Trails Preservation Alliance et al v. U.S. Forest Service et al

Plaintiff: Trails Preservation Alliance, San Juan Trail Riders and Public Access Preservation Asociation
Defendant: Derek Padilla, San Juan National Forest, Kara Chadwick and U.S. Forest Service
Case Number: 1:2018cv02354
Filed: September 14, 2018
Court: Colorado District Court
Presiding Judge: Wiley Y Daniel
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 05:551
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 22, 2018 8 JOINT STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond by Defendants Kara Chadwick, Derek Padilla, San Juan National Forest, U.S. Forest Service. (Pettigrew, Shaun) (Modified on 10/23/2018 Motion termed as this is a Joint Stipulation)(evana, ).
October 22, 2018 7 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Shaun M. Pettigrew on behalf of All Defendants Attorney Shaun M. Pettigrew added to party Kara Chadwick(pty:dft), Attorney Shaun M. Pettigrew added to party Derek Padilla(pty:dft), Attorney Shaun M. Pettigrew added to party San Juan National Forest(pty:dft), Attorney Shaun M. Pettigrew added to party U.S. Forest Service(pty:dft) (Pettigrew, Shaun)
October 2, 2018 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Trails Preservation Alliance, Public Access Preservation Asociation, San Juan Trail Riders. Kara Chadwick served on 9/21/2018, answer due 10/12/2018; Derek Padilla served on 9/21/2018, answer due 10/12/2018; San Juan National Forest served on 9/21/2018, answer due 10/12/2018; U.S. Forest Service served on 9/21/2018, answer due 10/12/2018. (Turcke, Paul)
September 17, 2018 5 Featured Case ORDER REGARDING INSTRUCTIONS FOR JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 9/17/2018. (evana, )
September 14, 2018 4 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (dbera, )
September 14, 2018 3 Case assigned to Judge Wiley Y. Daniel. Text Only Entry (dbera, )
September 14, 2018 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Turcke, Paul)
September 14, 2018 1 COMPLAINT and Petition for Review against Trails Preservation Alliance, Public Access Preservation Asociation, San Juan Trail Riders (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6295696)Attorney Paul Andrew Turcke added to party Public Access Preservation Asociation(pty:pla), Attorney Paul Andrew Turcke added to party San Juan Trail Riders(pty:pla), Attorney Paul Andrew Turcke added to party Trails Preservation Alliance(pty:pla), filed by Trails Preservation Alliance, Public Access Preservation Asociation, San Juan Trail Riders. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(Turcke, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trails Preservation Alliance et al v. U.S. Forest Service et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trails Preservation Alliance
Represented By: Paul Andrew Turcke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: San Juan Trail Riders
Represented By: Paul Andrew Turcke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Public Access Preservation Asociation
Represented By: Paul Andrew Turcke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Derek Padilla
Represented By: Shaun M. Pettigrew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Juan National Forest
Represented By: Shaun M. Pettigrew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kara Chadwick
Represented By: Shaun M. Pettigrew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Forest Service
Represented By: Shaun M. Pettigrew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?