Communications Workers of America, AFL-CIO v. Centura Health St. Mary-Corwin Medical Center
Plaintiff: Communications Workers of America, AFL-CIO
Defendant: Centura Health St. Mary-Corwin Medical Center
Case Number: 1:2018cv02012
Filed: August 8, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: Richard P Matsch
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29:0185
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 27, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2018 Filing 12 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES: re: #9 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Case filed by attorney William R. Reinken. The document was scanned and not converted directly to portable document format (PDF). DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - future documents must be filed pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 1.3(f) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases). (Text Only Entry) (evana, )
September 27, 2018 Filing 11 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES: re: #9 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Case filed by attorney William R. Reinken. Attorney has used an incorrect signature format in violation of D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 4.3(a) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases). DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. In the future, the filer must affix an electronic s/signature and s/followed by a typed, not an inked, signature to all future documents.(Text Only Entry) (evana, )
September 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 9/27/2018. Text Only Entry (ktera)
September 27, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Case with Prejudice Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 41 (a)(1)(A)(i) by Plaintiff Communications Workers of America, AFL-CIO (Reinken, William)
September 13, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint to Compel Arbitration by Defendant Centura Health St. Mary-Corwin Medical Center. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Timea Kennedy, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G)(Scully, Patrick)
August 27, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Communications Workers of America, AFL-CIO. Centura Health St. Mary-Corwin Medical Center served on 8/23/2018, answer due 9/13/2018. (Reinken, William)
August 24, 2018 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Hunt, Joseph)
August 24, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Joseph H. Hunt on behalf of Centura Health St. Mary-Corwin Medical CenterAttorney Joseph H. Hunt added to party Centura Health St. Mary-Corwin Medical Center(pty:dft) (Hunt, Joseph)
August 24, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of Patrick R. Scully by Patrick Richard Scully on behalf of Centura Health St. Mary-Corwin Medical CenterAttorney Patrick Richard Scully added to party Centura Health St. Mary-Corwin Medical Center(pty:dft) (Scully, Patrick)
August 8, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (dbera, )
August 8, 2018 Filing 2 Case assigned to Judge Richard P. Matsch and drawn to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Text Only Entry (dbera, )
August 8, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT TO COMPEL ARBITRATION against Centura Health St. Mary-Corwin Medical Center (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6237081)Attorney William Richard Reinken added to party Communications Workers of America, AFL-CIO(pty:pla), filed by Communications Workers of America, AFL-CIO. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit A - SMC Contract Final 2017-2020, #4 Exhibit B - SMC WARN Notice to Union, #5 Exhibit C - CWA Grievances, #6 Exhibit D - Orthopaedic Floor Email String, #7 Exhibit E - SMC Step 1 Response, #8 Exhibit F - SMC Refusal to Mediate Email String, #9 Exhibit G - SMC Refusal to Arbitrate Email String)(Reinken, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Communications Workers of America, AFL-CIO v. Centura Health St. Mary-Corwin Medical Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Communications Workers of America, AFL-CIO
Represented By: William Richard Reinken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Centura Health St. Mary-Corwin Medical Center
Represented By: Patrick Richard Scully
Represented By: Joseph H. Hunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?