Travelers Indemnity Company of America, The v. Matthews International Corporation
Plaintiff: Travelers Indemnity Company of Amercia, The
Defendant: Matthews International Corporation
Case Number: 1:2018cv02102
Filed: August 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Arapahoe
Presiding Judge: Kristen L Mix
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 6, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 11/19/2018 11:00 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 9/6/2018. (Attachments: #1 Continuation of Main Document, #2 Continuation of Main Document) (jgonz, )
August 28, 2018 Filing 15 ANSWER to Complaint by Matthews International Corporation.(Olson, Elizabeth)
August 27, 2018 Filing 14 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Plank, Gregory)
August 27, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Gregory W. Plank on behalf of Travelers Indemnity Company of Amercia, TheAttorney Gregory W. Plank added to party Travelers Indemnity Company of Amercia, The(pty:pla) (Plank, Gregory)
August 27, 2018 Filing 12 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (rkeec)
August 27, 2018 Filing 11 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #10 Memorandum Returning Case. This case is randomly reassigned to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. All future pleadings should be designated as 18-cv-02102-KLM. (Text Only Entry) (rkeec)
August 27, 2018 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel. (rkeec)
August 24, 2018 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Olson, Elizabeth)
August 24, 2018 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by Matthews International Corporation.(Olson, Elizabeth)
August 20, 2018 Filing 7 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES: re: #6 Notice of Entry of Appearance filed by attorney Alex T. Zang. Attorney or pro se has used an incorrect signature format in violation of D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 4.3(a) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures. Address, Phone and Fax numbers and e-mail address are missing. (Civil cases). DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. (Text Only Entry) (evana, )
August 20, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Alex Tan Zhang on behalf of Matthews International CorporationAttorney Alex Tan Zhang added to party Matthews International Corporation(pty:dft) (Zhang, Alex)
August 20, 2018 Filing 5 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (rvill, )
August 17, 2018 Filing 4 Case assigned to Judge Wiley Y. Daniel and drawn to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Text Only Entry. (rvill, )
August 17, 2018 Filing 3 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawls of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (rvill, )
August 17, 2018 Filing 2 Administrative Notice: Notice to filer of non-compliance with Notice of Removal case opening procedures. It is the responsibility of the attorney removing the case to follow Local Rule D.C.COLO.LCivR 81.1, and 28 U.S.C. 1446(a). See Appendix B Notice of Removal, in the User Guide - Attorney Case Opening Procedures document. (Text Only Entry) (rvill, )
August 17, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Matthews International Corporation from Arapahoe County District Court, Case Number 18cv31456. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-6254452), filed by Matthews International Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet)(Olson, Elizabeth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Travelers Indemnity Company of America, The v. Matthews International Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthews International Corporation
Represented By: Elizabeth K. Olson
Represented By: Alex Tan Zhang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travelers Indemnity Company of Amercia, The
Represented By: Gregory W. Plank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?