Morin v. Encompass Indemnity Company

Plaintiff: Meghan Morin
Defendant: Encompass Indemnity Company
Case Number: 1:2018cv02309
Filed: September 10, 2018
Court: Colorado District Court
0 Judge: Philip A Brimmer
1 Judge: Wiley Y Daniel
2 Judge: Michael E Hegarty
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 24, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 24, 2018 28 Defendant Encompass Indemnity Company's ANSWER to #16 Amended Complaint by Encompass Indemnity Company.(Henkel, Kurt) Modified on 10/26/2018 to correct linkage. (sphil, ).
October 18, 2018 27 Featured Case SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 10/18/2018. Discovery due by 6/7/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 7/8/2019. (tsher, )
October 18, 2018 26 COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty: Scheduling Conference held on 10/18/2018. Set/Reset Hearings: Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/9/2019 10:15 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. FTR: Courtroom A501. (mdave, )
October 15, 2018 25 Featured Case ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty for non-dispositive matters. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, and (4) conduct a pretrial conference and enter a pretrial order. Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 10/15/18. Text Only Entry (pabsec)
October 12, 2018 24 Proposed Scheduling Order by Defendant Encompass Indemnity Company. (Lazar, Cheri)
October 12, 2018 23 ANSWER to #16 Amended Complaint and Jury Demand by Encompass Indemnity Company.(Henkel, Kurt)
October 10, 2018 22 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #19 Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Philip A. Brimmer. All future pleadings should be designated as 18-cv-02309-PAB. (Text Only Entry) (tsher, )
October 9, 2018 21 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER re: #19 Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge filed by Meghan Morin by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 10/10/2018. Parties do not consent. The Clerk of the Court to reassign this case under D.C. Colo. LCivR 40.1(a). (tsher, )
October 9, 2018 20 NOTICE of Filing State Court Docket Sheet by Defendant Encompass Indemnity Company (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet)(Henkel, Kurt)
October 9, 2018 19 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Meghan Morin All parties do not consent.. (Eskesen, Martha)
October 8, 2018 18 NOTICE of Filing Amended Pleading re #1 Notice of Removal, COMPLAINT by Plaintiff Meghan Morin (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Marked Changes to Complaint)(Gowan, Gregory)
September 28, 2018 17 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER re: #16 Amended Complaint filed by Meghan Morin by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 9/28/2018. The Plaintiff shall file such notice with the required exhibit on or before 10/8/2018. (tsher, )
September 28, 2018 16 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Encompass Indemnity Company, filed by Meghan Morin.(Gowan, Gregory)
September 26, 2018 15 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Gregory L. Gowan on behalf of Meghan MorinAttorney Gregory L. Gowan added to party Meghan Morin(pty:pla) (Gowan, Gregory)
September 17, 2018 14 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting #13 Defendants Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiffs Complaint by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 09/17/2018. Encompass Indemnity Company answer due 10/1/2018. (mdave, )
September 17, 2018 13 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Defendant Encompass Indemnity Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Lazar, Cheri)
September 12, 2018 12 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 9/12/2018. Consent Form due by 10/11/2018. Scheduling Conference set for 10/18/2018 10:30 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. (tsher, )
September 11, 2018 11 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (rkeec)
September 11, 2018 10 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #9 Memorandum Returning Case. This case is randomly reassigned to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. All future pleadings should be designated as 18-cv-02309-MEH. (Text Only Entry) (rkeec)
September 11, 2018 9 MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel. (rkeec)
September 10, 2018 8 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). No Summons Issued. (rsams, )
September 10, 2018 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Complaint and Jury Demand upon Encompass Indemnity Company on August 10, 2018, filed by Plaintiff Meghan Morin. (rsams, )
September 10, 2018 6 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Martha Horwitz Eskesen on behalf of Meghan MorinAttorney Martha Horwitz Eskesen added to party Meghan Morin(pty:pla) (Eskesen, Martha)
September 10, 2018 5 COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Encompass Indemnity Company, filed by Meghan Morin.(rsams, )
September 10, 2018 4 Case assigned to Judge Wiley Y. Daniel and drawn to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. Text Only Entry. (rsams, )
September 10, 2018 3 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawls of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (rsams, )
September 10, 2018 2 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Cheri R. Lazar on behalf of Encompass Indemnity CompanyAttorney Cheri R. Lazar added to party Encompass Indemnity Company(pty:dft) (Lazar, Cheri)
September 10, 2018 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Encompass Indemnity Company from Arapahoe District Court, Case Number 2018CV31864. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-6287540), filed by Encompass Indemnity Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Return of Service, #2 Exhibit B - Complaint, #3 Exhibit C - Summons, #4 Exhibit D - Civil Case Cover Sheet, #5 Exhibit E - Demand Letter, #6 Civil Cover Sheet USDC Civil Cover Sheet)(Henkel, Kurt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morin v. Encompass Indemnity Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Meghan Morin
Represented By: Martha Horwitz Eskesen
Represented By: Gregory L. Gowan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Encompass Indemnity Company
Represented By: Cheri R. Lazar
Represented By: Kurt Hans Henkel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?