Colucci v. National Board of Chiropractic Examiners et al
Plaintiff: Margaret R. Colucci
Defendant: Steven R. Conway, Kirk Shilts, National Board of Chiropractic Examiners, Daniel M. Cote, Salvatore D. Larusso, John C. Nab, Farrel Grossman, Paul N. Morin, Leroy F. Otto and John R. McGinnis
Case Number: 1:2018cv02085
Filed: August 16, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Weld
Presiding Judge: Christine M Arguello
Referring Judge: Scott T Varholak
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 9/27/18. (morti, )
September 27, 2018 Filing 24 MINUTE ENTRY for Scheduling Conference held before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 9/27/2018. Discovery due by 3/20/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 4/19/2019. Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/25/2019 11:00 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. FTR: STV - 402. (morti, )
September 20, 2018 Filing 23 Proposed Scheduling Order (filed on behalf of all Parties) by Defendants Steven R. Conway, Farrel Grossman, Salvatore D. Larusso, John R. McGinnis, Paul N. Morin, John C. Nab, National Board of Chiropractic Examiners, Leroy F. Otto, Kirk Shilts. (Seelman, Tamara)
September 16, 2018 Filing 22 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES: re: #21 Notice of Entry of Appearance filed by attorney Dart Morgan Winkler; Jared Decoteau. The s/signature did not match the filers name on the account for which the login and password are registered. DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - future documents must be filed pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 4.3(c) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases). (Text Only Entry) (athom, )
September 14, 2018 Filing 21 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Dart Morgan Winkler, Jared Decoteau on behalf of Margaret R. Colucci (Dave, Mychael) Modified on 9/16/2018 to correct filer text (athom, ).
September 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Magistrate Judge Varholak is designated to conduct NDISPO proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b). The parties should expect to be given a firm trial setting that is 90 to 120 days from the date of the final pretrial conference, and should be available for trial accordingly. FURTHER, Court-sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, the Court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. SO ORDERED by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 9/13/2018. Text Only Entry (cmasec)
September 13, 2018 Filing 19 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #18 Consent/Non-Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Christine M. Arguello. All future pleadings should be designated as 18-cv-02085-CMA. (Text Only Entry) (jgonz, )
September 12, 2018 Filing 18 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendants Steven R. Conway, Farrel Grossman, Salvatore D. Larusso, John R. McGinnis, Paul N. Morin, John C. Nab, National Board of Chiropractic Examiners, Leroy F. Otto, Kirk Shilts All parties do not consent.. (Seelman, Tamara)
August 28, 2018 Filing 17 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Mychael Ronald Dave, Jr on behalf of Margaret R. ColucciAttorney Mychael Ronald Dave, Jr added to party Margaret R. Colucci(pty:pla) (Dave, Mychael)
August 27, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Kaitlin Marie Marsh-Blake on behalf of Steven R. Conway, Farrel Grossman, Salvatore D. Larusso, John R. McGinnis, Paul N. Morin, John C. Nab, National Board of Chiropractic Examiners, Leroy F. Otto, Kirk ShiltsAttorney Kaitlin Marie Marsh-Blake added to party Steven R. Conway(pty:dft), Attorney Kaitlin Marie Marsh-Blake added to party Farrel Grossman(pty:dft), Attorney Kaitlin Marie Marsh-Blake added to party Salvatore D. Larusso(pty:dft), Attorney Kaitlin Marie Marsh-Blake added to party John R. McGinnis(pty:dft), Attorney Kaitlin Marie Marsh-Blake added to party Paul N. Morin(pty:dft), Attorney Kaitlin Marie Marsh-Blake added to party John C. Nab(pty:dft), Attorney Kaitlin Marie Marsh-Blake added to party National Board of Chiropractic Examiners(pty:dft), Attorney Kaitlin Marie Marsh-Blake added to party Leroy F. Otto(pty:dft), Attorney Kaitlin Marie Marsh-Blake added to party Kirk Shilts(pty:dft) (Marsh-Blake, Kaitlin)
August 24, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jason D. Melichar on behalf of Daniel M. Cote (Melichar, Jason)
August 24, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Matthew Cohee Freemann on behalf of Daniel M. CoteAttorney Matthew Cohee Freemann added to party Daniel M. Cote(pty:dft) (Freemann, Matthew)
August 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 9/27/2018 11:30 AM in Courtroom C203 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Consent Form due by 9/13/2018, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 8/16/2018. (jgonz, )
August 16, 2018 Filing 12 STATE COURT ORDER Grating Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Continuance of Case Management Conference by Weld County District Court Judge Marcelo A. Kopcow on August 6, 2018. (rroge, )
August 16, 2018 Filing 11 STATE COURT ORDER: Plaintiff's Status Report Reviewed by Weld County District Court Judge Marcelo A. Kopcow on August 1, 2018. (rroge, )
August 16, 2018 Filing 10 STATE COURT ORDER Denying Defendant's Motion to Certify Questions of Law for Interlocutory Appeal by Weld County District Court Judge Marcelo A. Kopcow on July 27, 2018. (rroge, )
August 16, 2018 Filing 9 STATE COURT ORDER denying Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by Weld County District Court Judge Marcelo A. Kopcow on June 6, 2018. (rroge, )
August 16, 2018 Filing 8 ANSWER to #3 Complaint, by Steven R. Conway, Daniel M. Cote, Farrel Grossman, Salvatore D. Larusso, John R. McGinnis, Paul N. Morin, John C. Nab, National Board of Chiropractic Examiners, Leroy F. Otto, Kirk Shilts.(rroge, )
August 16, 2018 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint upon National Board of Chirpractic Examiners on 03/20/2018 (rroge, )
August 16, 2018 Filing 6 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawls of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (rroge, )
August 16, 2018 Filing 5 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (rroge, )
August 16, 2018 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Text Only Entry. (rroge, )
August 16, 2018 Filing 3 COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Steven R. Conway, Daniel M. Cote, Farrel Grossman, Salvatore D. Larusso, John R. McGinnis, Paul N. Morin, John C. Nab, National Board of Chiropractic Examiners, Leroy F. Otto, Kirk Shilts, filed by Margaret R. Colucci.(rroge, )
August 16, 2018 Filing 2 Administrative Notice: No filing fee received with case opening. Attorney contacted with instructions to submit filing fee within 3 hours. (Text Only Entry) (dbera, )
August 16, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by PAUL N MORIN(Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number COX086293) , KIRK SHILTS, SALVATORE D LARUSSO, DANIEL M COTE, JOHN R MCGINNIS, NATIONAL BOARD OF CHIROPRACTIC EXAMINERS, LEROY F OTTO, STEVEN R CONWAY, FARREL GROSSMAN, JOHN C NAB from WELD COUNTY DISTRICT COURT, Case Number 2018cv30203., filed by PAUL N MORIN, KIRK SHILTS, SALVATORE D LARUSSO, DANIEL M COTE, JOHN R MCGINNIS, NATIONAL BOARD OF CHIROPRACTIC EXAMINERS, LEROY F OTTO, STEVEN R CONWAY, FARREL GROSSMAN, JOHN C NAB. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Continuation of Main Document, #4 Continuation of Main Document, #5 Continuation of Main Document, #6 Continuation of Main Document, #7 Continuation of Main Document, #8 Continuation of Main Document, #9 Continuation of Main Document, #10 Continuation of Main Document, #11 Continuation of Main Document, #12 Continuation of Main Document, #13 Continuation of Main Document, #14 Continuation of Main Document, #15 Continuation of Main Document, #16 Continuation of Main Document, #17 Continuation of Main Document, #18 Continuation of Main Document, #19 Continuation of Main Document, #20 Continuation of Main Document, #21 Continuation of Main Document, #22 Continuation of Main Document, #23 Continuation of Main Document, #24 Continuation of Main Document, #25 Continuation of Main Document, #26 Continuation of Main Document, #27 Continuation of Main Document, #28 Continuation of Main Document, #29 Continuation of Main Document, #30 Continuation of Main Document, #31 Continuation of Main Document, #32 Continuation of Main Document, #33 Continuation of Main Document, #34 Continuation of Main Document, #35 Continuation of Main Document, #36 Continuation of Main Document, #37 Continuation of Main Document, #38 Continuation of Main Document)(Seelman, Tamara) Modified on 8/16/2018 to add receipt (rroge, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Colucci v. National Board of Chiropractic Examiners et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven R. Conway
Represented By: Jason D. Melichar
Represented By: Tamara Ann Seelman
Represented By: Kaitlin Marie Marsh-Blake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kirk Shilts
Represented By: Jason D. Melichar
Represented By: Tamara Ann Seelman
Represented By: Kaitlin Marie Marsh-Blake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Board of Chiropractic Examiners
Represented By: Jason D. Melichar
Represented By: Tamara Ann Seelman
Represented By: Kaitlin Marie Marsh-Blake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel M. Cote
Represented By: Jason D. Melichar
Represented By: Tamara Ann Seelman
Represented By: Matthew Cohee Freemann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Salvatore D. Larusso
Represented By: Jason D. Melichar
Represented By: Tamara Ann Seelman
Represented By: Kaitlin Marie Marsh-Blake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John C. Nab
Represented By: Jason D. Melichar
Represented By: Tamara Ann Seelman
Represented By: Kaitlin Marie Marsh-Blake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Farrel Grossman
Represented By: Jason D. Melichar
Represented By: Tamara Ann Seelman
Represented By: Kaitlin Marie Marsh-Blake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul N. Morin
Represented By: Jason D. Melichar
Represented By: Tamara Ann Seelman
Represented By: Kaitlin Marie Marsh-Blake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leroy F. Otto
Represented By: Jason D. Melichar
Represented By: Tamara Ann Seelman
Represented By: Kaitlin Marie Marsh-Blake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John R. McGinnis
Represented By: Jason D. Melichar
Represented By: Tamara Ann Seelman
Represented By: Kaitlin Marie Marsh-Blake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margaret R. Colucci
Represented By: Mychael Ronald Dave, Jr.
Represented By: Jared Decoteau
Represented By: Dart Morgan Winkler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?