1)Convene a scheduling conference under FED. R. CIV. P. 16(b), enter a Scheduling Order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, enter such orders as appropriate to enforce the Scheduling Order, and resolve discovery matters;(2)ADR: Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. Early Neutral Evaluation is approved. On the informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, the Court may direct the parties to engage in a settlement conference conducted by the magistrate judge if the parties have engaged in an Early Neutral Evaluation and are unable to afford or otherwise attain private settlement assistance;(3)Hear and determine referred matters in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B). by Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 8/13/18. Text Only Entry (msksec, )
August 10, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by William George Pearlstein on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney William George Pearlstein added to party Lynda Beierwaltes(pty:pla), Attorney William George Pearlstein added to party William Beierwaltes(pty:pla) (Pearlstein, William)
August 10, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Georges Gilbert Lederman on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Georges Gilbert Lederman added to party Lynda Beierwaltes(pty:pla), Attorney Georges Gilbert Lederman added to party William Beierwaltes(pty:pla) (Lederman, Georges)
August 10, 2018 Filing 10 SUMMONSES issued by Clerk. (dkals, )
August 10, 2018 Filing 9 SUMMONSES issued by Clerk. (dkals, )
August 9, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Defendant Federal Office of Culture of the Swiss Confederation re #1 Complaint,, by Plaintiffs Lynda Beierwaltes, William Beierwaltes. (Livingston, Jessica)
August 9, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Defendant Federal Customs Administration of the Swiss Confederation re #1 Complaint,, by Plaintiffs Lynda Beierwaltes, William Beierwaltes. (Livingston, Jessica)
August 9, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Defendant Republic and Canton of Geneva re #1 Complaint,, by Plaintiffs Lynda Beierwaltes, William Beierwaltes. (Livingston, Jessica)
August 9, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance Andrew M. Nussbaum by Andrew Martin Nussbaum on behalf of Lynda Beierwaltes, William BeierwaltesAttorney Andrew Martin Nussbaum added to party Lynda Beierwaltes(pty:pla), Attorney Andrew Martin Nussbaum added to party William Beierwaltes(pty:pla) (Nussbaum, Andrew)
August 9, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance for Andrew C. Lillie by Andrew Christopher Lillie on behalf of Lynda Beierwaltes, William BeierwaltesAttorney Andrew Christopher Lillie added to party Lynda Beierwaltes(pty:pla), Attorney Andrew Christopher Lillie added to party William Beierwaltes(pty:pla) (Lillie, Andrew)
August 9, 2018 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (rvill, )
August 8, 2018 Filing 2 Case assigned to Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger and drawn to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Text Only Entry. (rvill, )
August 8, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against L'ADMINISTRATION FEDERALE DES DOUANES DE LA CONFEDERATION SUISSE, L'OFFICE FEDERALE DE LA CULTURE DE LA CONFEDERATION SUISSE, LA REPUBLIQUE ET CANTON DE GENEVE (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6237060)Attorney Jessica Black Livingston added to party Lynda Beierwaltes(pty:pla), Attorney Jessica Black Livingston added to party William Beierwaltes(pty:pla), filed by Lynda Beierwaltes, William Beierwaltes. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(Livingston, Jessica)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Beierwaltes et al v. LOffice Fdrale De La Culture De La Confdration Suisse et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: La Republique et Canton De Geneve
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LOffice Federale De La Culture De La Confederation Suisse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LAdministration Federale Des Douanes De La Confederation Suisse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Beierwaltes
Represented By: Jessica Black Livingston
Represented By: William George Pearlstein
Represented By: Andrew Martin Nussbaum
Represented By: Georges Gilbert Lederman
Represented By: Andrew Christopher Lillie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lynda Beierwaltes
Represented By: Jessica Black Livingston
Represented By: William George Pearlstein
Represented By: Andrew Martin Nussbaum
Represented By: Georges Gilbert Lederman
Represented By: Andrew Christopher Lillie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?