Ramos Avila v. Sessions et al
Defendant: Attorney General Jefferson Sessions, Kristjen Nielsen and Kristi Barrows
Petitioner: Abel Ramos Avila
Respondent: Jefferson Sessions
Case Number: 1:2018cv02393
Filed: September 18, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Robert E Blackburn
Nature of Suit: Naturalization Application
Cause of Action: 08:1447
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2018 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant(s) Kristi Barrows served on 11/14/2018, answer due 1/14/2019. (Gonzales, Xavier)
November 15, 2018 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant(s) Kristjen Nielsen served on 11/14/2018, answer due 1/14/2019. (Gonzales, Xavier)
November 15, 2018 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant(s) Jefferson Sessions served on 11/14/2018, answer due 1/14/2019. (Gonzales, Xavier)
September 24, 2018 Filing 10 SUMMONSES issued by Clerk. (athom, )
September 24, 2018 Filing 9 DISCLAIMER OF INTEREST by Petitioner Abel Ramos Avila. (Gonzales, Xavier)
September 24, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Kristi Barrows by Petitioner Abel Ramos Avila. (Gonzales, Xavier)
September 24, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Kristjen Nielsen by Petitioner Abel Ramos Avila. (Gonzales, Xavier)
September 24, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Jefferson Sessions by Petitioner Abel Ramos Avila. (Gonzales, Xavier)
September 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REGARDING INSTRUCTIONS FOR JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 09/19/2018. (athom, )
September 18, 2018 Filing 4 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (rroge, )
September 18, 2018 Filing 3 Case assigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Text Only Entry. (rroge, )
September 18, 2018 Filing 2 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES:re: #1 Petition/Application, filed by attorneyXavier Gonzales.Attorney or pro se has used an incorrect signature format in violation of D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 4.3(a) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases). DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. In the future, the filer must include the Attorney Address on the signature block to all future documents.(Text Only Entry) (rroge, )
September 18, 2018 Filing 1 PETITION for Review of Application for Naturalization Pursuant to INA Sec. 336(b) (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-6302013)Attorney Xavier Gonzales added to party Abel Ramos Avila(pty:pet), filed by Abel Ramos Avila. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1)(Gonzales, Xavier)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ramos Avila v. Sessions et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Attorney General Jefferson Sessions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kristjen Nielsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kristi Barrows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Abel Ramos Avila
Represented By: Xavier Gonzales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jefferson Sessions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?