Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company v. Broan-Nutone, LLC
Plaintiff: Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company
Defendant: Broan-Nutone, LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv02544
Filed: October 4, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Marcia S Krieger
Referring Judge: Nina Y Wang
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 19, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER SETTING RULE 16(b) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 10/19/2018. A Scheduling Conference is set for 12/12/2018 11:00 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. The parties shall submit their proposed scheduling order, including a copy of the proposed order in Word format sent via email to Wang_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov, seven days prior to the Scheduling Conference. (bwilk, )
October 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REGARDING CUSTODY OF EXHIBITS AND DEPOSITIONS USED IN EVIDENTIARY HEARINGS AND TRIALS: Any exhibits and depositions used during evidentiary hearings or trials, counsel for the parties shall retrieve the originals of such exhibits and depositions from the Court following the evidentiary hearing or trial, and shall retain same for 60 days beyond the later of the time to appeal or conclusion of any appellate proceedings. The Court will retain its copy of the exhibits for the same time period after which the documents will be destroyed. by Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 10/18/18. Text Only Entry (pglov)
October 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang: IT IS ORDERED that pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and FED. R. CIV. P. 72(a) and (b), this matter is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to:(1)Convene a scheduling conference under FED. R. CIV. P. 16(b), enter a Scheduling Order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, enter such orders as appropriate to enforce the Scheduling Order, and resolve discovery matters;(2)ADR: Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. Early Neutral Evaluation is approved. On the informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, the Court may direct the parties to engage in a settlement conference conducted by the magistrate judge if the parties have engaged in an Early Neutral Evaluation and are unable to afford or otherwise attain private settlement assistance;(3)Hear and determine referred matters in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B). by Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 10/18/18. Text Only Entry (msklc2, )
October 18, 2018 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Broan-Nutone, LLC, filed by Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company.(Dvorak, Amy)
October 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: There is a fundamental disconnect between the caption of the Complaint and the jursidictional allegations therein. The caption identifies the Defendant as an "LLC" -- that is, a Limited Liability Company. The body of the Complaint identifies the Defendant as a corporation, an entirely different business form. The disctinction is significant, as the allegations that must be made regarding citizenship for each type of entity differ significantly. Compare 28 USC 1332(c) and Siloam Springs Hotel, LLC v. Century Surety Co., 781 F.3d 1233, 1238 (10th Cir. 2015). Accordingly, within 14 days of this Order, the Plaintiff shall amend the Complaint to clarify the precise corporate form of the Defendant and to adequately allege diversity of citizenship or otherwise show cause why this action should not be dismissed for lack of subject-matter jurisdiction. By Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 10/8/18. Text Only Entry (msklc2, )
October 4, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (rvill, )
October 4, 2018 Filing 2 Case assigned to Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger and drawn to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Text Only Entry. (rvill, )
October 4, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Broan-Nutone, LLC (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6328654)Attorney Amy Lynn Dvorak added to party Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company(pty:pla), filed by Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Dvorak, Amy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company v. Broan-Nutone, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Amy Lynn Dvorak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Broan-Nutone, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?