Doe v. Doe
Plaintiff: John Doe
Defendant: Jane Doe and Twitter, Inc.
Interested Party: Charter Communications
Case Number: 1:2018cv02427
Filed: September 24, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: R Brooke Jackson
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2018 Filing 28 RESPONSE to #24 MOTION for Sanctions filed by Interested Party Charter Communications. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Jennings, Rachel)
November 12, 2018 Filing 27 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Rachel Truman Jennings on behalf of Charter CommunicationsAttorney Rachel Truman Jennings added to party Charter Communications(pty:ip) (Jennings, Rachel)
November 7, 2018 Filing 26 RESTRICTED DOCUMENT - Level 2: by Plaintiff John Doe.. (Attachments: #1 MOTION TO RESTRICT)(Buck, Matthew)
November 1, 2018 Filing 24 MOTION for Sanctions by Plaintiff John Doe. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Attorney affidavit)(Buck, Matthew)
October 30, 2018 Filing 25 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Jane Doe, filed by John Doe. (Public Entry for Restricted Document #23 filed on 10/30/2018). Text Only Entry.(sphil, )
October 30, 2018 Filing 23 RESTRICTED DOCUMENT - Level 1: Amended Complaint by Plaintiff John Doe. Filed pursuant to 22 Order. (dkals, )
October 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting 19 Motion to Amend/Correct/Modify. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 10/30/18. Text Only Entry (rbjsec.)
October 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MINUTE ORDER re: 17 MOTION to Compel/ #16 Restricted Document - Level 1 and #20 MOTION to Expedite. Plaintiff has represented that the subpoenaed entity does not oppose the subpoena but will respond only if there is a court order. No motion to quash has been filed. Accordingly, accepting plaintiff's representation as an officer of the Court, the motions are granted. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 10/30/18. Text Only Entry (rbjsec.)
October 24, 2018 Filing 20 MOTION to Expedite by Plaintiff John Doe. (Buck, Matthew)
October 16, 2018 Filing 19 MOTION to Amend by Plaintiff John Doe. Public entry for #18 Restricted Document. Text Only Entry (dkals, )
October 16, 2018 Filing 18 UNRESTRICTED DOCUMENT - Level 1: Motion to Amend by Plaintiff John Doe.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Second Amended Complaint)(Buck, Matthew) Modified on 11/5/2018 to unrestrict pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 7.2(e) (dkals, ).
October 9, 2018 Filing 17 MOTION to Compel by Plaintiff John Doe. Public entry for #16 Restricted Document. Text Only Entry (dkals, )
October 9, 2018 Filing 16 UNRESTRICTED DOCUMENT - Level 1: by Plaintiff John Doe.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Copy of subpoena, #2 Exhibit Copy of email)(Buck, Matthew) Modified on 10/30/2018 to unrestrict pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 7.2(e) (dkals, ).
October 9, 2018 Filing 15 UNRESTRICTED DOCUMENT - Level 1: Amended Complaint by Plaintiff John Doe.. (Buck, Matthew) Modified on 10/10/2018 to add text (dkals, ). Modified on 10/30/2018 to unrestrict pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 7.2(e) (dkals, ).
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER denying 12 Motion to Compel. The Court will not address the motion ex parte. If you serve a copy of your motion (and this order) on Charter Communications so that Charter Communications has an opportunity to respond, the Court will then consider it. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 10/9/18. Text Only Entry (rbjsec. )
October 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to Restrict. However, the Court might reassess this order depending upon further developments in the case. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 10/1/18. Text Only Entry (rbjsec. )
September 27, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION to Compel by Plaintiff John Doe. Public entry for #11 Restricted Document. Text Only Entry (dkals, )
September 27, 2018 Filing 11 UNRESTRICTED DOCUMENT - Level 1: Motion to Compel by Plaintiff John Doe.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Copy of harassing email from Jane Doe, #2 Exhibit Subpoena sent to Charter Communications, #3 Exhibit Charter subpoena response)(Buck, Matthew) Modified on 10/19/2018 to unrestrict pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 7.2(e) (dkals, ).
September 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER TO SET SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: This matter comes before the Court sua sponte. The parties are ordered to set an initial scheduling conference in this Court (with Judge Jackson) pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.1 no later than 45 days after the answer, motion to dismiss or other response to the complaint is filed. The parties are directed to jointly contact Chambers by telephone at (303) 844-4694 or by email at Jackson_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov to obtain a scheduling conference date. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 9/26/18. (rbjsec. )
September 24, 2018 Filing 9 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #8 Memorandum Returning Case. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge R. Brooke Jackson. All future pleadings should be designated as 18-cv-02427-RBJ. (Text Only Entry) (rkeec)
September 24, 2018 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel. (rkeec)
September 24, 2018 Filing 7 RESTRICTED DOCUMENT - Level 1: by Plaintiff John Doe.. (Buck, Matthew)
September 24, 2018 Filing 6 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). No Summons Issued. (rvill, )
September 24, 2018 Filing 5 Case assigned to Judge Wiley Y. Daniel and drawn to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Text Only Entry. (rvill, )
September 24, 2018 Filing 4 First MOTION for Leave to Restrict by Plaintiff John Doe. (Buck, Matthew)
September 24, 2018 Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT TITLE PAGE against Jane Doe, Twitter, Inc., filed by John Doe. Public entry for #7 Restricted Document (Buck, Matthew) Modified on 9/25/2018 to add text (dkals, ).
September 24, 2018 Filing 2 Administrative Notice: Incorrect document attached at ECF #1 . Attorney contacted with instructions to file initiating document. (Text Only Entry) (rvill, )
September 24, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT MOTION FOR LEAVE PER CLERK against Jane Doe, Twitter, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6309260)Attorney Matthew William Buck added to party John Doe(pty:pla), filed by John Doe.(Buck, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe v. Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Twitter, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe
Represented By: Matthew William Buck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Charter Communications
Represented By: Rachel Truman Jennings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?