Gilliland v. Life Insurance Company of North America et al
Plaintiff: Larry Gilliland
Defendant: Time Warner Cable, Inc., Charter communications, Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan, The, Charter Communications, Inc., Time Warner Cable Inc. Long-Term Disability Benefits Plan and Life Insurance Company of North America
Case Number: 1:2018cv02078
Filed: August 15, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: El Paso
Presiding Judge: Christine M Arguello
Referring Judge: Kathleen M Tafoya
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act (ERISA)
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 10/09/2018. (ksena) Modified on 10/10/2018 corrected date (ksena).
October 9, 2018 Filing 20 COURTROOM MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya: Scheduling Conference held on 10/9/2018, ( Discovery due by 5/31/2019., Dispositive Motions due by 6/28/2019., Status Report due by 6/28/2019.). FTR: courtroom 101. (ksena)
October 2, 2018 Filing 19 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, by Charter Communications, Inc., Charter communications, Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan, The, Life Insurance Company of North America, Time Warner Cable Inc. Long-Term Disability Benefits Plan, Time Warner Cable, Inc..(Englert, Jack)
October 2, 2018 Filing 18 Proposed Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Larry Gilliland. (McDermott, Shawn)
September 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MINUTE ORDER granting #13 Motion for Leave to Appear by Telephone; granting #15 Motion for Leave to Appear by Telephone. The parties may attend the Scheduling Conference by telephone by initiating a conference call and then contacting chambers, 719-575-0328, at the scheduled time. The parties shall use a LAND LINE; NO CELLULAR, CORDLESS OR SPEAKER PHONES ARE PERMITTED. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 9/27/18. Text Only Entry (kmtlc1 )
September 27, 2018 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM regarding #15 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Appear by Telephone at Scheduling Conference filed by Larry Gilliland. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 9/27/2018. Text Only Entry (cmasec)
September 26, 2018 Filing 15 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Appear by Telephone at Scheduling Conference by Plaintiff Larry Gilliland. (McDermott, Shawn)
September 26, 2018 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM regarding #13 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Appear Telephonically at Scheduling Conference filed by Charter communications, Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan, The, Time Warner Cable Inc. Long-Term Disability Benefits Plan, Charter Communications, Inc., Life Insurance Company of North America, Time Warner Cable, Inc. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 9/26/2018. Text Only Entry (cmasec)
September 26, 2018 Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Appear Telephonically at Scheduling Conference by Defendants Charter Communications, Inc., Charter communications, Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan, The, Life Insurance Company of North America, Time Warner Cable Inc. Long-Term Disability Benefits Plan, Time Warner Cable, Inc.. (Englert, Jack)
September 13, 2018 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Larry Gilliland. Charter communications, Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan, The served on 8/31/2018, answer due 10/2/2018. (McDermott, Shawn)
September 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Magistrate Judge Tafoya is designated to conduct NDISPO proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b). The parties should expect to be given a firm trial setting that is 90 to 120 days from the date of the final pretrial conference, and should be available for trial accordingly. FURTHER, Court-sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, the Court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. SO ORDERED by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 9/12/2018. Text Only Entry (cmasec)
September 11, 2018 Filing 10 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #9 Consent/Non-Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Christine M. Arguello. All future pleadings should be designated as 18-cv-02078-CMA. (Text Only Entry) (jgonz, )
September 11, 2018 Filing 9 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendants Charter Communications, Inc., Charter communications, Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan, The, Life Insurance Company of North America, Time Warner Cable Inc. Long-Term Disability Benefits Plan, Time Warner Cable, Inc. All parties do not consent.. (Englert, Jack)
September 11, 2018 Filing 8 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond to the Complaint by Defendants Charter communications, Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan, The, Time Warner Cable Inc. Long-Term Disability Benefits Plan, Time Warner Cable, Inc., Life Insurance Company of North America, Charter Communications, Inc. Answer due 10/02/2018 as to all All Defendants. (Englert, Jack) Modified on 9/11/2018 to add text (athom, ).
September 5, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Larry Gilliland. Charter Communications, Inc. served on 8/30/2018, answer due 9/20/2018. (McDermott, Shawn)
August 29, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Larry Gilliland. Time Warner Cable, Inc. served on 8/24/2018, answer due 9/14/2018. (McDermott, Shawn)
August 22, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Larry Gilliland. Life Insurance Company of North America served on 8/21/2018, answer due 9/11/2018. (McDermott, Shawn)
August 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 10/9/2018 at 10:15 AM in Courtroom 101 (Colorado Springs) before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 08/21/2018. (ksena)
August 15, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (rroge, )
August 15, 2018 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Text Only Entry. (rroge, )
August 15, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Charter Communications, Inc., Life Insurance Company of North America, The Charter Communications, Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan, Time Warner Cable Inc. Long-Term Disability Benefits Plan, Time Warner Cable, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6248663)Attorney Shawn E. McDermott added to party Larry Gilliland(pty:pla), filed by Larry Gilliland. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons)(McDermott, Shawn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gilliland v. Life Insurance Company of North America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Time Warner Cable, Inc.
Represented By: Jack M. Englert, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charter communications, Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan, The
Represented By: Jack M. Englert, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charter Communications, Inc.
Represented By: Jack M. Englert, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Time Warner Cable Inc. Long-Term Disability Benefits Plan
Represented By: Jack M. Englert, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Represented By: Jack M. Englert, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Gilliland
Represented By: Shawn E. McDermott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?