American Horse Council Inc et al v. Furst et al
Plaintiff: American Horse Council Inc and American Horse Council Foundation Inc
Defendant: Ashley Furst and Christopher Furst
Case Number: 1:2018cv02441
Filed: September 25, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Nina Y Wang
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 14, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATED MOTION FOR ENTRY OF PROPOSED ORDER RESOLVING MOTIONS TO STAY AND ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSING CASE by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 11/14/2018. The Motion #17 is GRANTED; The Motion to Stay #10 and Motion to Join the Motion to Stay #13 are DENIED as moot in light of the Parties' stipulation; This matter shall be ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED... Defendants Ashley Furst and Christopher Furst are ORDERED to not sell, transfer, or convey, nor cause or permit any additional mortgages, liens, claims, charges, pledges, leases, hypothecation, security or other interest or encumbrances on, against, or in connection with, their personal residence... (bwilk, )
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER OF REFERENCE Upon Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge: Pursuant to the parties' consent #16 and 28 USC 636(c), this case is referred to Magistrate Judge Wang to fully preside over for all purposes. By Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 11/14/18. Text Only Entry (msklc2, )
November 13, 2018 Filing 17 Stipulated MOTION for Issuance of Propsed Order Resolving Motions to Stay by Plaintiffs American Horse Council Foundation Inc, American Horse Council Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Bristol, Daniel)
November 9, 2018 Filing 16 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiffs American Horse Council Foundation Inc, American Horse Council Inc All parties consent.. (Bristol, Daniel)
November 8, 2018 Filing 15 COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for Telephonic Status Conference held on 11/8/2018 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Consent Form due by 11/9/2018. FTR: Courtroom A-502. (bwilk, )
November 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER re: #13 MOTION for Joinder re #10 MOTION to Stay filed by Ashley Furst filed by Christopher Furst, #10 MOTION to Stay filed by Ashley Furst. A Telephonic Status Conference is set for 11/8/2018 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. All counsel shall call chambers on the same telephone line at 303.335.2600 at the designated time to participate. By Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 11/6/2018. Text Only Entry (nywlc2, )
November 6, 2018 Filing 13 MOTION for Joinder re #10 MOTION to Stay filed by Ashley Furst by Defendant Christopher Furst. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Carr, Daniel)
November 5, 2018 Filing 12 RESPONSE to #10 MOTION to Stay filed by Plaintiffs American Horse Council Foundation Inc, American Horse Council Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Bristol, Daniel)
October 16, 2018 Filing 11 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond to the Complaint by Defendant Christopher Furst. Christopher Furst answer due 11/6/2018. (Carr, Daniel)
October 15, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION to Stay by Defendant Ashley Furst. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Granting Defendant Ashley Furst's Motion for Stay)(Rezmovits, Jamie)
October 12, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jamie H. Rezmovits on behalf of Ashley FurstAttorney Jamie H. Rezmovits added to party Ashley Furst(pty:dft) (Rezmovits, Jamie)
October 12, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Frank I. Scheitler on behalf of Ashley FurstAttorney Frank I. Scheitler added to party Ashley Furst(pty:dft) (Scheitler, Frank)
October 9, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by American Horse Council Inc, American Horse Council Foundation Inc. Christopher Furst served on 9/25/2018, answer due 10/16/2018. (Eberhart, Lance)
October 9, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by American Horse Council Inc, American Horse Council Foundation Inc. Ashley Furst served on 9/25/2018, answer due 10/16/2018. (Eberhart, Lance)
September 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE AND SETTING DEADLINE FOR FILING OF CONSENT/NONCONSENT FORM by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 9/28/2018. Scheduling Conference set for 12/11/2018 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. The parties or their counsel shall submit their proposed scheduling order, pursuant to District of Colorado Electronic Case Filing (ECF) Procedures V.6.0, including a copy of the proposed scheduling order in a Word format sent via email to Wang_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov, on or before 12/4/2018. Consent Form due by 11/27/2018. (bwilk, )
September 26, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Lance Garrett Eberhart on behalf of American Horse Council Foundation Inc, American Horse Council IncAttorney Lance Garrett Eberhart added to party American Horse Council Foundation Inc(pty:pla), Attorney Lance Garrett Eberhart added to party American Horse Council Inc(pty:pla) (Eberhart, Lance)
September 25, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (cmadr, )
September 25, 2018 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Text Only Entry. (cmadr, )
September 25, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Ashley Furst, Christopher Furst (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6312298)Attorney Daniel James Bristol added to party American Horse Council Foundation Inc(pty:pla), Attorney Daniel James Bristol added to party American Horse Council Inc(pty:pla), filed by American Horse Council Inc, American Horse Council Foundation Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Exhibit A to Complaint, #5 Exhibit B to Complaint, #6 Exhibit C to Complaint)(Bristol, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: American Horse Council Inc et al v. Furst et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Horse Council Inc
Represented By: Daniel James Bristol
Represented By: Lance Garrett Eberhart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Horse Council Foundation Inc
Represented By: Daniel James Bristol
Represented By: Lance Garrett Eberhart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ashley Furst
Represented By: Jamie H. Rezmovits
Represented By: Frank I. Scheitler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Furst
Represented By: Daniel W. Carr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?