Starr Indemnity and Liability Company et al v. USA et al
Plaintiff: Starr Indemnity and Liability Company and Aerolineas Ejecutivas S.A. de C.V.
Defendant: Denver Air Route Traffic Control Center, Federal Aviation Administration, United States of America and USA
Case Number: 1:2018cv02552
Filed: October 4, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Philip A Brimmer
Referring Judge: Scott T Varholak
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:2671
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 29, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 29, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE of Filing Amended Pleading re 15 Minute Order,, by Plaintiffs Aerolineas Ejecutivas S.A. de C.V., Starr Indemnity and Liability Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Redlined First Amended Complaint)(Smith, Joshua)
November 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER This matter is before the Court upon Plaintiffs' filing of #14 Amended Complaint. Pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 15.1(a), "[a] party... who files an amended pleading... shall file a separate notice of filing the amended pleading and shall attach as an exhibit a copy of the amended pleading which strikes through... the text to be deleted and underlines... the text to be added." Accordingly, IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiffs shall file the required notice attaching a redlined version of the amended pleading on or before 12/05/2018. SO ORDERED, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 11/29/2018. Text Only Entry (stvlc1, )
November 28, 2018 Filing 14 AMENDED COMPLAINT against USA, filed by Starr Indemnity and Liability Company, Aerolineas Ejecutivas S.A. de C.V..(Smith, Joshua)
October 23, 2018 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant(s) USA served on 10/17/2018, answer due 12/17/2018. (Smith, Joshua)
October 23, 2018 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant(s) Federal Aviation Administration served on 10/19/2018, answer due 12/18/2018. (Smith, Joshua)
October 23, 2018 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon Federal Aviation Administration c/o U.S. Attorney General (Smith, Joshua)
October 22, 2018 Filing 10 DOCKETING ERROR SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant(s) Federal Aviation Administration served on 10/17/2018, answer due 12/17/2018. (Johnston, Steven) (Modified on 10/22/2018 Docketing error, wrong PDF Attached(evana, ).
October 22, 2018 Filing 9 DOCKETING ERROR SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant(s) USA served on 10/17/2018, answer due 12/17/2018. (Johnston, Steven) (Modified on 10/22/2018 Docketing error, incorrect PDF Attached)(evana, ).
October 16, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Brett Marshall Godfrey on behalf of Aerolineas Ejecutivas S.A. de C.V., Starr Indemnity and Liability CompanyAttorney Brett Marshall Godfrey added to party Aerolineas Ejecutivas S.A. de C.V.(pty:pla), Attorney Brett Marshall Godfrey added to party Starr Indemnity and Liability Company(pty:pla) (Godfrey, Brett)
October 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 12/14/2018 10:30 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 10/12/2018. (jgonz, )
October 10, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (sphil, )
October 10, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS REQUEST as to USA, Federal Aviation Administration, John and Jane Doe by Plaintiffs Aerolineas Ejecutivas S.A. de C.V., Starr Indemnity and Liability Company. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(Smith, Joshua)
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak for non-dispositive matters. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, and (4) conduct a pretrial conference and enter a pretrial order. Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 10/9/18. Text Only Entry (pabsec)
October 5, 2018 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (dbera, )
October 4, 2018 Filing 2 Case assigned to Judge Philip A. Brimmer and drawn to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Text Only Entry (dbera, )
October 4, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Denver Air Route Traffic Control Center, Federal Aviation Administration, United States of America (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6329568)Attorney Joshua Kent Smith added to party Aerolineas Ejecutivas S.A. de C.V.(pty:pla), Attorney Joshua Kent Smith added to party Starr Indemnity and Liability Company(pty:pla), filed by Starr Indemnity and Liability Company, Aerolineas Ejecutivas S.A. de C.V.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Smith, Joshua)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Starr Indemnity and Liability Company et al v. USA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denver Air Route Traffic Control Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Aviation Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Starr Indemnity and Liability Company
Represented By: Joshua Kent Smith
Represented By: Brett Marshall Godfrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aerolineas Ejecutivas S.A. de C.V.
Represented By: Joshua Kent Smith
Represented By: Brett Marshall Godfrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?