Koch v. Edifice Builders Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Travis Koch
Defendant: Edifice Builders Incorporated, Better Business Systems, Inc. d/b/a Avitus Group, Better Business Systems, Inc. and Better Business Systems, Inc. doing business as Avitus Group, a Montana corporation
Case Number: 1:2018cv02030
Filed: August 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: S Kato Crews
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 15:2(a) Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2018 Filing 14 Civil Case Terminated pursuant to the notice of dismissal or stipulation to dismiss filed in this case on 9/18/18. Text Only Entry (nmarb, )
September 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER: The parties have filed a #12 Stipulation of Dismissal of Case pursuant to F.R.C.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), which requires no further action on the part of the Court. The Clerk of Court shall close this case. By Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 9/18/2018. Text Only Entry (skclc1)
September 18, 2018 Filing 12 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Case by Plaintiff Travis Koch. (Mitchiner, Thomas)
August 23, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE re #1 Notice of Removal,, Current State Docket Sheet by Defendants Better Business Systems, Inc., Edifice Builders Incorporated (Gutierrez, Steven)
August 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND SETTING DEADLINE FOR FILING CONSENT/NONCONSENT FORM Scheduling Conference set for 9/24/2018 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. Consent Form due by 9/17/2018. By Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 8/13/18. (amont, )
August 10, 2018 Filing 9 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (athom, )
August 10, 2018 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE by Senior Judge Blackburn. This case is randomly reassigned to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. All future pleadings should be designated as 18-cv-02030-SKC. (athom, )
August 10, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of State Court Complaint and Other Filings by Defendants Better Business Systems, Inc., Edifice Builders Incorporated (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet State Court, #2 Summons Better Business Systems Inc. dba Avitus Group, #3 Summons Edifice Builders Incorporated)(Gutierrez, Steven)
August 10, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Thomas H. Mitchiner on behalf of Travis KochAttorney Thomas H. Mitchiner added to party Travis Koch(pty:pla) (Mitchiner, Thomas)
August 10, 2018 Filing 5 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (rvill, )
August 9, 2018 Filing 4 Case assigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn and drawn to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. Text Only Entry. (rvill, )
August 9, 2018 Filing 3 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawls of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (rvill, )
August 9, 2018 Filing 2 Administrative Notice: Notice to filer of non-compliance with Notice of Removal case opening procedures. It is the responsibility of the attorney removing the case to follow Local Rule D.C.COLO.LCivR 81.1, and 28 U.S.C. 1446(a). See Appendix B Notice of Removal, in the User Guide - Attorney Case Opening Procedures document. (Text Only Entry) (rvill, )
August 9, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Better Business Systems, Inc. d/b/a Avitus Group, Edifice Builders Incorporated from District Court, City and County of Denver, Colorado, Case Number 2018CV032534. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-6240075), filed by Better Business Systems, Inc. d/b/a Avitus Group, Edifice Builders Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet)(Gutierrez, Steven)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Koch v. Edifice Builders Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edifice Builders Incorporated
Represented By: Steven M. Gutierrez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Better Business Systems, Inc. d/b/a Avitus Group
Represented By: Steven M. Gutierrez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Better Business Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Steven M. Gutierrez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Better Business Systems, Inc. doing business as Avitus Group, a Montana corporation
Represented By: Steven M. Gutierrez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travis Koch
Represented By: Thomas H. Mitchiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?