Smith v. Aramark Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Kurt Anthony Smith
Defendant: Mesa Verde Company, ARAMARK Sports and Entertainment Services, LLC, Aramark Corporation, Aramark Sports and Entertainment Group, LLC, Aramark Mesa Verde, Aramark Services, Inc., Robert Lee Lee, Aramark Campus LLC and Robert Wayne Lee
Case Number: 1:2018cv02069
Filed: August 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Montezuma
Presiding Judge: Lewis T Babcock
Referring Judge: Kristen L Mix
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 3, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 10/3/2018. (ebuch)
September 14, 2018 Filing 23 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Aramark Services, Inc. for Aramark Corporation, Aramark Services, Inc., Aramark Sports and Entertainment Group, LLC, Aramark Sports and Entertainment Services, LLC. (Hicks, Ryan)
September 14, 2018 Filing 22 ANSWER to #14 Amended Complaint, by Aramark Services, Inc., Aramark Sports and Entertainment Group, LLC, Aramark Sports and Entertainment Services, LLC, Robert Wayne Lee.(Hicks, Ryan)
September 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MINUTE ORDER. Aramark Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Amended Civil Complaint (Doc #19 - filed September 10, 2018) is GRANTED up to and including September 14, 2018, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 9/11/2018. (angar, )
September 10, 2018 Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kurt Anthony Smith. Aramark Campus LLC served on 8/28/2018, answer due 9/18/2018. (Carroll, Kirk)
September 10, 2018 Filing 19 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #14 Amended Complaint, by Defendants Aramark Corporation, Aramark Services, Inc., Aramark Sports and Entertainment Group, LLC, Aramark Sports and Entertainment Services, LLC, Robert Wayne Lee. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Hicks, Ryan)
August 27, 2018 Filing 18 SUMMONS issued by Clerk on 8/27/2018 (Attachments: #1 Summons) (angar, )
August 24, 2018 Filing 17 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Robert Wayne Lee by Plaintiff Kurt Anthony Smith. (Carroll, Kirk)
August 24, 2018 Filing 16 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Aramark Campus, LLC by Plaintiff Kurt Anthony Smith. (Carroll, Kirk)
August 22, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE of Filing Amended Pleading by Plaintiff Kurt Anthony Smith (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1- Amended Complaint Strikes)(Carroll, Kirk)
August 22, 2018 Filing 14 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Aramark Corporation, Aramark Services, Inc., Aramark Sports and Entertainment Group, LLC, Aramark Sports and Entertainment Services, LLC, Robert Wayne Lee, Mesa Verde Company, filed by Kurt Anthony Smith.(Carroll, Kirk)
August 15, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Kirk Bradley Carroll on behalf of Kurt Anthony SmithAttorney Kirk Bradley Carroll added to party Kurt Anthony Smith(pty:pla) (Carroll, Kirk)
August 15, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Laura J. Ellenberger on behalf of Aramark Services, Inc., Aramark Sports and Entertainment Services, LLCAttorney Laura J. Ellenberger added to party Aramark Services, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Laura J. Ellenberger added to party Aramark Sports and Entertainment Services, LLC(pty:dft) (Ellenberger, Laura)
August 15, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Daniel Sean Smith on behalf of Aramark Services, Inc., Aramark Sports and Entertainment Services, LLCAttorney Daniel Sean Smith added to party Aramark Services, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel Sean Smith added to party Aramark Sports and Entertainment Services, LLC(pty:dft) (Smith, Daniel)
August 15, 2018 Filing 10 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (rvill, )
August 14, 2018 Filing 9 Case assigned to Judge Lewis T. Babcock and drawn to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Text Only Entry. (rvill, )
August 14, 2018 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint upon Aramark Sports and Entertainment Services, LLC on 07/23/2018. (rvill, )
August 14, 2018 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint upon Aramark Sport and Entertainment Group, LLC on 07/23/2018. (rvill, )
August 14, 2018 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint upon Aramark Services, Inc. on 07/23/2018. (rvill, )
August 14, 2018 Filing 5 CIVIL COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND against Aramark Corporation, Aramark Mesa Verde, Aramark Services, Inc., Aramark Sports and Entertainment Group, LLC, Aramark Sports and Entertainment Services, LLC, Robert Wayne Lee, Mesa Verde Company, filed by Kurt Anthony Smith.(rvill, )
August 14, 2018 Filing 4 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawls of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (rvill, )
August 14, 2018 Filing 3 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES re: #1 Notice of Removal and #2 Answer to Complaint filed by attorney Ryan Michael Hicks. DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENTS. Action to take - counsel must submit a change of contact request through the Attorney Services Portal Account pursuant to D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(c) and 3.5 of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures and the documents were scanned and not converted directly to portable document format (PDF). DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENTS. Action to take - future documents must be filed pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 1.3(f) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases). (Text Only Entry) (rvill, )
August 14, 2018 Filing 2 ANSWER to #5 Complaint by ARAMARK Sports and Entertainment Services, LLC, Aramark Services, Inc.(Hicks, Ryan) Modified to correct text entry on 8/15/2018 (rvill, ).
August 14, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Aramark Services, Inc., ARAMARK Sports and Entertainment Services, LLC from District Court, Montezuma County, Colorado, Case Number 2018-CV-30064. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-6246756), filed by Aramark Services, Inc., ARAMARK Sports and Entertainment Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit State Court Register of Actions, #3 Exhibit State Court Civil Complaint and Jury Demand, #4 Exhibit State Court Civil Case Cover Sheet, #5 Exhibit State Court Return of Service - Aramark Services, Inc., #6 Exhibit State Court Return of Service - Aramark Sport and Entertainment Group, LLC, #7 Exhibit State Court Return of Service - Aramark Sports and Entertainment Services, LLC)(Hicks, Ryan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Aramark Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mesa Verde Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ARAMARK Sports and Entertainment Services, LLC
Represented By: Ryan Michael Hicks
Represented By: Daniel Sean Smith
Represented By: Laura J. Ellenberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aramark Corporation
Represented By: Ryan Michael Hicks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aramark Sports and Entertainment Group, LLC
Represented By: Ryan Michael Hicks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aramark Mesa Verde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aramark Services, Inc.
Represented By: Ryan Michael Hicks
Represented By: Daniel Sean Smith
Represented By: Laura J. Ellenberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Lee Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aramark Campus LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Wayne Lee
Represented By: Ryan Michael Hicks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kurt Anthony Smith
Represented By: Kirk Bradley Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?