Friends of Animals v. United States Fish and Wildlife Service

Plaintiff: Friends of Animals
Defendant: United States Fish and Wildlife Service
Case Number: 1:2018cv02520
Filed: October 2, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Christine M Arguello
Referring Judge: Kristen L Mix
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2018 Filing 10 Civil Case Terminated pursuant to the #9 Stipulation of Dismissal filed in this case. Text Only Entry (cmasec)
November 19, 2018 Filing 9 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Case by Defendant United States Fish and Wildlife Service. (Kurien, Chandra)
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 1/15/2018. Preliminary Scheduling Conference set for 12/6/2018 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. (Attachments: #1 Continuation of Main Document) (jgonz, )
November 5, 2018 Filing 7 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond to the Complaint by Defendant United States Fish and Wildlife Service. United States Fish and Wildlife Service answer due 11/27/2018. (Kurien, Chandra)
October 26, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Chandra Miriam Kurien on behalf of United States Fish and Wildlife ServiceAttorney Chandra Miriam Kurien added to party United States Fish and Wildlife Service(pty:dft) (Kurien, Chandra)
October 23, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant(s) United States Fish and Wildlife Service served on 10/11/2018, answer due 12/10/2018. (Best, Jennifer)
October 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Magistrate Judge Mix is designated to conduct NDISPO proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b). The parties should expect to be given a firm trial setting that is 90 to 120 days from the date of the final pretrial conference, and should be available for trial accordingly. FURTHER, Court-sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, the Court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. SO ORDERED by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 10/3/2018. Text Only Entry (cmasec)
October 2, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (dbera, )
October 2, 2018 Filing 2 Case assigned to Judge Christine M. Arguello and drawn to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Text Only Entry (dbera, )
October 2, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States Fish and Wildlife Service (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6323942)Attorney Jennifer E. Best added to party Friends of Animals(pty:pla), filed by Friends of Animals. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons U.S. Attorney, #3 Summons U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service, #4 Summons Attorney General)(Best, Jennifer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Friends of Animals v. United States Fish and Wildlife Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Fish and Wildlife Service
Represented By: Chandra Miriam Kurien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Friends of Animals
Represented By: Jennifer E. Best
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?