Board v. Hanson et al

Defendant: Attorney General of State of Colorado, The and Matthew Hanson
Petitioner: Phillip Leon Board
Respondent: District Court of Colorado
Case Number: 1:2018cv02452
Filed: September 26, 2018
Court: Colorado District Court
Presiding Judge: Gordon P Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 16, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2018 15 RESPONSE to #9 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis,, by Defendants Attorney General of State of Colorado, The, Matthew Hanson Attorney Christine Cates Brady added to party Attorney General of State of Colorado, The(pty:dft), Attorney Christine Cates Brady added to party Matthew Hanson (pty:dft). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit)(Brady, Christine)
November 8, 2018 Opinion or Order 14 MINUTE ORDER On November 6, 2018, Applicant submitted a document requesting appointment of counsel. See ECF No. 5. The request is denied as premature. This action is pending initial review under D.C.COLO.LCivR 8.1(b). The Court currently is addressing only the exhaustion and timeliness of the claims. The Court will not review the merits of Applicants claims until the exhaustion and timeliness issues are resolved, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 11/8/2018. (evana, )
November 6, 2018 13 Renewed MOTION to Appoint Counsel Pursuant to 18 U.S. Code 3006A(a)(1)(I)(2)(B) With Affidavit by Petitioner Phillip Leon Board. (evana, )
November 2, 2018 12 ACKNOWLEDGMENT of Service of Order to File Preliminary Response and an Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus upon Cynthia Coffman on 11/2/2018, filed by Defendant Attorney General of State of Colorado, The (evana, )
November 2, 2018 11 ACKNOWLEDGMENT of Service of Order to File Preliminary Response and an Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus upon Matthew Hansen on 11/2/2018 (evana, )
November 2, 2018 10 CERTIFICATE of Service by Clerk of Court re #6 Amended Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus, #7 MOTION for Extension of Time to Perfect his filing for Habeas Corpus Action, #8 MOTION to Hold the Proceedings in Abeyance to Cure the Deficient and to Exhaust State Court Remedies, and #9 Order to File Preliminary Response and to Respond to Motions for Service of Process. (rvill, )
November 1, 2018 Opinion or Order 9 ORDER TO FILE PRE-ANSWER RESPONSE AND TO RESPOND TO MOTIONS within twenty-one days from the date of this Order the Respondents shall file a Pre-Answer Response that complies with this Order. It is FURTHER ORDERED that within twenty-one days of the Respondents filing the Pre-Answer Response, Applicant may file a Reply, if he desires. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the Prisoner's Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915, ECF No. #1 , is denied as moot, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 11/1/2018. (evana, )
October 31, 2018 8 MOTION to Hold the Proceedings in Abeyance to Cure the Deficient and to Exhaust State Court Remedies by Petitioner Phillip Leon Board. (evana, ) (Main Document 8 replaced on 11/1/2018 attached correrct PDF)) (evana, ). (Modified on 11/1/2018 attached correct PDF)(evana, ).
October 31, 2018 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to Perfect his filing for Habeas Corpus Action by Petitioner Phillip Leon Board. (evana, )
October 30, 2018 6 AMENDED APPLICATION for Writ of Habeas Corpus Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2254, filed by Phillip Leon Board.(evana, )
October 30, 2018 5 PAYMENT RECEIVED from Phillip Leon Board in the amount of $ 5.00; Receipt Number COX087386; Monthly Payment. (evana, )
September 27, 2018 Opinion or Order 4 ORDER Directing Applicant to Cure Deficiency.If Applicant fails to cure the designated deficiency within thirty days from the date of this Order the action will be dismissed without further notice. The Prisoner Motion for Appointment of Counsel, ECF No. #3 , is DENIED without prejudice at this time. This case remains under initial review pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 8.1(b), by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 9/27/2018. (angar, )
September 26, 2018 3 Prisoner's MOTION for Appointment of Counsel by Petitioner Phillip Leon Board. (rroge, )
September 26, 2018 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Text Only Entry. (rroge, )
September 26, 2018 1 Prisoner's Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915. by Petitioner Phillip Leon Board. (rroge, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Board v. Hanson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: District Court of Colorado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Phillip Leon Board
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Attorney General of State of Colorado, The
Represented By: Christine Cates Brady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Hanson
Represented By: Christine Cates Brady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?