Caesar v. Vaughn et al

Defendant: S. Multtolland, Matthews, Odell, Joe Morales, Baroni, Vaughn, Rebecca Oats, Santeria and Leonard Woodson
Petitioner: Alphanso Caesar and Alphonso Ceasar
Respondent: Lingerich
Case Number: 1:2018cv02442
Filed: September 25, 2018
Court: Colorado District Court
Presiding Judge: Gordon P Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241st
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 16, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order 11 MINUTE ORDER Applicant's motion for extension of time (ECF No. #10 ) is GRANTED as follows. Within thirty (30) days from the date of this Minute Order, Applicant must file an Amended Application on the current Court- approved form that complies with the Order Directing Applicant to File Amended Application (ECF No. #9 ). If Applicant fails to file an Amended Application as directed within the time allowed, the action may be dismissed without further notice, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 11/16/2018. (evana, )
November 15, 2018 10 MOTION for Extension of Time, by Petitioner Alphonso Ceasar. (evana, )
October 31, 2018 Opinion or Order 9 ORDER DIRECTING APPLICANT TO FILE AMENDED APPLICATION within thirty (30) days from the date of this Order, Applicant must file an Amended Application that complies with this Order. It is FURTHER ORDERED that if Applicant fails to file an Amended Application as directed within the time allowed, the action may be dismissed without further notice, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 10/31/2018. (evana, )
October 30, 2018 8 PAYMENT RECEIVED from Alphonso Ceasar in the amount of $ 5.00; Receipt Number COX087392; Monthly Payment. (evana, )
October 29, 2018 Opinion or Order 7 MINUTE ORDER Applicant's motion for extension of time (ECF No. #6 ) is GRANTED as follows. Applicant must pay the full $5.00 filing fee within thirty (30) days from the date of this Minute Order if he wishes to pursue the 28 U.S.C. 2241 claims in this action. If Applicant fails to pay the $5.00 filing fee within the time allowed, the habeas corpus application will be denied and the action will be dismissed without further notice, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 10/29/2018. (evana, )
October 25, 2018 6 MOTION for Extension of Time by Petitioner Alphonso Ceasar. (agarc, )
September 28, 2018 5 Supplement to the #1 Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus Pursuant to 28 USC 2241 filed by Alphonso Ceasar.(angar, ) Filed in this case pursuant to 3 Order in case 18-cv-2240-LTB Modified on 9/28/2018 to correct title (angar, ).
September 28, 2018 Opinion or Order 4 ORDER Denying #3 Leave to proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915. If Applicant fails to pay the $5.00 filing fee within the time allowed, the habeas corpus application will be denied and the action will be dismissed without further notice, by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 9/28/2018 signing for Judge Lewis T. Babcock (angar, )
September 25, 2018 3 Prisoner's Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915 in a Habeas Corpus Action. by Petitioner Alphanso Caesar. (dbera, )
September 25, 2018 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Text Only Entry (dbera, )
September 25, 2018 1 APPLICATION for Writ of Habeas Corpus Pursuant to 28 USC 2241, filed by Alphanso Caesar. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(dbera, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Caesar v. Vaughn et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Lingerich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Alphanso Caesar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Alphonso Ceasar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Multtolland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Odell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Morales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baroni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vaughn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rebecca Oats
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Santeria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leonard Woodson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?