Bass v. Bishop

Petitioner: Christopher Bass
Respondent: Stanley Bishop
Case Number: 1:2018cv02500
Filed: October 1, 2018
Court: Colorado District Court
0 Judge: Lewis T Babcock
1 Judge: Gordon P Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2018 9 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re: #7 Order Dismissing Case, #8 Clerk's Judgment, Addressed to Christopher Bass. (evana, )
November 9, 2018 8 JUDGMENT by Clerk re: #7 Order Of Dismissal (evana, )
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order 7 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. That the Application and the action are dismissed without prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(b) for failure to comply with a Court order and for failure to prosecute. It is FURTHER ORDERED that leave to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal is denied. It is FURTHER ORDERED that all pending motions are denied as moot, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 11/9/2018. (evana, )
October 18, 2018 6 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re: #4 Order, Addressed to Christopher Bass. (evana, )
October 15, 2018 5 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re: #1 Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus, #2 Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915., 3 Case Assigned to Judge Addressed to Christopher Michael Bass. (evana, )
October 2, 2018 Opinion or Order 4 ORDER Directing Applicant to Cure Deficiencies. If Applicant fails to cure the designated deficiencies within thirty days from the date of this Order the action will be dismissed without further notice, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 10/2/2018. (angar, )
October 1, 2018 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Text Only Entry. (cmadr, )
October 1, 2018 2 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis and Suspension of Rules by Petitioner Christopher Bass. (cmadr, )
October 1, 2018 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Pursuant to 28 USC 2255, filed by Christopher Bass. (Attachments: #1 Order from case 09-cr-230-DME-1)(cmadr, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bass v. Bishop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Stanley Bishop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Christopher Bass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?