Frontier Station, Inc. v. Kloiber Real Estate Holdings, LLC
Plaintiff: Frontier Station, Inc.
Defendant: Kloiber Real Estate Holdings, LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv02028
Filed: August 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Moffat
Presiding Judge: Robert E Blackburn
Referring Judge: Gordon P Gallagher
2 Judge: Nina Y Wang
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28:1330
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 3, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER: Scheduling Conference re-set for 10/15/2018 11:30 AM in Room 323 (Grand Junction) before Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Scheduling Conference set for 10/9/2018 09:45 AM has been vacated. Parties may appear in person, but are also pre-approved to appear telephonically by calling 970-241-8932, Extension 8225 at the time of the hearing. The Court does not have the ability to conference multiple parties at the same time so all parties wishing to appear telephonically shall coordinate ahead of time so that they are all on the same line when the call is placed to the Court. By Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on October 3, 2018. (gpgsec )
October 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #17 Motion to Reset. By Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on October 3, 2018. Text Only Entry (gpgsec )
October 2, 2018 Filing 17 MOTION/STIPULATION re 16 Order, Motion to Reschedule Scheduling and Planning Conference by Defendant Kloiber Real Estate Holdings, LLC. (Schindler, Alan) Modified on 10/3/2018 to correct event (athom, ).
October 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 10/9/2018 09:45 AM in Room 323 (Grand Junction) before Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Parties may appear in person, but are also pre-approved to appear telephonically by calling 970-241-8932, Extension 8225 at the time of the hearing. The Court does not have the ability to conference multiple parties at the same time so all parties wishing to appear telephonically shall coordinate ahead of time so that they are all on the same line when the call is placed to the Court. By Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on October 2, 2018. Text Only Entry (gpgsec )
October 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER: In light of the transfer of this matter #13 to another Magistrate Judge, the Scheduling Conference and associated deadlines currently set for 10/9/2018 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang is VACATED. By Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 10/02/2018. Text Only Entry (nywlc1, )
September 28, 2018 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Kloiber Real Estate Holdings, LLC.(Schindler, Alan)
September 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 09/28/2018. Pursuant to D.C. Colo. L. Civ. R. 40.1(a), and as approved by the Chief Judge of the Court, the undersigned directs that the Clerk of the Court reassign this action to Magistrate Judge Gallagher as the referral judge. All further pleadings in this case shall reflect the case number of 18-cv-02028-REB-GPG. (athom, )
September 27, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Lorne Grant Hiller on behalf of Frontier Station, Inc.Attorney Lorne Grant Hiller added to party Frontier Station, Inc.(pty:pla) (Hiller, Lorne)
September 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. IT IS ORDERED that pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this matter is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge:(1) To convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b), enter a Scheduling Order that satisfies the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, and enter such orders as appropriate to enforce the Scheduling order and resolve discovery matters; provided, further that the scheduling conference, the Magistrate Judge shall advise the parties of Judge Blackburns practice standards found at www.cod.uscourts.gov.;(2) To hear and finally determine non-dispositive matters that have been referred, subject to the exceptions found in 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A); and(3) To hear and make recommendations on dispositive matters that have been referred as defined in 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLOLCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 9/26/18. Text Only Entry (rebsec)
September 26, 2018 Filing 10 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #9 Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn. All future pleadings should be designated as 18-cv-02028-REB. (Text Only Entry) (nmarb, )
September 25, 2018 Filing 9 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Frontier Station, Inc. All parties do not consent.. (Wegener, Benjamin)
September 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER construing #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond as the parties' one stipulation for an extension of time pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 6.1(a). Pursuant to the Stipulation, Kloiber Real Estate Holdings, LLC's answer or response is due 9/28/2018. Furthermore, the parties' one stipulation and any further motions for extension of time must comply with D.C.COLO.LCivR 6.1(c) as future non-compliance may result in this court striking the filing without substantive consideration. By Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 09/11/2018. Text Only Entry (nywlc1, )
September 11, 2018 Filing 7 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint, by Defendant Kloiber Real Estate Holdings, LLC. (Schindler, Alan)
September 7, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Alan Daniel Schindler on behalf of Kloiber Real Estate Holdings, LLC Attorney Alan Daniel Schindler added to party Kloiber Real Estate Holdings, LLC (pty:dft) (Schindler, Alan)
August 28, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Frontier Station, Inc.. Kloiber Real Estate Holdings, LLC served on 8/22/2018, answer due 9/12/2018. (Wegener, Benjamin)
August 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE AND SETTING DEADLINE FOR FILING OF CONSENT/NONCONSENT FORM by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 8/27/2018. A Scheduling Conference is set for 10/9/2018 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. The parties shall submit their proposed scheduling order, including a copy of the proposed order in Word format sent via email to Wang_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov, on or before 10/2/2018. The parties shall complete and file the Consent/Nonconsent Form by 9/25/2018. (bwilk, )
August 9, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (rroge, )
August 9, 2018 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Text Only Entry. (rroge, )
August 9, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6239661)Attorney Benjamin Michael Wegener added to party Frontier Station, Inc.(pty:pla), filed by Frontier Station, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Case Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons)(Wegener, Benjamin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Frontier Station, Inc. v. Kloiber Real Estate Holdings, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frontier Station, Inc.
Represented By: Benjamin Michael Wegener
Represented By: Lorne Grant Hiller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kloiber Real Estate Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Alan Daniel Schindler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?