Galli v. Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, The
Plaintiff: Matthew Galli
Defendant: The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company and Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, The
Case Number: 1:2018cv02039
Filed: August 10, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: Michael E Hegarty
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 16, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2018 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE of Service by e-mail by Clerk of Court to Jefferson County. (mdave, )
August 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MINUTE ORDER granting #17 Stipulated Motion to Remand Case to the District Court, Jefferson County, Colorado by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 08/16/2018. This case is remanded to the Jefferson County, Colorado District Court. The Clerk of the Court is directed to close this case. (mdave, )
August 15, 2018 Filing 17 Stipulated MOTION to Remand to State Court by Defendant Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, The. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Koehler, Jonathan)
August 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 08/15/2018. Consent Form due by 8/30/2018. (mdave, )
August 15, 2018 Filing 15 STIPULATION Regarding Amount In Controversy by Defendant Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, The. (Koehler, Jonathan)
August 14, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Christopher James Ferraro on behalf of Matthew GalliAttorney Christopher James Ferraro added to party Matthew Galli(pty:pla) (Ferraro, Christopher)
August 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 08/14/2018. Scheduling Conference set for 9/12/2018 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. IT IS ORDERED that the Defendant shall notify all parties who have not entered an appearance of the date and time of the Scheduling Conference. (mdave, )
August 13, 2018 Filing 12 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (rkeec)
August 13, 2018 Filing 11 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #10 Memorandum Returning Case. This case is randomly reassigned to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. All future pleadings should be designated as 18-cv-02039-MEH. (Text Only Entry) (rkeec)
August 13, 2018 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel. (rkeec)
August 10, 2018 Filing 9 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawls of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (rroge, )
August 10, 2018 Filing 8 STATE COURT ORDER Granting Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Jefferson County District Court Judge Jeffrey R Pilkington on 7/30/2018. (rroge, )
August 10, 2018 Filing 7 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (rroge, )
August 10, 2018 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT/RETURN of Service of Summons and Complaint upon Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, The on 7/11/2018 (rroge, )
August 10, 2018 Filing 5 Case assigned to Judge Wiley Y. Daniel and drawn to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Text Only Entry. (rroge, )
August 10, 2018 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, The, filed by Matthew Galli.(rroge, )
August 10, 2018 Filing 3 SUPPLEMENT/AMENDMENT to #1 Notice of Removal,,, by Defendant The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company. (Koehler, Jonathan)
August 10, 2018 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Travelers Insurance Group Holding, Inc., Corporate Parent The Travelers Indemnity Company, Corporate Parent The Travelers Companies Inc., Corporate Parent Travelers Property Casualty Corp. for The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company. (Koehler, Jonathan)
August 10, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-6242543), filed by The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A-State Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B-State Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C-State Summons, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D-Notice of Exclusion, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E-Civil Procedure Order, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F-Return of Service, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G-Motion for Extension, #8 Exhibit Exhibit H-Entry of Appearance, #9 Magistrate Judge Consent Form Exhibit I-Order regarding Motion for Extension, #10 Exhibit Exhibit J-State Court Docket, #11 Exhibit Exhibit K-Periodic Report, #12 Exhibit Exhibit L-Check Copies, #13 Exhibit Exhibit M-Notice of Removal State)(Koehler, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Galli v. Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Galli
Represented By: Christopher James Ferraro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company
Represented By: Jonathan Thomas Koehler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, The
Represented By: Jonathan Thomas Koehler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?