Scarpitti v. Charter Communications, Inc.
Plaintiff: Michael Scarpitti
Defendant: Charter Communications, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv02133
Filed: August 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Robert E Blackburn
Referring Judge: Michael E Hegarty
Nature of Suit: Other Labor Litigation
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 10, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2018 Filing 14 REPLY to Response to #7 MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by Defendant Charter Communications, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A: Scarpitti Email)(Froehlke, Elizabeth)
October 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Defendant shall have up to and including 10/10/18 to file its reply to plaintiff's response to defendant's motion to compel arbitration and stay proceedings. Defendant's filing is in violation of REB Civ. Practice Standard II.G.4. Defendant shall read and heed the court's civil practice standards in all future filings. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 10/2/18. Text Only Entry (rebsec)
October 1, 2018 Filing 12 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #7 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings by Defendant Charter Communications, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Kirkpatrick, Joshua)
September 18, 2018 Filing 11 RESPONSE to #7 MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by Plaintiff Michael Scarpitti. (Hoffman, Karl)
September 13, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE OF ERRATA by Defendant Charter Communications, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Woods Declaration, #2 Exhibit B to Woods Declaration, #3 Exhibit C to Woods Declaration, #4 Exhibit D to Woods Declaration)(Kirkpatrick, Joshua)
September 11, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Steven M. Feder on behalf of Michael ScarpittiAttorney Steven M. Feder added to party Michael Scarpitti(pty:pla) (Feder, Steven)
August 29, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Karl Nelson Hoffman on behalf of Michael ScarpittiAttorney Karl Nelson Hoffman added to party Michael Scarpitti(pty:pla) (Hoffman, Karl)
August 28, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION to Compel Arbitration by Defendant Charter Communications, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Solution Channel, #2 Exhibit B: Correspondence, #3 Exhibit C: Correspondence, #4 Exhibit D: Correspondence, #5 Affidavit Stacey Woods)(Froehlke, Elizabeth)
August 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. IT IS ORDERED that pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this matter is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge:(1) To convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b), enter a Scheduling Order that satisfies the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, and enter such orders as appropriate to enforce the Scheduling order and resolve discovery matters; provided, further that the scheduling conference, the Magistrate Judge shall advise the parties of Judge Blackburns practice standards found at www.cod.uscourts.gov.;(2) To hear and finally determine non-dispositive matters that have been referred, subject to the exceptions found in 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A); and(3) To hear and make recommendations on dispositive matters that have been referred as defined in 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLOLCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 8/22/18. Text Only Entry (rebsec)
August 22, 2018 Filing 5 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawls of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (dbera, )
August 21, 2018 Filing 4 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (dbera, )
August 21, 2018 Filing 3 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Charter Communications, Inc., filed by Michael Scarpitti.(dbera, )
August 21, 2018 Filing 2 Case assigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn and drawn to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Text Only Entry (dbera, )
August 21, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Charter Communications, Inc. from Arapahoe County District Court, Case Number 2018CV31789. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-6259414), filed by Charter Communications, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Kirkpatrick, Joshua)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scarpitti v. Charter Communications, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Scarpitti
Represented By: Steven M. Feder
Represented By: Karl Nelson Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charter Communications, Inc.
Represented By: Joshua B. Kirkpatrick
Represented By: Elizabeth Mary Froehlke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?